EP2989155 - COMPOSITION COMPRISING SILYLATED POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huntsman International LLC 500 Huntsman Way Salt Lake City, UT 84108 / US | [2016/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PHANOPOULOS, Christopher Sterrebeeklaan 79 B-3080 Moorsel / BE | 02 /
HOLVOET, Servaas Hollestraat 12 B-3020 Veltem-Beisem / BE | 03 /
DESESQUELLES, Fabrice Rue du Vautour 51 B-1000 Brussel / BE | 04 /
KLEIN, Rene, Alexander Kluisveldstraat 15 B-3320 Hoegaarden / BE | [2016/09] | Representative(s) | Kourgias, Catherine Huntsman (Europe) BVBA Intellectual Property Department Everslaan 45 3078 Everberg / BE | [2018/40] |
Former [2016/09] | Swinnen, Anne-Marie, et al Huntsman (Europe) BVBA Intellectual Property Department Everslaan 45 3078 Everberg / BE | Application number, filing date | 14713865.5 | 01.04.2014 | [2016/09] | WO2014EP56504 | Priority number, date | EP20130165285 | 25.04.2013 Original published format: EP 13165285 | [2016/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014173638 | Date: | 30.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2989155 | Date: | 02.03.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2989155 | Date: | 03.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/549, C08L43/04, C08G18/22 | [2016/09] | CPC: |
C08K5/56 (EP,US);
C08K5/549 (EP,RU,US);
C08G18/22 (RU);
C08G18/289 (EP,US);
C08G18/4825 (EP,US);
C08G18/7671 (EP,US);
C08L43/04 (RU);
C09D175/04 (EP,US);
C09J175/04 (EP,US);
C08G2110/0008 (EP,US);
C08G2110/0016 (EP,US);
C08G2110/0025 (EP,US);
C08G2190/00 (EP,US);
C08G77/08 (US);
C08G77/16 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08K5/549, C08L43/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, UMFASSEND SILYLIERTE POLYMERE UND METALLISIERTE POLYHEDRISCHE OLIGOMERE SILSEQUIOXANE | [2018/16] | English: | COMPOSITION COMPRISING SILYLATED POLYMERS | [2016/09] | French: | COMPOSITION COMPRENANT DES POLYMÈRES SILYLÉS ET SILSESQUIOXANES OLIGOMÈRES POLYHÉDRIQUES MÉTALLISÉS | [2018/16] |
Former [2016/09] | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT SILYLIERTEN POLYMEREN | ||
Former [2016/09] | COMPOSITION COMPRENANT DES POLYMÈRES SILYLÉS | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/09] | 27.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.04.2014 | AL | 03.10.2018 | CY | 03.10.2018 | EE | 03.10.2018 | HR | 03.10.2018 | LT | 03.10.2018 | LV | 03.10.2018 | MC | 03.10.2018 | MK | 03.10.2018 | MT | 03.10.2018 | RO | 03.10.2018 | RS | 03.10.2018 | SM | 03.10.2018 | BG | 03.01.2019 | NO | 03.01.2019 | GR | 04.01.2019 | IS | 03.02.2019 | IE | 01.04.2019 | LU | 01.04.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 01.04.2014 | |
AL | 03.10.2018 | ||
CY | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
MT | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
IE | 01.04.2019 | ||
LU | 01.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 01.04.2014 | |
AL | 03.10.2018 | ||
CY | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
IE | 01.04.2019 | ||
LU | 01.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
CY | 03.10.2018 | ||
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
IE | 01.04.2019 | ||
LU | 01.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
IE | 01.04.2019 | ||
LU | 01.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
LU | 01.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/02] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
MC | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
EE | 03.10.2018 | ||
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
RO | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
SM | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 03.10.2018 | |
HR | 03.10.2018 | ||
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | HR | 03.10.2018 | |
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
RS | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | HR | 03.10.2018 | |
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
GR | 04.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | HR | 03.10.2018 | |
LT | 03.10.2018 | ||
LV | 03.10.2018 | ||
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | LT | 03.10.2018 | |
BG | 03.01.2019 | ||
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | LT | 03.10.2018 | |
NO | 03.01.2019 | ||
IS | 03.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 03.10.2018 | |
NO | 03.01.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US2002137625 (JOST CARSTEN [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,10,11,14-18 * paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0105] - paragraph [0112] * * page 4, paragraph 100; compound VIII * * examples 11-15 * [Y] 6-9 [I] 1-18; | [I]US2005192364 (LICHTENHAN JOSEPH D [US], et al) [I] 1-18 * figure 2 * * example 5 * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0040] *; | [Y]WO2007041344 (HYBRID PLASTICS INC [US]) [Y] 6-9 * example 3 * * figures 1,5 ** claims 1,3,6 *; | [IY]WO2008144735 (HYBRID PLASTICS INC [US]) [I] 1-18 * example 5 * * claims 1,2,6,14 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 6-9; | [IY]US2010125123 (LICHTENHAN JOSEPH D [US], et al) [I] 1-18 * example - * [Y] 6-9 | by applicant | US4131731 | US4333867 | US5994474 | WO03018704 | EP1396511 | DE102004055450 | WO2010013651 | DE102008054434 | WO2011075254 | WO2011161011 |