EP2973433 - MAPPING AUGMENTED REALITY EXPERIENCE TO VARIOUS ENVIRONMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.05.2018 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OFEK, Eyal c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
GAL, Ran c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
BURGER, Douglas c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 04 /
LANIER, Jaron c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/03] | Fischer, Michael Maria, et al Olswang Germany LLP IP Rosental 4 80331 Munich / DE | Application number, filing date | 14713327.6 | 06.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014US20953 | Priority number, date | US201313827368 | 14.03.2013 Original published format: US201313827368 | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014158928 | Date: | 02.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2973433 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06T19/20, G06T19/00 | [2016/03] | CPC: |
G06T19/006 (EP,US);
G06T19/20 (EP,US);
G06T2219/2004 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Title | German: | ZUORDNUNG DER ERFAHRUNG EINER ERWEITERTEN REALITÄT ZU VERSCHIEDENEN UMGEBUNGEN | [2016/03] | English: | MAPPING AUGMENTED REALITY EXPERIENCE TO VARIOUS ENVIRONMENTS | [2016/03] | French: | MISE EN CORRESPONDANCE D'UNE EXPÉRIENCE DE RÉALITÉ AUGMENTÉE AVEC DIVERS ENVIRONNEMENTS | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 26.08.2015 | National basic fee paid | 26.08.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.08.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.08.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 11.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/26] | 19.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.09.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2018 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI] - BREEN D E ET AL, "Interactive occlusion and automatic object placement for augmented reality", COMPUTER GRAPHICS FORUM, WILEY-BLACKWELL PUBLISHING LTD, GB, (19960826), vol. 15, no. 3, doi:10.1111/1467-8659.1530011, ISSN 0167-7055, pages 11 - 22, XP002515919 [X] 1-6 * Abstract, Sections 1, 4.3, 5 and subsections * [Y] 7,8 [I] 9,10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/1467-8659.1530011 | [Y] - PAUL MERRELL ET AL, "Interactive furniture layout using interior design guidelines", ACM SIGGRAPH 2011 PAPERS ON, SIGGRAPH '11, New York, New York, USA, (20110101), doi:10.1145/1964921.1964982, ISBN 978-1-45-030943-1, page 1, XP055187042 [Y] 7,8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1964921.1964982 | [A] - SMITH G ET AL, "3D SCENE MANIPULATION WITH 2D DEVICES AND CONSTRAINTS", PROCEEDINGS GRAPHICS INTERFACE 2001. OTTAWA, ONTARIO, CANADA, JUNE 7 - 9, 2001; [GRAPHICS INTERFACE], TORONTO : CIPS, CA, (20010607), vol. CONF. 27, ISBN 978-0-9688808-0-7, pages 135 - 142, XP001232492 [A] 7 * Sections 3,4 * | [A] - XU K ET AL, "CONSTRAINT-BASED AUTOMATIC PLACEMENT FOR SCENE COMPOSITION", PROCEEDINGS GRAPHICS INTERFACE 2002. CALGARY, ALBERTA, CANADA, MAY 27 - 29, 2002; [GRAPHICS INTERFACE], TORONTO : CIPS, US, (20020527), vol. CONF. 28, ISBN 978-1-56881-183-3, pages 25 - 34, XP001232454 [A] 1 * the whole document * |