EP3003192 - MYOCARDIAL ABLATION BY IRREVERSIBLE ELECTROPORATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.2020 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tel HaShomer Medical Research Infrastructure and Services Ltd. The Chaim Sheba Medical Center Tel HaShomer 5262000 Ramat Gan / IL | [2016/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAOR, Elad 3 Abba Kovner Street Apt. 8 6937330 Tel-Aviv / IL | [2016/15] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/15] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 14716433.9 | 05.03.2014 | [2016/15] | WO2014IL50219 | Priority number, date | US201361956283P | 05.06.2013 Original published format: US 201361956283 P | [2016/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014195933 | Date: | 11.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3003192 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/14, A61B18/00 | [2016/15] | CPC: |
A61B18/1492 (EP,US);
A61B2018/0022 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00267 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00351 (US);
A61B2018/00357 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00577 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00613 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00761 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00767 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] | Title | German: | MYOKARDIALE ABLATION DURCH IRREVERSIBLE ELEKTROPORATION | [2016/15] | English: | MYOCARDIAL ABLATION BY IRREVERSIBLE ELECTROPORATION | [2016/15] | French: | ABLATION MYOCARDIQUE PAR ÉLECTROPORATION IRRÉVERSIBLE | [2016/15] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 08.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/10] | 15.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.05.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0117451 (BARD INC C R [US]) [A] 31,32* page 10, line 21 - line 24 *; | [XI]US2005261672 (DEEM MARK [US], et al) [X] 22-31,34,37-39 * paragraphs [0061] , [0062] - [0064]; figures 8,9 * [I] 35,36,40,41; | [XI]US2013030430 (STEWART MARK T [US], et al) [X] 22-30,33,34,37-39,42-44,46,47 * paragraphs [0029] , [3035] , [0036] , [0041]; figures 2-5 * [I] 31,32,35,36,40,41,45,48-50; | [XI]US2013030425 (STEWART MARK T [US], et al) [X] 22-30,33,34,37-39,42-44,46,47 * paragraphs [0044] , [0049]; figure 8 * [I] 35,36,40,41,48-50 |