EP2968888 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DRUG DELIVERY TO A TARGET SITE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.01.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 15.02.2023 [2023/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ekos Corporation 11911 North Creek Parkway South Bothell, WA 98011 / US | [2016/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KERSTEN, Jocelyn 11416 102nd Court NE Kirkland, WA 98033 / US | 02 /
GENSTLER, Curtis 17221 Butler Road Snohomish, WA 98290 / US | 03 /
WOLNIEWICZ, Raymond, M. III 16508 NE 134th Place Redmond, WA 98052 / US | 04 /
HANSMANN, Douglas, R. 5008 Rockaway Beach Road NE Bainbridge Island, WA 98110 / US | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/03] | BTG plc Intellectual Property Group 5 Fleet Place London EC4M 7RD / GB | Application number, filing date | 14719895.6 | 10.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014US22797 | Priority number, date | US201361781750P | 14.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361781750 P | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014159274 | Date: | 02.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2968888 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61M37/00, A61B17/22 | [2016/03] | CPC: |
A61M37/0092 (EP,US);
A61M25/0021 (US);
A61M25/0026 (US);
A61M25/0043 (US);
A61M25/007 (US);
A61M25/0071 (EP,US);
A61M27/00 (EP,US);
A61M5/142 (US);
A61B2017/22088 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0002 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0078 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3334 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ARZNEIMITTELVERABREICHUNG AN EINEN ZIELORT | [2016/03] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DRUG DELIVERY TO A TARGET SITE | [2016/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR L'ADMINISTRATION DE MÉDICAMENT À UN SITE CIBLE | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 08.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 28.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.11.2022 | 27.09.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/07] | 07.10.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/07] | 10.11.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.08.2019 | Request for further processing for: | 28.07.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 28.07.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.08.2016 | Decision despatched | 28.07.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 28.07.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.08.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5630837 (CROWLEY ROBERT J [US]) [A] 11,15-17 * figures 1,2,4-6,9 * * column 1, line 38 - line 61 * * column 2, line 38 - line 56 * * column 3, line 48 - column 5, line 56 ** column 6, line 26 - line 47 *; | [XI]US2008319376 (WILCOX ROBERT L [US], et al) [X] 11-13 * figures 1-7, 9, 11 * * paragraphs [0011] , [0045] - [0046] - [0054] - [0062] - [ 100] - [0102] - [ 109] * [I] 14-17; | [A]US2012059285 (SOLTANI AZITA [US], et al) [A] 11-17 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2012209116 (HOSSACK JOHN A [US], et al) [X] 11,12 * figures 1,4,12 * * paragraphs [0036] , [0164] - [0167] - [0211] - [0216] * [I] 13,14 |