EP2983574 - CLEANING TEXTILE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.03.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Freudenberg KG Höhnerweg 2-4 69469 Weinheim / DE | [2016/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIBIS, Karl-Ludwig Ruppertsberger Strasse 4 67117 Limburgerhof / DE | 02 /
WINTERLING, Friedel Königstrasse 85 67067 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
PHILIPP, Dieter Rindweg 1 69198 Schriesheim / DE | 04 /
TROGER, Diana Bleichstrasse 19 67157 Wachenheim / DE | [2016/07] | Application number, filing date | 14719613.3 | 04.04.2014 | [2016/07] | WO2014EP00897 | Priority number, date | DE20131006191 | 11.04.2013 Original published format: DE102013006191 | [2016/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014166610 | Date: | 16.10.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2983574 | Date: | 17.02.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A47L13/16, D04B21/02, D04B21/16 | [2016/07] | CPC: |
A47L13/16 (EP);
D04B21/165 (EP);
D10B2403/02412 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/07] | Title | German: | REINIGUNGSTEXTIL UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [2016/07] | English: | CLEANING TEXTILE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2016/07] | French: | TEXTILE DE NETTOYAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2016/07] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/07] | 01.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/15] | 29.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2012030893 (WILDEMAN MARTIN [US] ET AL) [X] 1-5,7-12 * paragraphs [0004] , [0009] , [0016] , [0037] , [0040] , [0041] , [0043] , [0046] , [0063] , [0067]; figures 1,7,8; claims 1,13 * [Y] 6; | [YA]US2012060312 (KUBES MICHAEL J [US]) [Y] 6 * paragraphs [0011] , [0012] , [0028]; figure 2; table 1 * [A] 1,5; | [A]GB2145124 (COSMOPOLITAN TEXTILE CO LTD) [A] 1-4,7-11 * page 1, lines 24-24, 44-47, 56-62, 83-85, 91-93; figures 1-3; claims 1,3,5,7,12 * |