EP2986649 - THERMOPLASTIC MOULDING MATERIALS BASED ON ACRYLONITRILE, STYRENE AND BUTADIENE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2019 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.02.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INEOS Styrolution Group GmbH Mainzer Landstrasse 50 60325 Frankfurt / DE | [2018/31] |
Former [2016/08] | For all designated states Styrolution Group GmbH Erlenstrasse 2 60325 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIESSNER, Norbert Im Haag 17 67159 Friedelsheim / DE | 02 /
AHN, SangJun Ogeum-ro 35-gil 17 Hyundai Apt 21-204 Songpa-gu Seoul 05658 / KR | 03 /
WALKER, Roland Lürmannstr. 3 49076 Osnabrück / DE | 04 /
PEPERS, Michel Ooievaarstraat 17 NL-5941 JH Velden / NL | 05 /
BANASZAK, Brian J. N 3,3 68161 Mannheim / DE | 06 /
BARTH, Johannes Gärtnerweg 28 63110 Rodgau / DE | 07 /
MICHELS, Gisbert Kuhlmannweg 8 51375 Leverkusen / DE | 08 /
PATCAS, Florian Lausitzerstrasse 5 67065 Ludwigshafen / DE | 09 /
HWANG, YoungHwa c/o Styrolution Korea Ltd. 472-9 Sangge-dong Nam-gu Ulsan Ulsan 680-180 / KR | 10 /
VERSTRAETEN, Rudy Oudstrijdersstraat 15 B-2340 Beerse / BE | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/08] | 01 /
NIESSNER, Norbert Im Haag 17 67159 Friedelsheim / DE | ||
02 /
AHN, SangJun Ogeum-ro 35-gil 17 Hyundai Apt 21-204 Songpa-gu Seoul 138-740 / KR | |||
03 /
WALKER, Roland Lenaustrasse 4 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
04 /
PEPERS, Michel Dorperveldstraat 64 NL-5941 DB Velden / NL | |||
05 /
BANASZAK, Brian J. N 3 3 68161 Mannheim / DE | |||
06 /
BARTH, Johannes Goethestrasse 15 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
07 /
MICHELS, Gisbert Kuhlmannweg 8 51375 Leverkusen / DE | |||
08 /
PATCAS, Florian Lausitzerstrasse 5 67065 Ludwigshafen / DE | |||
09 /
HWANG, YoungHwa c/o Styrolution Korea Ltd. 472-9 Sangge-dong Nam-gu Ulsan Ulsan 680-180 / KR | |||
10 /
VERSTRAETEN, Rudy Oudstrijdersstraat 15 B-2340 Beerse / BE | Representative(s) | Jacobi, Markus Alexander, et al Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstraße 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/08] | Jacobi, Markus Alexander Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 14718101.0 | 16.04.2014 | [2016/08] | WO2014EP57824 | Priority number, date | EP20130164273 | 18.04.2013 Original published format: EP 13164273 | [2016/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014170407 | Date: | 23.10.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2986649 | Date: | 24.02.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2986649 | Date: | 01.08.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C08F265/04, C08F285/00, C08F279/02, C08L55/02, C08L25/12, C08F2/26 | [2018/10] | CPC: |
C08F265/04 (EP,US);
C08F2/26 (EP,US);
C08F279/02 (EP,US);
C08F279/04 (US);
C08F285/00 (EP,US);
C08L25/12 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08F265/04, C08F220/56 (EP,US);
C08F265/04, C08F236/06, C08F212/08 (EP);
C08F279/02, C08F212/08 (US,EP);
C08F279/02, C08F220/44 (US,EP);
C08F285/00, C08F212/08 (US,EP);
C08F285/00, C08F220/44 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2016/08] | C08F2/24, C08F265/04, C08F279/02, C08F285/00, C08L25/12, C08L55/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | THERMOPLASTISCHE FORMMASSEN AUF BASIS VON ACRYLNITRIL, STYROL UND BUTADIEN | [2016/08] | English: | THERMOPLASTIC MOULDING MATERIALS BASED ON ACRYLONITRILE, STYRENE AND BUTADIENE | [2016/08] | French: | MATIÈRES À MOULER THERMOPLASTIQUES À BASE D'ACRYLNITRILE STYRÈNE ET BUTADIÈNE | [2016/08] | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/08] | 25.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.04.2014 | AL | 01.08.2018 | CY | 01.08.2018 | CZ | 01.08.2018 | DK | 01.08.2018 | EE | 01.08.2018 | FI | 01.08.2018 | HR | 01.08.2018 | LT | 01.08.2018 | LV | 01.08.2018 | MC | 01.08.2018 | MK | 01.08.2018 | MT | 01.08.2018 | PL | 01.08.2018 | RO | 01.08.2018 | RS | 01.08.2018 | SE | 01.08.2018 | SI | 01.08.2018 | SK | 01.08.2018 | SM | 01.08.2018 | TR | 01.08.2018 | BG | 01.11.2018 | NO | 01.11.2018 | GR | 02.11.2018 | IS | 01.12.2018 | PT | 01.12.2018 | AT | 16.04.2019 | IE | 16.04.2019 | LU | 16.04.2019 | CH | 30.04.2019 | LI | 30.04.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 16.04.2014 | |
AL | 01.08.2018 | ||
CY | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
MT | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
TR | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
PT | 01.12.2018 | ||
AT | 16.04.2019 | ||
IE | 16.04.2019 | ||
LU | 16.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 16.04.2014 | |
AL | 01.08.2018 | ||
CY | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
TR | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
PT | 01.12.2018 | ||
AT | 16.04.2019 | ||
IE | 16.04.2019 | ||
LU | 16.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
CY | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
TR | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
PT | 01.12.2018 | ||
AT | 16.04.2019 | ||
IE | 16.04.2019 | ||
LU | 16.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
TR | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
PT | 01.12.2018 | ||
AT | 16.04.2019 | ||
IE | 16.04.2019 | ||
LU | 16.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
TR | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
PT | 01.12.2018 | ||
IE | 16.04.2019 | ||
LU | 16.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
TR | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
IE | 16.04.2019 | ||
LU | 16.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
TR | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
LU | 16.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
LU | 16.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
LU | 16.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/02] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 01.08.2018 | |
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 01.08.2018 | |
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 01.08.2018 | |
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 01.08.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0579140 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * example 1; claims 1, 2 *; | [A]DE19752394 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-15* examples 1, 2; claims 1-9 *; | [XD]DE102005022632 (BASF AG [DE]) [XD] 1-15 * paragraphs [0015] , [ 0021] , [ 0031] , [ 0034] , [ 0036] , [ 0051] , [ 0055]; claims 1-26; tables 1, 4-6, 12 *; | [XD]DE102005022635 (BASF AG [DE]) [XD] 1-15 * paragraphs [0038] , [ 0048] , [ 0051] , [ 0052] , [ 0056] , [ 070]; claims 1-13; table 6 * |