EP2972138 - SYSTEM AND METHOD TO AUTOMATICALLY SELF-ADJUST A VALVE PEDESTAL OF A MASS FLOW CONTROLLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.10.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.06.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illinois Tool Works Inc. 155 Harlem Avenue Glenview, IL 60025 / US | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VALENTINE, William S. c/o Illinois Tool Works Inc. 155 Harlem Avenue Glenview, Illinois 60025 / US | 02 /
ELLEC, Christophe c/o Illinois Tool Works Inc. 155 Harlem Avenue Glenview, Illinois 60025 / US | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/47] | Trinks, Ole Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | ||
Former [2016/03] | Trinks, Ole Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR P.O. Box 102605 86016 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 14709108.6 | 22.02.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014US17859 | Priority number, date | US201361783346P | 14.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361783346 P | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014158530 | Date: | 02.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2972138 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2972138 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/684, G01F25/10, G01F15/00, G01F5/00 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
G01F1/6847 (EP,US);
G01F25/00 (US);
G01F15/005 (EP,US);
G01F25/10 (EP,US);
G01F5/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/03] | G01F25/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUTOMATISCHEN SELBSTEINSTELLUNG EINES VENTILSOCKELS EINER MASSENDURCHFLUSSSTEUERUNG | [2022/47] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD TO AUTOMATICALLY SELF-ADJUST A VALVE PEDESTAL OF A MASS FLOW CONTROLLER | [2016/03] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT D'AUTOAJUSTER AUTOMATIQUEMENT UN SOCLE DE SOUPAPE D'UN ORGANE DE COMMANDE DE DÉBIT MASSIQUE | [2016/03] |
Former [2016/03] | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM AUTOMATISCHEN SELBSTEINSTELLUNG EINES VENTILSOCKELS EINER MASSENDURCHFLUSSSTEUERUNG | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 27.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.10.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.01.2018 | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 23.11.2022 | AT | 23.11.2022 | CZ | 23.11.2022 | DK | 23.11.2022 | EE | 23.11.2022 | ES | 23.11.2022 | FI | 23.11.2022 | HR | 23.11.2022 | IT | 23.11.2022 | LT | 23.11.2022 | LV | 23.11.2022 | MC | 23.11.2022 | PL | 23.11.2022 | RO | 23.11.2022 | RS | 23.11.2022 | SE | 23.11.2022 | SI | 23.11.2022 | SK | 23.11.2022 | SM | 23.11.2022 | IE | 22.02.2023 | LU | 22.02.2023 | NO | 23.02.2023 | GR | 24.02.2023 | BE | 28.02.2023 | CH | 28.02.2023 | FR | 28.02.2023 | LI | 28.02.2023 | IS | 23.03.2023 | PT | 23.03.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/11] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
AT | 23.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
MC | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SI | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
IE | 22.02.2023 | ||
LU | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
BE | 28.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
FR | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
AT | 23.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
MC | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SI | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
IE | 22.02.2023 | ||
LU | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
AT | 23.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
MC | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SI | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
LU | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
AT | 23.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
MC | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
LU | 22.02.2023 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
AT | 23.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
MC | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
CH | 28.02.2023 | ||
LI | 28.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/44] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
AT | 23.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
MC | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
AT | 23.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SK | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 23.11.2022 | |
AT | 23.11.2022 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
CZ | 23.11.2022 | ||
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RO | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
EE | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
DK | 23.11.2022 | ||
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
SM | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
PL | 23.11.2022 | ||
RS | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
IS | 23.03.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
HR | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
LV | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
GR | 24.02.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 23.11.2022 | |
ES | 23.11.2022 | ||
FI | 23.11.2022 | ||
LT | 23.11.2022 | ||
SE | 23.11.2022 | ||
NO | 23.02.2023 | ||
PT | 23.03.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | LT | 23.11.2022 | |
NO | 23.02.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4877051 (DAY CHRISTOPHER C [US]) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * column 1, line 8 - line 27 ** column 2, line 23 - column 3, line 38 *; | [X]US5062446 (ANDERSON RICHARD L [US]) [X] 1,11 * figure 4 * * column 6, line 57 - column 10, line 56 *; | [XI]WO2004010234 (CELERITY GROUP INC [US]) [X] 1-4,11-14 * abstract * * page 12, line 27 - page 14, line 15 * * page 21, line 18 - page 24, line 6 * * page 35, line 8 - line 14 * * page 68, line 24 - line 28 * [I] 5-10,15-17; | [X]WO2013022697 (HITACHI METALS LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,11 * abstract * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0016] * |