EP2956785 - MAGNETIC FIELD SENSOR HAVING AN EXTERNALLY ACCESSIBLE COIL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/52] | METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR MAGNETIC SENSOR HAVING AN EXTERNALLY ACCESSIBLE COIL | ||
[2024/22] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.05.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Allegro MicroSystems, LLC 955 Perimeter Road Manchester, NH 03103-3353 / US | [2018/32] |
Former [2015/52] | For all designated states Allegro Microsystems, LLC 115 Northeast Cutoff Worcester, MA 01606 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MILANO, Shaun, D. 225 Mansion Road Dunbarton, New Hampshire 03046 / US | 02 /
DOOGUE, Michael, C. 115 North Adams Street Manchester, New Hampshire 03104 / US | 03 /
TAYLOR, William, P. 1 Highland Drive Amherst, New Hampshire 03031 / US | [2015/52] | Representative(s) | South, Nicholas Geoffrey, et al AA Thornton IP LLP 8th Floor, 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | [2024/38] |
Former [2015/52] | South, Nicholas Geoffrey, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | Application number, filing date | 14708772.0 | 25.02.2014 | [2015/52] | WO2014US18209 | Priority number, date | US201313837982 | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US201313837982 | [2015/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014149416 | Date: | 25.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2956785 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2956785 | Date: | 18.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/00, // G01R33/07 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
G01R33/0017 (EP,US);
G01R31/2884 (US);
G01R33/0035 (EP,US);
G01R33/02 (US);
G01R33/07 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2015/52] | G01R33/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN MAGNETSENSOR MIT VON AUSSEN ZUGÄNGLICHER SPULE | [2015/52] | English: | MAGNETIC FIELD SENSOR HAVING AN EXTERNALLY ACCESSIBLE COIL | [2024/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL POUR CAPTEUR MAGNÉTIQUE DOTÉ D'UNE BOBINE ACCESSIBLE DE L'EXTÉRIEUR | [2015/52] |
Former [2015/52] | METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR MAGNETIC SENSOR HAVING AN EXTERNALLY ACCESSIBLE COIL | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2015 | Examination requested [2015/52] | 19.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 28.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.06.2019 | Request for further processing for: | 28.07.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 28.07.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.08.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 03.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]DE4141386 (ITT IND GMBH DEUTSCHE [DE]); | [XI]EP1403648 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP1783507 (ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]); | [I]US2008013298 (SHARMA NIRMAL [US], et al); | [X]DE102007044485 (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]); | [XI]EP2063229 (MICRONAS GMBH [DE]); | [XI]EP2108966 (ECOLE POLYTECH [CH]); | [X]US2010211347 (FRIEDRICH ANDREAS P [FR], et al); | [A]US2010295140 (THEUSS HORST [DE], et al); | [XD]US2011018533 (CESARETTI JUAN MANUEL [AR], et al); | [I]DE102010028390 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]); | [XI]US2012091994 (HAN DONG OK [KR], et al); | [X]US2012161759 (POZZATI ENRICO [IT], et al); | [I]US2012293164 (LIOU FU-TAI [TW], et al); | [X]DE102011102483 (AUSTRIAMICROSYSTEMS AG [AT]); | [XP]WO2013141981 (ALLEGRO MICROSYSTEMS LLC [US], et al) |