EP2959691 - VIDEO TILING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.03.2021 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 14.04.2021 [2021/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Savant Systems, Inc. 45 Perseverance Way Hyannis, MA 02601 / US | [2020/35] |
Former [2016/01] | For all designated states Savant Systems LLC 45 Perseverance Way Hyannis, MA 02601 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SILVA, Michael, C. 45 Perseverance Way Hyannis, MA 02601 / US | 02 /
TUBINIS, Mark 45 Perseverance Way Hyannis, MA 02601 / US | 03 /
PERRY, Christopher 45 Perseverance Way Hyannis, MA 02601 / US | 04 /
CIPOLLO, Nicholas, J. 45 Perseverance Way Hyannis, MA 02601 / US | 05 /
AVELAR, Duarte, M. 45 Perseverance Way Hyannis, MA 02601 / US | 06 /
ALLEN, James, F. 45 Perseverance Way Hyannis, MA 02601 / US | 07 /
TATZEL, David, W. 45 Perseverance Way Hyannis, MA 02601 / US | 08 /
HAMM, Andrew 45 Perseverance Way Hyannis, MA 02601 / US | [2016/01] | Representative(s) | Rupprecht, Kay Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/01] | Rupprecht, Kay Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14711348.4 | 25.02.2014 | [2016/01] | WO2014US18194 | Priority number, date | US201361768917P | 25.02.2013 Original published format: US 201361768917 P | [2016/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014130990 | Date: | 28.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2959691 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/422, H04N7/18, H04N5/445 | [2016/01] | CPC: |
G06F3/04883 (EP);
G06F3/04842 (US);
G06F3/0482 (EP);
G06F3/04847 (EP);
G06F3/0486 (EP);
G06F3/0488 (US);
G06F3/04886 (EP);
H04M1/72412 (EP);
H04N21/41265 (EP,US);
H04N21/42209 (EP,US);
H04N21/4222 (EP,US);
H04N21/42224 (EP,US);
H04N21/4316 (EP,US);
H04N21/4438 (EP,US);
H04N21/47 (EP,US);
H04N7/181 (EP,US);
G06F2203/04803 (EP);
G06F2203/04808 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/01] | Title | German: | VIDEOANORDNUNG | [2016/01] | English: | VIDEO TILING | [2016/01] | French: | MOSAÏQUE VIDÉO | [2016/01] | Entry into regional phase | 20.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 20.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.08.2015 | Examination requested [2015/53] | 12.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/15] | 06.11.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.11.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 27.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/15] | Divisional application(s) | EP21155469.6 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.01.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP2081384 (VERINT SYSTEMS INC [US]) [Y] 3,15 * paragraphs [0020] - [0022]; figure 1 * * figure 2 * * claim 8 *; | [XYI]US2010017748 (TAYLOR STEVE D [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,13,14 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraphs [0035] - [0040]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0043] - [0051]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0069]; figure 7 * * figure 10 * * paragraph [0085] * * figures 13-14 * * paragraphs [0094] - [0096]; figure 16 * * claim 15 * * paragraph [0098]; figure 17a * [Y] 3,6-12,15 [I] 5,16; | [XYI]US2010077431 (NEUFELD NADAV M [US], et al) [X] 1,4,13 * paragraphs [0020] - [0022]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0044] - [0045]; figure 3 * * paragraphs [0046] - [0049]; figure 4 * * paragraph [0052]; figure 5 * [Y] 9[I] 5; | [Y]US2012081299 (XIAO HONG [US], et al) [Y] 6-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0045]; figure 6 * | by applicant | US20070687511 |