EP2970348 - BIS(2-INDENYL) METALLOCENE COMPLEX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.09.2018 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.10.2018 [2018/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saudi Basic Industries Corporation P.O. Box 5101 Riyadh 11422 / SA | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AL-SHAMMARI, Haif c/o SABIC Headquarters Patent Section P.O. Box 5101 Riyadh 11422 / SA | 02 /
MORTON, Jason c/o Saudi Basic Industries Corporation Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 5101 11422 Riyadh / SA | 03 /
STEPHAN, Douglas Department of Chemistry University of Toronto 80 St.George St. Toronto, Ontario M5S 3H6 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2016/03] | 01 /
AL-SHAMMARI, Haif c/o SABIC Headquarters Patent Section P.O. Box 5101 Riyadh 11422 / SA | ||
02 /
MORTON, Jason 4700 King Abdullah University of Science and Technology Thuwal / US | |||
03 /
STEPHAN, Douglas Department of Chemistry University of Toronto 80 St.George St. Toronto, Ontario M5S 3H6 / CA | Representative(s) | Terpsma, Jelle Philip SABIC Intellectual Property Group P.O. Box 3008 6160 GA Geleen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2016/03] | Terpsma, Jelle Philip SABIC Intellectual Property Group P.O. Box 3008 6160 GA Geleen / NL | Application number, filing date | 14710230.5 | 10.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014EP54578 | Priority number, date | EP20130001242 | 12.03.2013 Original published format: EP 13001242 | US201461927084P | 14.01.2014 Original published format: US 201461927084 P | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014139949 | Date: | 18.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2970348 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07F17/00, C08F4/00, C08F10/00 | [2016/03] | CPC: |
C08F210/16 (EP,CN,US);
C07F17/00 (EP,CN,US);
C08F10/00 (EP,US);
C08F210/14 (CN);
C08F4/00 (EP,US);
C08F4/65912 (EP,CN,US);
C08F4/65916 (EP,CN,US);
C08F4/65927 (CN,US);
C08F2500/03 (CN);
| C-Set: |
C08F210/16, C08F4/65927 (EP,US);
C08F210/16, C08F210/14, C08F2500/03, C08F2500/09, C08F2500/10 (EP);
C08F210/16, C08F4/65912 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Title | German: | BIS-(2-INDENYL)-METALLOCEN-KOMPLEX | [2016/03] | English: | BIS(2-INDENYL) METALLOCENE COMPLEX | [2016/03] | French: | COMPLEXE DE BIS(2-INDÉNYL)-MÉTALLOCÈNE | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 25.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/42] | 06.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/42] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.10.2016 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 29.05.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 29.05.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.06.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2018 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2952697 (GORSICH RICHARD D) [A] 1-15 * column 4; example VII *; | [A]US4962262 (WINTER ANDREAS [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 6; example 1 *; | [A] - FIRME, CAIO L. ET AL, "Topological study of bis(cyclopentadienyl) titanium and bent titanocenes", CHEMICAL PHYSICS LETTERS , 499(4-6), 193-198 CODEN: CHPLBC; ISSN: 0009-2614, (2010), XP002697676 [A] 1-15 * page 195 left paragraph * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cplett.2010.09.038 |