EP2981262 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS USING 4-AMINO-2-(2,6-DIOXO-PIPERIDINE-3-YL)-ISOINDOLINE-1,3-DIONE FOR TREATMENT AND MANAGEMENT OF CENTRAL NERVOUS SYSTEM CANCERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.12.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.01.2020 [2020/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Celgene Corporation 86 Morris Avenue Summit, NJ 07901 / US | [2016/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TUN, Han, W. 7717 Watermark Lane S. Jacksonville, FL 32256 / US | [2016/06] | Representative(s) | Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [2016/06] | Application number, filing date | 14720035.6 | 01.04.2014 | [2016/06] | WO2014US32483 | Priority number, date | US201361807605P | 02.04.2013 Original published format: US 201361807605 P | [2016/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014165482 | Date: | 09.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2981262 | Date: | 10.02.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/454, A61K31/573, A61K39/395, A61K45/06, A61P35/00 | [2016/06] | CPC: |
A61K31/454 (EP,US);
A61K31/573 (EP,US);
A61K39/3955 (US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/454, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/573, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/06] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT 4-AMINO-2-(2,6-DIOXO-PIPERIDIN-3-YL)-ISOINDOLIN-1,3-DION ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KREBSERKRANKUNGEN DES ZENTRALNERVENSYSTEMS | [2016/06] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS USING 4-AMINO-2-(2,6-DIOXO-PIPERIDINE-3-YL)-ISOINDOLINE-1,3-DIONE FOR TREATMENT AND MANAGEMENT OF CENTRAL NERVOUS SYSTEM CANCERS | [2016/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET COMPOSITIONS UTILISANT DE LA 4-AMINO-2-(2,6-DIOXO-PIPÉRIDINE-3-YL)-ISOINDOLINE-1,3-DIONE POUR LE TRAITEMENT ET LA GESTION DE CANCERS DU SYSTÈME NERVEUX CENTRAL | [2016/06] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/06] | 19.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [E]WO2014071280 (CELGENE CORP [US]) [E] 1,3,6,8,10,25,26 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [00130] * * paragraph [00148] * * claims 45-50 *; | [XI]WO2010135396 (CELGENE CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6-11 * the whole document, in particular page 1, lines 5-7; page 5, line 31; page 29, lines 6-18 * [I] 2,5,12-27; | [XI]WO02064083 (CHILDRENS MEDICAL CENTER [US], et al) [X] 1,3,8,10,17-19 * page 1, line 11 - line 16 * * page 24, line 6 - line 9 * [I] 4,6,9,11,14-16,20-27; | [XI]US2008248046 (NI JIAN [US], et al) [X] 1,3,8,25,26 * paragraph [0307] * * paragraph [0380] * [I] 14-24,27; | [Y]WO0180884 (IDEC PHARMA CORP [US]) [Y] 24-27 * claim - * * page 1, line 10 - line 16 * | [XI] - MORIE A. GERTZ, "Pomalidomide and myeloma meningitis", LEUKEMIA & LYMPHOMA, (20130401), vol. 54, no. 4, doi:10.3109/10428194.2012.723708, ISSN 1042-8194, pages 681 - 682, XP055125757 [X] 1-3,6,8 * the whole document, in particular the first and fourth paragraph * [I] 14-27 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3109/10428194.2012.723708 | [Y] - Anonymous, "Phase I Trial of Pomalidomide for Patients With Relapsed/Refractory Primary CNS Lymphoma and Patients With Newly Diagnosed or Relapsed/Refractory Primary Vitreoretinal Lymphoma", (20121105), pages 1 - 16, URL: http://clinicaltrials.gov/archive/NCT01722305/2012_11_05, (20140627), XP055125687 [Y] 1-27 * the whole document, in particular the paragraph bridging pages 2 and 3 * | [YD] - COX M C ET AL, "Lenalidomide for aggressive B-cell lymphoma involving the central nervous system?", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF HEMATOLOGY 2011 WILEY-LISS INC. USA, (201111), vol. 86, no. 11, ISSN 0361-8609, pages 957 - 957, XP002726386 [YD] 1-27 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/AJH.22148 | [YD] - RUBENSTEIN JAMES L ET AL, "Regression of refractory intraocular large B-cell lymphoma with lenalidomide monotherapy.", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY : OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY 10 JUL 2011, (20110710), vol. 29, no. 20, ISSN 1527-7755, pages e595 - e597, XP002726387 [YD] 1-27 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1200/JCO.2011.34.7252 | by applicant | US5635517 | US6316471 | US6476052 | US7393863 | US7629360 | US7863297 | US2005143420 | US2006166932 | US2006188475 | US2007048327 | US2007066512 | US2007155791 | US2008051431 | US2008317708 | US2009087407 | US2009088410 | US2009131385 | US2009148853 | US2009232776 | US2009232796 | US2010098657 | US2010099711 | US2011184025 | US6335349 | US7041680 | US7709502 | US7994327 | US2006178402 | US2011224440 | US5391485 | US5393870 | US5229496 | US4810643 | US4999291 | US5528823 | US5580755 | US2002123141 | US2003235909 | US2003032179 | US3845770 | US3916899 | US3536809 | US3598123 | US4008719 | US5674533 | US5059595 | US5591767 | US5120548 | US5073543 | US5639476 | US5354556 | US5733566 | US5134127 | - ROITT, I.; BROSTOFF, J.; KALE, D., Immunology 3rd ed.,, MOSBY, (1993), pages 17.1 - 17.12 | - The Merck Manual 17th ed., (1999), vol. 955 | - DRACH J. ET AL., EXPERT REVIEW OF ANT CANCER THERAPY, (2005), vol. 5, no. 3, pages 477 - 485 | - The Merck Manual 17th ed., (1999), pages 958 - 959 | - DRACH J. ET AL., EXPERT REVIEW OFANTICANCER THERAPY, (2005), vol. 5, no. 3, pages 477 - 485 | - FERRERI, A.J., BLOOD, (2011), vol. 118, pages 510 - 522 | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, 18th ed., MACK PUBLISHING, (1990), vol. 173 | - The United States Pharmacopeia, 23rd ed.,, (1995), pages 1843 - 1844 | - "further on page 949-982", MANFRED E. WOLFF, 1 Burger 's Medicinal Chemistry and Drug Discovery, (1995), pages 172 - 178 | - WILEN, S. H. ET AL., TETRAHEDRON, (1977), vol. 33, page 2725 | - WILEN, S. H., Tables of Resolving Agents and Optical Resolutions, UNIV. OF NOTRE DAME PRESS, (1972), page 268 | - PENICHET, M.L.; MORRISON, S.L., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (2001), vol. 248, pages 91 - 101 | - EMENS, L.A. ET AL., CURR. OPINION MOL. THER., (2001), vol. 3, no. 1, pages 77 - 84 | - JENS T. CARSTENSEN, Drug Stability: Principles & Practice, 2d. Ed.,, MARCEL DEKKER, (1995), pages 379 - 80 | - FERRERI A.J., BLOOD, (2011), vol. 118, pages 510 - 522 | - HEMANDEZ-ILIZALITURRI, F.J. ET AL., CANCER, (2011), vol. 117, pages 5058 - 5066 | - CAMILLERI-BROET, S. ET AL., BLOOD, (2006), vol. 107, pages 190 - 196 | - RUBENSTEIN, J.L. ET AL., J. CLIN. ONCOL., (2011), vol. 29, pages E595 - 597 | - COX, M.C. ET AL., AM. J. HEMATOL., (2011), vol. 86, page 957 | - WAN, C.P. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1993), vol. 162, pages 1 - 7 | - ZHU, D. ET AL., CANCER IMMUNOL. IMMUNOTHER., (2008), pages 1849 - 1859 | - JIANG, L. ET AL., INT. J. CLIN. EXP. PATHOL., (2010), vol. 3, pages 763 - 767 | - TUN, H.W. ET AL., BLOOD, (2008), vol. 111, pages 3200 - 3210 | - KADOCH, C. ET AL., CLIN. CANCER RES., (2009), vol. 15, pages 1989 - 1997 | - RUBENSTEIN, J.L. ET AL., BLOOD, (2006), vol. 107, pages 3716 - 3723 | - MANTOVANI, A. ET AL., TRENDS IMMUNOL., (2002), vol. 23, pages 549 - 555 | US20020380842 | WO2013US26662 |