EP2969621 - DRIVE TRAIN FOR A HYBRID VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.02.2018 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Change - classification | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AVL List GmbH Hans-List-Platz 1 8020 Graz / AT | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRILLENBERGER, Dieter Maria-Theresia-Strasse 36 A-8072 Fernitz / AT | 02 /
LICHTENEGGER, Stefan Schwarzschachen 45 A-8511 St. Stefan / AT | 03 /
REINBACHER, Achim Ligist 64/1 A-8563 Ligist / AT | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | Babeluk, Michael Florianigasse 26/3 1080 Wien / AT | [2016/03] | Application number, filing date | 14709936.0 | 12.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014EP54833 | Priority number, date | AT20130050176 | 15.03.2013 Original published format: AT 501762013 | [2016/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014140096 | Date: | 18.09.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2969621 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B60K6/445, F16H3/72, F16H37/10 | [2016/03] | CPC: |
B60K6/543 (AT);
F16H3/727 (EP);
F16H2037/102 (EP);
F16H2200/201 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Title | German: | ANTRIEBSSTRANG FÜR EIN HYBRIDFAHRZEUG | [2016/03] | English: | DRIVE TRAIN FOR A HYBRID VEHICLE | [2016/03] | French: | CHAÎNE CINÉMATIQUE POUR UN VÉHICULE HYBRIDE | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 03.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/11] | 02.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US2009312130 (KIM TALCHOL [KR] ET AL) [X] 1-4,9-11 * paragraphs [0023] - [0030]; figure 1 * [A] 5-8; | [XA]DE102011089670 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [X] 1,9-11 * paragraphs [0027] - [0034]; figures 1,2 * [A] 2-8; | [A]DE102007021591 (GM GLOBAL TECH OPERATIONS INC [US]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1160117 (AISIN AW CO [JP]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * |