EP2970874 - METHODS FOR INCREASING MANNOSE CONTENT OF RECOMBINANT PROTEINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2019 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amgen Inc. One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks, California 91320-1799 / US | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Jian 3117 216th Place SE Bothell, Washington 98021 / US | 02 /
DAVERN, Sean 2929 1st Avenue Unit 401 Seattle, Washington 98121 / US | 03 /
PETROVAN, Simina, Crina 23819 23rd Avenue West Bothell, Washington 98021 / US | 04 /
BRANDENSTEIN, Michael, Charles 14704 204th Place NE Woodinville, Washington 98077 / US | 05 /
LINDAHL, Katherine, Rose 4250 34th Avenue West Seattle, Washington 98199 / US | 06 /
LILLIE, Shawn, Erik 2418 43rd Avenue SE Puyallup, Washington 98374 / US | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | Dörries, Hans Ulrich df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | [2016/03] | Application number, filing date | 14714521.3 | 10.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014US22738 | Priority number, date | US201361784639P | 14.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361784639 P | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014159259 | Date: | 02.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2970874 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2970874 | Date: | 19.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/38, C12P21/00, C12N5/00, C07K16/00 | [2016/03] | CPC: |
C12P21/005 (EP,US);
C07K16/00 (EP,US);
C12N1/38 (EP,US);
C12N5/0037 (EP,US);
C07K2317/14 (EP,US);
C07K2317/41 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Extension states | BA | 14.10.2015 | ME | 14.10.2015 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERHÖHUNG DES MANNOSEGEHALTS REKOMBINANTER PROTEINE | [2016/03] | English: | METHODS FOR INCREASING MANNOSE CONTENT OF RECOMBINANT PROTEINS | [2016/03] | French: | MÉTHODES POUR AUGMENTER LA TENEUR EN MANNOSE DE PROTÉINES RECOMBINANTES | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 26.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18194714.4 / EP3434760 | EP22179111.4 / EP4141104 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 19.09.2018 | HR | 19.09.2018 | MK | 19.09.2018 | RS | 19.09.2018 | SM | 19.09.2018 | NO | 19.12.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2019/27] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | HR | 19.09.2018 | |
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | NO | 19.12.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XI]JPH06292592 (SNOW BRAND MILK PRODUCTS CO LTD) [X] 1-3,8,16,65-68 * the whole document * [I] 7,12-14,17; | [XI]WO9928455 (ROCHE DIAGNOSTICS GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-6,8,16,66,68 * examples 5,7 * [I] 7,12-14,17; | [XI]WO2004008100 (IMMUNEX CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-3,8,16,64-68 * example 1 * [I] 7,12-14,17; | [XI] - GRAMER M J ET AL, "Modulation of Antibody Galactosylation Through Feeding of Uridine, Manganese Chloride, and Galactose", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, WILEY & SONS, HOBOKEN, NJ, US, vol. 108, no. 7, doi:10.1002/BIT.23075, ISSN 0006-3592, (20110701), pages 1591 - 1602, (20110218), XP002688515 [X] 1,3-6,9-11,15,16,64-68 * table 1 * [I] 7,12-14,17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.23075 | [A] - WONG DANNY CHEE FURNG ET AL, "Impact of dynamic online fed-batch strategies on metabolism, productivity and N-glycosylation quality in CHO cell cultures", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, WILEY & SONS, HOBOKEN, NJ, US, (20050120), vol. 89, no. 2, ISSN 0006-3592, pages 164 - 177, XP009142862 [A] 1-68 * the whole document * | [A] - EFREN PACIS ET AL, "Effects of cell culture conditions on antibody N-linked glycosylation-what affects high mannose 5 glycoform", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, (20111001), vol. 108, no. 10, doi:10.1002/bit.23200, ISSN 0006-3592, pages 2348 - 2358, XP055080567 [A] 1-68 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.23200 | [A] - HILLS A E ET AL, "METABOLIC CONTROL OF RECOMBINANT MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY N-GLYCOSYLATION IN GS-NS0 CELLS", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, WILEY & SONS, HOBOKEN, NJ, US, (20011020), vol. 75, no. 2, doi:10.1002/BIT.10022, ISSN 0006-3592, pages 239 - 251, XP001206784 [A] 1-68 * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.10022 | [A] - JAMES 1 REARICKS ET AL, "Glucose Starvation Alters Lipid-linked Oligosaccharide Biosynthesis in Chinese Hamster Ovary Cells", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (19810625), vol. 256, no. 12, pages 6255 - 6261, XP055124811 [A] 1-68 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4695623 | AU588819B | US4897471 | EP0367566 | US4968607 | EP0460846 | US5075222 | US5149792 | US5272064 | WO9410308 | WO9428391 | US5395760 | WO9701633 | US5610279 | US5767064 | US5856296 | US5981713 | US6015938 | US6096728 | US6204363 | US6235883 | WO0136637 | US6271349 | US6337072 | US6544424 | WO2012145682 | WO2013006479 | US8354105 | - GOETZE ET AL., GLYCOBIOLOGY, (2011), vol. 21, pages 949 - 59 | - YU ET AL., MABS, (2012), vol. 4, pages 475 - 87 | - PACIS, BIOTECHNOL BIOENG, (2011), vol. 108, pages 2348 - 2358 | - CHEE FURNG WONG ET AL., BIOTECHNOL BIOENG, (2005), vol. 89, pages 164 - 177 | - AHN, BIOTECHNOL BIOENG, (2008), vol. 101, pages 1234 - 44 | - HUBBARD; IVATT, ANN. REV. BIOCHEM., (1981), vol. 50, pages 555 - 583 | - VOISARD ET AL., BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, (2003), vol. 82, pages 751 - 65 | - STETTLER, BIOTECHNOL BIOENG., (20061220), vol. 95, no. 6, pages 1228 - 33 | - KAUFMAN, R.J., LARGE SCALE MAMMALIAN CELL CULTURE, (1990), pages 15 - 69 | - BRASEL ET AL., BLOOD, (1996), vol. 88, pages 2004 - 2012 | - KAUFMAN ET AL., J. BIOL CHEM, (1988), vol. 263, pages 6352 - 6362 | - MCKINNON ET AL., J. MOL ENDOCRINOL, (1991), vol. 6, pages 231 - 239 | - WOOD ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1990), vol. 145, pages 3011 - 3016 | - URLAUB ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1980), vol. 77, pages 4216 - 4220 | - KAUFMAN R.J., METH ENZYMOL, (1990), vol. 185, pages 537 - 566 | - MAISONPIERRE ET AL., SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 277, no. 5322, pages 55 - 60 | - RUEGG; PYTELA, GENE, (1995), vol. 160, pages 257 - 62 | - THOMPSON AND LOTZE, The Cytokine Handbook, ACADEMIC PRESS, (2003), vol. 1, 2 | - DO; CHEN-KIANG, CVTOKINE GROWTH FACTOR REV., (2002), vol. 13, no. 1, pages 19 - 25 | - LOVEJOY ET AL., SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 259, pages 1288 - 1293 | - HARBURY ET AL., SCIENCE, (1993), vol. 262, pages 1401 - 05 | - HARBURY ET AL., NATURE, (1994), vol. 371, pages 80 - 83 | - HÅKANSSON ET AL., STRUCTURE, (1999), vol. 7, pages 255 - 64 | - SCHMELZER; MILLER, BIOTECHNOL. PROG., (2002), vol. 18, pages 346 - 353 | - SCHMELZER; MILLER, BIOTECHNOL. BIOENG, (20020215), vol. 77, no. 4 |