EP2989168 - PIGMENT COMPOSITION AND PIGMENT/RESIN MIXTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/09] | PIGMENT COMPOSITION AND PIGMENT /RESIN MIXTURE | ||
[2017/06] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2018 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.02.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.05.2018 [2018/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clariant International Ltd Rothausstrasse 61 4132 Muttenz / CH | [2016/40] |
Former [2016/09] | For all designated states CLARIANT INTERNATIONAL LTD Rothausstrasse 61 4132 Muttenz / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARADA, Daisuke Kanayasakecho 345-3 Shimada city, Shizuoka 428-0017 / JP | 02 /
ICHIHARA, Yuya Aino higashi 1-3-9 A101 Fukuroi city, Shizuoka 437-0039 / JP | [2016/09] | Representative(s) | Hütter, Klaus Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Patent Management Industriepark Höchst, G 860 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2016/09] | Application number, filing date | 14714591.6 | 25.03.2014 | [2016/09] | WO2014EP00807 | Priority number, date | JP20130093403 | 26.04.2013 Original published format: JP 2013093403 | [2016/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014173487 | Date: | 30.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2989168 | Date: | 02.03.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2989168 | Date: | 07.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C09B67/22 | [2016/09] | CPC: |
C08K5/0041 (EP,US);
C08J3/20 (US);
C08K5/3417 (EP,US);
C08K5/3437 (EP,US);
C08K5/3447 (EP,US);
C08K5/3462 (EP,US);
C09B67/0033 (EP,US);
C09B67/0041 (EP,US);
H01B3/30 (EP,US);
C08J2323/12 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [2017/16] |
Former [2016/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PIGMENTZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND PIGMENT-/HARZMISCHUNG | [2016/09] | English: | PIGMENT COMPOSITION AND PIGMENT/RESIN MIXTURE | [2017/06] | French: | COMPOSITION PIGMENTAIRE ET MÉLANGE PIGMENT/RÉSINE | [2016/09] |
Former [2016/09] | PIGMENT COMPOSITION AND PIGMENT /RESIN MIXTURE | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/09] | 28.01.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.09.2016 | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2000063699 ; | [X]JP2000007974 ; | [A]EP0866106 (CLARIANT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-9* page 1, line 1 - line 24 *; | [X]EP0937724 (CLARIANT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,7-9 * example 2b *; | [X]EP1106656 (TOYO INK MFG CO [JP]) [X] 1,2,7-9,19-21,26-29 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0006] * * claim - * * examples 2,3,4 * * page 10 *; | [X]EP1217045 (TOYO INK MFG CO [JP]) [X] 1,2,5-9,19-21,24-29 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 4 * * claim - * * page 19, line 35 - page 20, line 17 * * examples 1,1A,1B,1C,2,3 * * examples 3A,4 *; | [X]US2005119377 (ISHII TOMO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,7-12,16-22,26-30 * pigment composition C-1; page 8, column 2, paragraph 123 * * pigment composition C-5; page 8, column 2, paragraph 127 * * tables 1,2 *; | [D]JP2005187798 (TORAY INDUSTRIES); | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2000, no. 22, Database accession no. 2000-251708, XP002728142 & JP2000063699 A 20000229 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEM INC) [X] 1,2,7-9,19-21,26-29 * abstract * * examples 3-11,14,17-19 * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2000, no. 13, Database accession no. 2000-142778, XP002728143 & JP2000007974 A 20000111 (DAINIPPON INK&CHEM INC) [X] 1,2,7-9,19-21,26-29 * abstract * * examples 1-3 * |