EP2981948 - INSPECTION OF A SECURITY ELEMENT PROVIDED WITH MAGNETIC MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.05.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.01.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Giesecke+Devrient Currency Technology GmbH Prinzregentenstrasse 161 81677 München / DE | [2023/10] |
Former [2017/33] | For all designated states Giesecke+Devrient Currency Technology GmbH Prinzregentenstraße 159 81677 München / DE | ||
Former [2016/06] | For all designated states Giesecke & Devrient GmbH Prinzregentenstrasse 159 81677 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAUL, Elisabeth Kapellenweg 61 83064 Raubling / DE | 02 /
STÖCKLI, Armin Hausmattstrasse 9e CH-3063 Ittigen / CH | [2016/06] | Representative(s) | Giesecke+Devrient IP Prinzregentenstraße 161 81677 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/23] | Giesecke + Devrient IP Prinzregentenstraße 159 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14718323.0 | 03.04.2014 | [2016/06] | WO2014EP00890 | Priority number, date | DE201310205891 | 03.04.2013 Original published format: DE102013205891 | [2016/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014161668 | Date: | 09.10.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2981948 | Date: | 10.02.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2981948 | Date: | 08.06.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G07D7/04 | [2016/06] | CPC: |
G07D7/04 (EP,US);
G06K7/087 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PRÜFUNG EINES MIT MAGNETMATERIALIEN VERSEHENEN SICHERHEITSELEMENTS | [2016/06] | English: | INSPECTION OF A SECURITY ELEMENT PROVIDED WITH MAGNETIC MATERIALS | [2016/06] | French: | CONTRÔLE D'UN ÉLÉMENT DE SÉCURITÉ CONTENANT DES MATÉRIAUX MAGNÉTIQUES | [2016/06] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/06] | 31.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.04.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 08.06.2022 | CZ | 08.06.2022 | DK | 08.06.2022 | EE | 08.06.2022 | ES | 08.06.2022 | FI | 08.06.2022 | HR | 08.06.2022 | LT | 08.06.2022 | LV | 08.06.2022 | MC | 08.06.2022 | PL | 08.06.2022 | RO | 08.06.2022 | RS | 08.06.2022 | SE | 08.06.2022 | SI | 08.06.2022 | SK | 08.06.2022 | SM | 08.06.2022 | BG | 08.09.2022 | NO | 08.09.2022 | GR | 09.09.2022 | IS | 08.10.2022 | [2024/08] |
Former [2023/25] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SI | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
DK | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 08.06.2022 | |
CZ | 08.06.2022 | ||
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | CZ | 08.06.2022 | |
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
IS | 08.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | CZ | 08.06.2022 | |
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
PL | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | CZ | 08.06.2022 | |
EE | 08.06.2022 | ||
ES | 08.06.2022 | ||
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
RO | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
SK | 08.06.2022 | ||
SM | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | ES | 08.06.2022 | |
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
RS | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | ES | 08.06.2022 | |
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
HR | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
LV | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
BG | 08.09.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | ||
GR | 09.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | ES | 08.06.2022 | |
FI | 08.06.2022 | ||
LT | 08.06.2022 | ||
SE | 08.06.2022 | ||
NO | 08.09.2022 | Cited in | International search | [ID]DE102011106263 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [ID] 1-15* paragraphs [0041] - [0053]; figure - *; | [XI]DE102011110138 (MEAS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,10-15 * paragraphs [0002] , [00 4] , [0 21] , [0 84] , [0 86] , [0 89] , [0 92]; figures 1, 7 * [I] 4-9 | Examination | US2012160632 |