EP2986749 - COLD REDUCED ENAMELLING STEEL SHEET, METHOD FOR ITS PRODUCTION, AND USE OF SUCH STEEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.2019 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.11.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tata Steel IJmuiden B.V. Wenckebachstraat 1 1951 JZ Velsen-Noord / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2016/08] | For all designated states Tata Steel IJmuiden BV Wenckebachstraat 1 1951 JZ Velsen-Noord / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN KREVEL, Joost Willem Hendrik Tata Steel Nederland Technology B.V. Group Intellectual Property Services - 3G.37 P.O. Box 10000 NL-1970 CA IJmuiden / NL | 02 /
VAN DUIJN, Ronald Tata Steel Nederland Technology B.V. Group Intellectual Property Services - 3G.37 P.O. Box 10000 NL-1970 CA IJmuiden / NL | [2016/08] | Representative(s) | Kruit, Jan Tata Steel Nederland Technology B.V. Group Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 10000 1970 CA IJmuiden / NL | [2018/12] |
Former [2016/08] | Kruit, Jan Tata Steel Group Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 10000 1970 CA IJmuiden / NL | Application number, filing date | 14717774.5 | 15.04.2014 | [2016/08] | WO2014EP57601 | Priority number, date | EP20130001949 | 15.04.2013 Original published format: EP 13001949 | [2016/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014170315 | Date: | 23.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2986749 | Date: | 24.02.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2986749 | Date: | 21.03.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C21D8/02, C22C38/02, C22C38/06, C21D9/46, C22C38/00, C22C38/04, C22C38/16 | [2017/46] | CPC: |
C21D8/0273 (EP);
C21D9/46 (EP);
C22C38/001 (EP);
C22C38/002 (EP);
C22C38/004 (EP);
C22C38/02 (EP);
C22C38/04 (EP);
C22C38/06 (EP);
C22C38/16 (EP);
C21D8/0278 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/08] | C22C38/00, C22C38/04, C22C38/16, C21D9/46, C21C7/06, C23D5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KALTGEWALZTES EMAILLIERTES STAHLBLECH, VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG, UND VERWENDUNG EINES SOLCHEN STAHLS | [2017/46] | English: | COLD REDUCED ENAMELLING STEEL SHEET, METHOD FOR ITS PRODUCTION, AND USE OF SUCH STEEL | [2016/08] | French: | FEUILLE D'ACIER À ÉMAILLAGE RÉDUIT À FROID, SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION ET UTILISATION D'UN TEL ACIER | [2017/46] |
Former [2016/08] | KALTGEWALZTES EMAILLIERTES STAHLBLECH, VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG SOLCH EINES STAHLS | ||
Former [2016/08] | TÔLE D'ACIER POUR ÉMAILLAGE RÉDUITE À FROID, PROCÉDÉ POUR SA PRODUCTION ET UTILISATION D'UN TEL ACIER | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/08] | 23.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.04.2014 | AL | 21.03.2018 | CY | 21.03.2018 | CZ | 21.03.2018 | DK | 21.03.2018 | EE | 21.03.2018 | HR | 21.03.2018 | LT | 21.03.2018 | LV | 21.03.2018 | MC | 21.03.2018 | MK | 21.03.2018 | NL | 21.03.2018 | PL | 21.03.2018 | RO | 21.03.2018 | RS | 21.03.2018 | SI | 21.03.2018 | SK | 21.03.2018 | SM | 21.03.2018 | IE | 15.04.2018 | LU | 15.04.2018 | MT | 15.04.2018 | BG | 21.06.2018 | NO | 21.06.2018 | GR | 22.06.2018 | IS | 21.07.2018 | PT | 23.07.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 15.04.2014 | |
AL | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
MK | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
IE | 15.04.2018 | ||
LU | 15.04.2018 | ||
MT | 15.04.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 15.04.2014 | |
AL | 21.03.2018 | ||
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
IE | 15.04.2018 | ||
LU | 15.04.2018 | ||
MT | 15.04.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
IE | 15.04.2018 | ||
LU | 15.04.2018 | ||
MT | 15.04.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SI | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
IE | 15.04.2018 | ||
LU | 15.04.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
IE | 15.04.2018 | ||
LU | 15.04.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
DK | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
LU | 15.04.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/06] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
MC | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
PT | 23.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
SM | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2018 | ||
EE | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
PL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RO | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
SK | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 21.03.2018 | |
CY | 21.03.2018 | ||
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | CY | 21.03.2018 | |
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
NL | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CY | 21.03.2018 | |
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
LV | 21.03.2018 | ||
RS | 21.03.2018 | ||
BG | 21.06.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 21.03.2018 | |
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | ||
GR | 22.06.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 21.03.2018 | |
HR | 21.03.2018 | ||
LT | 21.03.2018 | ||
NO | 21.06.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP1233079 (CORUS STAAL BV [NL]) [X] 1,3-11 * paragraph [0025] - paragraphs [0029] , [ 0031] * [I] 12-14; | [A]US5855696 (TEZUKA MAKOTO [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [T] - Wikipedia, "Whiteboard - History", (20130826), URL: http://en.wikipedia.org/wiki/Whiteboard, (20130829), XP002711937 [T] 1-14 * sequence History * | [T] - Jared L. Sommer, "Low-Cost Enamel Coatings on Stainless Steel Foil for Thin Film Photovoltaics", (20021231), URL: http://www.sbir.gov/sbirsearch/detail/311030, (20130829), XP002711938 [T] 1-14 * abstract * | by applicant | EP1336665 |