EP3107819 - PACKAGE INCLUDING POURING SPOUT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/52] | POURING SPOUT AND PACKAGE INCLUDING THE SAME | ||
[2017/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.10.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | [2016/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CRAWFORD, John C. 809 South Lake Blvd Mahopac, NY 10541 / US | [2016/52] | Representative(s) | Schicker, Silvia Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/52] | Schicker, Silvia Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14716141.8 | 12.03.2014 | [2016/52] | WO2014US24583 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015137942 | Date: | 17.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3107819 | Date: | 28.12.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3107819 | Date: | 09.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B65D47/06, B65D47/12 | [2016/52] | CPC: |
B65D47/123 (EP,US);
B65D1/0246 (US);
B65D23/10 (US);
B65D25/42 (US);
B65D41/04 (US);
B65D41/26 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERPACKUNG MIT AUSGIESSTÜLLE | [2017/46] | English: | PACKAGE INCLUDING POURING SPOUT | [2017/46] | French: | EMBALLAGE COMPRENANT BEC VERSEUR | [2017/46] |
Former [2016/52] | AUSGIESSTÜLLE UND VERPACKUNG DAMIT | ||
Former [2016/52] | POURING SPOUT AND PACKAGE INCLUDING THE SAME | ||
Former [2016/52] | BEC VERSEUR ET EMBALLAGE COMPRENANT CELUI-CI | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/47] | 16.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.10.2017 | Opposition(s) | 12.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.03.2014 | AL | 09.05.2018 | AT | 09.05.2018 | CY | 09.05.2018 | CZ | 09.05.2018 | DK | 09.05.2018 | EE | 09.05.2018 | ES | 09.05.2018 | FI | 09.05.2018 | HR | 09.05.2018 | IT | 09.05.2018 | LT | 09.05.2018 | LV | 09.05.2018 | MC | 09.05.2018 | MK | 09.05.2018 | NL | 09.05.2018 | PL | 09.05.2018 | RO | 09.05.2018 | RS | 09.05.2018 | SE | 09.05.2018 | SI | 09.05.2018 | SK | 09.05.2018 | SM | 09.05.2018 | TR | 09.05.2018 | BG | 09.08.2018 | NO | 09.08.2018 | GR | 10.08.2018 | IS | 09.09.2018 | PT | 10.09.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 12.03.2014 | |
AL | 09.05.2018 | ||
AT | 09.05.2018 | ||
CY | 09.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
TR | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
IS | 09.09.2018 | ||
PT | 10.09.2018 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 09.05.2018 | |
AT | 09.05.2018 | ||
CY | 09.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
TR | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
IS | 09.09.2018 | ||
PT | 10.09.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 09.05.2018 | |
AT | 09.05.2018 | ||
CY | 09.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
TR | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
PT | 10.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 09.05.2018 | |
AT | 09.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
TR | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
PT | 10.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 09.05.2018 | |
AT | 09.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
TR | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 09.05.2018 | |
AT | 09.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 09.05.2018 | |
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
MC | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 09.05.2018 | |
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SI | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 09.05.2018 | |
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
IT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
SM | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 09.05.2018 | |
CZ | 09.05.2018 | ||
DK | 09.05.2018 | ||
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
PL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RO | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
SK | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 09.05.2018 | |
EE | 09.05.2018 | ||
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 09.05.2018 | |
ES | 09.05.2018 | ||
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | ES | 09.05.2018 | |
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
NL | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
GR | 10.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | ES | 09.05.2018 | |
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
LV | 09.05.2018 | ||
RS | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | ES | 09.05.2018 | |
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
HR | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | ES | 09.05.2018 | |
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
SE | 09.05.2018 | ||
BG | 09.08.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 09.05.2018 | |
FI | 09.05.2018 | ||
LT | 09.05.2018 | ||
NO | 09.08.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB883723 (CHARLES JAMES LAWRENCE) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19714734 (ROENN THOMAS VON [DE]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [XAI]WO2012146885 (OBRIST CLOSURES SWITZERLAND [CH], et al) [X] 1,2,10,12,13,15,16,20-22 * page 1, line 8 - page 3, line 3 * * page 5, line 13 * * page 6, line 14 - line 22; figures 1-20 * [A] 4-9,17 [I] 3,11,14,18,19; | [X]WO2013165405 (APTARGROUP INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 9, line 1; figures 8-11 * |