EP2984388 - A BASE FOR AN ELECTRICAL LAMP AND A METHOD OF ASSEMBLING A BASE FOR AN ELECTRICAL LAMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2017 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Philips Lighting Holding B.V. High Tech Campus 45 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2016/34] |
Former [2016/07] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIELEN, Vincent Stefan David c/o High Tech Campus 45 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2017/33] |
Former [2016/07] | 01 /
GIELEN, Vincent Stefan David c/o High Tech Campus Building 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Representative(s) | van Eeuwijk, Alexander Henricus Waltherus, et al Signify Netherlands B.V. Intellectual Property High Tech Campus 7 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2016/47] | van Eeuwijk, Alexander Henricus Waltherus, et al Philips Lighting B.V. Philips Lighting Intellectual Property High Tech Campus 45 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2016/07] | van Eeuwijk, Alexander Henricus Waltherus Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 14710650.4 | 03.03.2014 | [2016/07] | WO2014IB59375 | Priority number, date | US201361776002P | 11.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361776002 P | [2016/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014140983 | Date: | 18.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2984388 | Date: | 17.02.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2984388 | Date: | 23.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F21K99/00, F21V17/00, F21V17/16, F21Y101/00 | [2016/07] | CPC: |
F21V17/005 (EP,US);
F21K99/00 (RU);
F21V17/10 (US);
F21K9/23 (EP,US);
F21K9/90 (US);
F21V17/164 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SOCKEL FÜR ELEKTRISCHE LAMPE UND VERFAHREN ZUR ZUSAMMENSETZUNG DES SOCKELS | [2016/17] | English: | A BASE FOR AN ELECTRICAL LAMP AND A METHOD OF ASSEMBLING A BASE FOR AN ELECTRICAL LAMP | [2016/07] | French: | BASE DE LAMPE ÉLECTRIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ D'ASSEMBLAGE D'UNE BASE DE LAMPE ÉLECTRIQUE | [2016/17] |
Former [2016/07] | SOCKEL FÜR EINE ELEKTRISCHE LAMPE UND VERFAHREN ZUR MONTAGE EINES SOCKELS FÜR EINE ELEKTRISCHE LAMPE | ||
Former [2016/07] | PIED POUR UNE LAMPE ÉLECTRIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ D'ASSEMBLAGE D'UN PIED POUR UNE LAMPE ÉLECTRIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/07] | 09.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 08.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.05.2016 | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.03.2014 | AL | 23.11.2016 | AT | 23.11.2016 | BE | 23.11.2016 | CY | 23.11.2016 | CZ | 23.11.2016 | DK | 23.11.2016 | EE | 23.11.2016 | ES | 23.11.2016 | FI | 23.11.2016 | HR | 23.11.2016 | IT | 23.11.2016 | LT | 23.11.2016 | LV | 23.11.2016 | MC | 23.11.2016 | MK | 23.11.2016 | NL | 23.11.2016 | PL | 23.11.2016 | RO | 23.11.2016 | RS | 23.11.2016 | SE | 23.11.2016 | SI | 23.11.2016 | SK | 23.11.2016 | SM | 23.11.2016 | TR | 23.11.2016 | BG | 23.02.2017 | NO | 23.02.2017 | GR | 24.02.2017 | IE | 03.03.2017 | LU | 03.03.2017 | MT | 03.03.2017 | IS | 23.03.2017 | PT | 23.03.2017 | CH | 31.03.2017 | LI | 31.03.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 03.03.2014 | |
AT | 23.11.2016 | ||
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CY | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
MK | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
TR | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
IE | 03.03.2017 | ||
LU | 03.03.2017 | ||
MT | 03.03.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 03.03.2014 | |
AT | 23.11.2016 | ||
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CY | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
MK | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
IE | 03.03.2017 | ||
LU | 03.03.2017 | ||
MT | 03.03.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 03.03.2014 | |
AT | 23.11.2016 | ||
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CY | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
IE | 03.03.2017 | ||
LU | 03.03.2017 | ||
MT | 03.03.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 03.03.2014 | |
AT | 23.11.2016 | ||
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
IE | 03.03.2017 | ||
LU | 03.03.2017 | ||
MT | 03.03.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
IE | 03.03.2017 | ||
LU | 03.03.2017 | ||
MT | 03.03.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
IE | 03.03.2017 | ||
LU | 03.03.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
LU | 03.03.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
IT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/33] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
ES | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RS | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 23.11.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1577921 (MASS TECHNOLOGY HK LTD [CN]); | [A]FR2914732 (LEGENDRE OLIVIER PAUL [FR]) | by applicant | US7965023 |