EP2965242 - CONTEXT HEALTH DETERMINATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 31.07.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 02.09.2020 [2020/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARRIS Enterprises LLC 3871 Lakefield Drive Suwanee, GA 30024 / US | [2017/31] |
Former [2016/13] | For all designated states Arris Enterprises, Inc. 3871 Lakefield Drive Suwanee, Georgia 30024 / US | ||
Former [2016/02] | For all designated states Arris Technology, Inc. 3871 Lakefield Drive Suwanee Georgia 30024 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOU, Di 18400 W. IL Route 120 Apt. 311 Grayslake, Illinois 60030 / US | 02 /
ALI, Mir F. 103 Dahlia Court Rolling Meadow, Illinois 60008 / US | 03 /
DAVIS, Paul C. 304 E. Grove Street Arlington Heights, Illinois 60005 / US | 04 /
LI, Jianguo 2541 N. Racine Avenue Unit 2 Chicago, Illinois 60614 / US | 05 /
RUSSELL, Dale W. 32 W. Fern Court 115 Palatine, Illinois 60067 / US | [2016/02] | Representative(s) | Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham, Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | [2016/02] | Application number, filing date | 14719896.4 | 11.03.2014 | [2016/02] | WO2014US22883 | Priority number, date | US201313798337 | 13.03.2013 Original published format: US201313798337 | [2016/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014164577 | Date: | 09.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2965242 | Date: | 13.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00, A61B5/00 | [2016/02] | CPC: |
G08C19/16 (EP,KR,US);
G16H50/80 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/02] | Title | German: | KONTEXTGESUNDHEITSBESTIMMUNGSSYSTEM | [2016/02] | English: | CONTEXT HEALTH DETERMINATION SYSTEM | [2016/02] | French: | SYSTÈME DE DÉTERMINATION DE SANTÉ DE CONTEXTE | [2016/02] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/02] | 12.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.02.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 20.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/36] | 29.06.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/36] | Appeal following examination | 21.04.2020 | Appeal received No. T1620/20 | 29.06.2020 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.11.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2009059246 (EMSENSE CORP [US], et al) [I] 1-20 * abstract * * page 5, paragraph 6 - page 8, paragraph 1 * * page 15, paragraph 3 - page 16, paragraph 1 * * page 1, paragraph 4 ** page 4, paragraph 10 *; | [I]US2011301433 (SADOWSKY RICHARD SCOTT [US], et al) [I] 1-20 * abstract * * page 3, column 1, paragraph 29 - paragraph 30; claims 1,10 * * page 3, column 2, paragraph 34 - page 4, column 1 * | Examination | - Shyamal Patel ET AL, "A review of wearable sensors and systems with application in rehabilitation", JOURNAL OF NEUROENGINEERING AND REHABILITATION, GB, (20120101), vol. 9, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1743-0003-9-21, ISSN 1743-0003, page 21, XP055255817 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1743-0003-9-21 |