EP2986345 - COMPOSITION COMPRISING OIL, FATTY ACIDS, SUPERFICIALLY ACTIVE AGENTS ON THE BASIS OF AMINO ACIDS, AND N-METHYL-N-ACYLGLUCAMINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/08] | COMPOSITION CONTAINING OIL BODIES, FATTY ACIDS, AMINO ACID SURFACTANTS, AND N-METHYL-N-ACYLGLUCAMINES | ||
[2016/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.04.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.12.2016 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clariant International Ltd Rothausstrasse 61 4132 Muttenz / CH | [2016/40] |
Former [2016/08] | For all designated states Clariant International Ltd. Rothausstrasse 61 4132 Muttenz / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLUG, Peter Schwarzwaldstrasse 1 63762 Grossostheim / DE | 02 /
MILDNER, Carina Bergstrasse 15 65366 Geisenheim / DE | 03 /
BAUER, Martin Poststrasse 22 60329 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2017/24] |
Former [2016/08] | 01 /
KLUG, Peter Schwarzwaldstrasse 1 63762 Gro ostheim / DE | ||
02 /
MILDNER, Carina Bechtenwaldstrasse 92 65931 Frankfurt am Main / DE | |||
03 /
BAUER, Martin Poststrasse 22 60329 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Representative(s) | Holmes, Rosalind Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Patent & License Management Chemicals Industriepark Höchst, G 860 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2017/24] |
Former [2016/08] | Holmes, Rosalind Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Patent & License Management Industriepark Höchst, G 860 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 14718513.6 | 16.04.2014 | [2016/08] | WO2014EP01022 | Priority number, date | DE20131006879 | 20.04.2013 Original published format: DE102013006879 | [2016/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014170025 | Date: | 23.10.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2986345 | Date: | 24.02.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2986345 | Date: | 14.06.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/41, A61K8/44, A61K8/06, A61K8/31, A61K8/36, A61Q19/10, A61Q5/02, A61K8/37, A61Q1/02, A61K8/60, A61K8/89, A61K8/92, A61Q19/00 | [2016/44] | CPC: |
A61K8/31 (EP,US);
A61K8/92 (US);
A61K8/062 (EP,US);
A61K8/361 (EP,US);
A61K8/37 (EP,US);
A61K8/375 (EP,US);
A61K8/41 (EP,US);
A61K8/416 (US);
A61K8/44 (EP,US);
A61K8/466 (US);
A61K8/60 (US);
A61K8/891 (EP,US);
A61K8/922 (EP,US);
A61Q1/02 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/08] | A61Q5/02, A61Q19/10, A61K8/31, A61K8/36, A61K8/41, A61K8/44, A61K8/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ENTHALTEND ÖLKÖRPER, FETTSÄUREN, AMINOSÄURETENSIDE UND N-METHYL-N-ACYLGLUCAMINE | [2016/08] | English: | COMPOSITION COMPRISING OIL, FATTY ACIDS, SUPERFICIALLY ACTIVE AGENTS ON THE BASIS OF AMINO ACIDS, AND N-METHYL-N-ACYLGLUCAMINES | [2016/44] | French: | COMPOSITION CONTENANT HUILE, ACIDES GRAS, LES TENSIOACTIFS SUR LA BASE D'AMINOACIDES, ET N-MÉTHYL-N-ACYLGLUCAMINES. | [2016/44] |
Former [2016/08] | COMPOSITION CONTAINING OIL BODIES, FATTY ACIDS, AMINO ACID SURFACTANTS, AND N-METHYL-N-ACYLGLUCAMINES | ||
Former [2016/08] | COMPOSITION CONTENANT DES CORPS HUILEUX, DES ACIDES GRAS, DES AMINOACIDES TENSIOACTIFS ET DES N-MÉTHYL-N-ACYLGLUCAMINES | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/08] | 01.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 09.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.04.2014 | AL | 14.06.2017 | CY | 14.06.2017 | CZ | 14.06.2017 | DK | 14.06.2017 | EE | 14.06.2017 | FI | 14.06.2017 | HR | 14.06.2017 | LT | 14.06.2017 | LV | 14.06.2017 | MC | 14.06.2017 | MK | 14.06.2017 | MT | 14.06.2017 | NL | 14.06.2017 | PL | 14.06.2017 | PT | 14.06.2017 | RO | 14.06.2017 | RS | 14.06.2017 | SE | 14.06.2017 | SI | 14.06.2017 | SK | 14.06.2017 | SM | 14.06.2017 | TR | 14.06.2017 | BG | 14.09.2017 | NO | 14.09.2017 | GR | 15.09.2017 | IS | 14.10.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 16.04.2014 | |
CY | 14.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
MK | 14.06.2017 | ||
MT | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PT | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
TR | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 16.04.2014 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
MT | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PT | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
TR | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2020/28] | CZ | 14.06.2017 | |
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
MT | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PT | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
TR | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | CZ | 14.06.2017 | |
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
MT | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
TR | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CZ | 14.06.2017 | |
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
MT | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 14.06.2017 | |
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MT | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CZ | 14.06.2017 | |
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 14.06.2017 | |
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | CZ | 14.06.2017 | |
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
SM | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 14.06.2017 | |
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 14.06.2017 | |
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | FI | 14.06.2017 | |
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | FI | 14.06.2017 | |
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
RS | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | FI | 14.06.2017 | |
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [I]WO9951716 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [I] 1-21 * examples 33-40 *; | [X]US6903057 (TSAUR LIANG SHENG [US]) [X] 1-21 * examples 1-7 * * examples 8-16 * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0070] * * example 24 *; | [I]EP1716842 (COGNIS IP MAN GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-21* table 1 * |