EP2972316 - BONE MARROW CONCENTRATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DePuy Synthes Products, Inc. 325 Paramount Drive Raynham, MA 02767 / US | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KERR, Sean 1230 Wilson Drive West Chester, Pennsylvania 19380 / US | 02 /
SMITH, Jay 1230 Wilson Drive West Chester, Pennsylvania 19380 / US | 03 /
MOORE, Meredith Hans 1230 Wilson Drive West Chester, Pennsylvania 19380 / US | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2016/03] | Application number, filing date | 14713995.0 | 05.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014US20469 | Priority number, date | US201313826332 | 14.03.2013 Original published format: US201313826332 | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014158836 | Date: | 02.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2972316 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/49, B01L3/00, B04B7/08, C12N5/07 | [2016/03] | CPC: |
A61M1/3693 (EP,US);
B01L3/5021 (EP,US);
B04B11/04 (EP,US);
B04B5/04 (EP,US);
B04B7/08 (EP,US);
G01N33/491 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Title | German: | KNOCHENMARKKONZENTRATOR | [2016/03] | English: | BONE MARROW CONCENTRATOR | [2016/03] | French: | CONCENTRATEUR DE MOELLE OSSEUSE | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 22.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/26] | 19.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.02.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2291117 (STREZYNSKI GEORGE J) [A] 1-22* the whole document *; | [A]US2488746 (STREZYNSKI GEORGE J) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2074047 (SHEELER PHILLIP, et al) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [A]US5188583 (GUIGAN JEAN [FR]) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4402041 (REMANE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [XYI]US2003059414 (HO TONY W [US], et al) [X] 23,25,27 * paragraphs [0048] , [0115] , [0116] * [Y] 28-30 [I] 26; | [XYI]US2008241171 (GENTRY TRACY [US], et al) [X] 23,25,27 * paragraph [0064] * [Y] 28-30 [I] 26; | [A]US2009289014 (HOEPPNER JACY C [US]) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2010069215 (LEE HEE-YOUNG [KR], et al) [X] 1-20,22 * paragraphs [0007] , [ 0015] , [ 0016] , [ 0066] , [ 0079] - paragraphs [0080] , [ 0083] - [0085] - [ 0102] , [ 0103] , [ 0113] , [ 0115] * * figures 3, 4, 6, 9-13 * [I] 5,21; | [A]US2011136648 (MERINO SANDRA PATRICIA [NL], et al) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [XYI]US2011223205 (GOSIEWSKA ANNA [US], et al) [X] 23-25,27 * paragraph [0279] * [Y] 28-30 [I] 26; | [XP]WO2013067038 (NEOSTEM INC [US], et al) [XP] 23,25,27 * paragraph [00211] *; | [XYI] - MARTINS A A ET AL, "Quantification and Immunophenotypic Characterization of Bone Marrow and Umbilical Cord Blood Mesenchymal Stem Cells by Multicolor Flow Cytometry", TRANSPLANTATION PROCEEDINGS, ELSEVIER INC, ORLANDO, FL; US, vol. 41, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.TRANSPROCEED.2009.01.059, ISSN 0041-1345, (20090401), pages 943 - 946, (20090417), XP026149970 [X] 23-25,27 * page 499, column left, line 11 - column right, line 10 * [Y] 28-30 [I] 26 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.transproceed.2009.01.059 |