EP2991509 - DRYING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dickinson Legg Limited Moorside Road Winchester, Hampshire SO23 7SS / GB | [2016/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WHITE, Thomas Henry Dickinson Legg Limited Moorside Road Winchester Hampshire SO23 7SS / GB | [2016/10] | Representative(s) | Chapman IP Kings Park House 22 Kings Park Road Southampton SO15 2AT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/10] | chapman + co 18 Staple Gardens Winchester, Hampshire SO23 8SR / GB | Application number, filing date | 14711576.0 | 13.03.2014 | [2016/10] | WO2014GB50763 | Priority number, date | GB20130007860 | 01.05.2013 Original published format: GB 201307860 | [2016/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014177833 | Date: | 06.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2991509 | Date: | 09.03.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2991509 | Date: | 03.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A24B3/04 | [2016/10] | CPC: |
A24B3/04 (EP,GB);
A24B9/00 (GB);
F26B17/205 (GB)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TROCKNUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2016/10] | English: | DRYING APPARATUS | [2016/10] | French: | APPAREIL DE SÉCHAGE | [2016/10] | Entry into regional phase | 01.07.2015 | National basic fee paid | 01.07.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.07.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.2015 | Examination requested [2016/10] | 15.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 03.05.2017 | AT | 03.05.2017 | CY | 03.05.2017 | CZ | 03.05.2017 | DK | 03.05.2017 | EE | 03.05.2017 | ES | 03.05.2017 | FI | 03.05.2017 | HR | 03.05.2017 | LT | 03.05.2017 | LV | 03.05.2017 | MC | 03.05.2017 | MK | 03.05.2017 | NL | 03.05.2017 | PT | 03.05.2017 | RO | 03.05.2017 | RS | 03.05.2017 | SE | 03.05.2017 | SI | 03.05.2017 | SK | 03.05.2017 | SM | 03.05.2017 | TR | 03.05.2017 | BG | 03.08.2017 | NO | 03.08.2017 | GR | 04.08.2017 | IS | 03.09.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CY | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
MK | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PT | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
TR | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PT | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
TR | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
TR | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
DK | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
NL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SE | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
ES | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB953893 (QUESTER WILHELM) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]US4583559 (HEDGE ROGER W [GB]) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1486130 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC [JP]) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]US3906961 (ROWELL LORNE A ET AL) [A] 1-21 * the whole document * |