EP2983797 - COSMETIC, PHARMACEUTICAL OR FOOD COMPOSITION COMPRISING CAROTENOID CONTAINING EXTRACT OF ARTHROBACTER AGILIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.10.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.08.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thorel, Jean-Noël 3 Rue Larochelle 75014 Paris / FR | [2016/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THOREL, Jean-Noël 3 Rue Larochelle F-75014 Paris / FR | 02 /
PELLAY, François-Xavier 3 Square des Tilleuls F-92360 Meudon La Foret / FR | [2016/07] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Laurent & Charras Le Contemporain 50 Chemin de la Bruyère 69574 Dardilly Cedex / FR | [2016/07] | Application number, filing date | 14720194.1 | 09.04.2014 | [2016/07] | WO2014FR50852 | Priority number, date | FR20130053200 | 09.04.2013 Original published format: FR 1353200 | [2016/07] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014167247 | Date: | 16.10.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/42] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2983797 | Date: | 17.02.2016 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2983797 | Date: | 10.03.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q19/08, A61K8/99, A61K8/31, A61Q17/04, A61Q19/00, A61P17/18, A61P39/06, A61P43/00 | [2020/45] | CPC: |
A61K8/99 (EP,US);
A61K8/31 (EP,US);
A61P17/18 (EP);
A61P39/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61Q17/04 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2019/28] | A61Q19/08, A61K8/99, A61K8/31, A61Q17/04, A61Q19/00 | ||
Former IPC [2016/07] | A61Q17/04, A61Q19/00, A61Q19/08, A61K8/99, A61K8/31, A61K8/67, A61K8/35, A61K8/46, A61K8/49 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOSMETISCHE, PHARMAZEUTISCHE ODER NAHRUNGSMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT KAROTINOIDHALTIGEM EXTRAKT AUS ARTHROBACTER AGILIS | [2016/07] | English: | COSMETIC, PHARMACEUTICAL OR FOOD COMPOSITION COMPRISING CAROTENOID CONTAINING EXTRACT OF ARTHROBACTER AGILIS | [2016/07] | French: | COMPOSITION COSMETIQUE, PHARMACEUTIQUE OU ALIMENTAIRE COMPRENANT UN EXTRAIT RICHE EN CAROTENOIDES D'ARTHROBACTER AGILIS | [2016/07] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/07] | 15.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 26.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.01.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.02.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.12.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/07] | Request for further processing for: | 26.09.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 26.09.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.10.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.04.2014 | AL | 10.03.2021 | AT | 10.03.2021 | CY | 10.03.2021 | CZ | 10.03.2021 | DK | 10.03.2021 | EE | 10.03.2021 | FI | 10.03.2021 | HR | 10.03.2021 | LT | 10.03.2021 | LV | 10.03.2021 | MC | 10.03.2021 | MK | 10.03.2021 | MT | 10.03.2021 | NL | 10.03.2021 | PL | 10.03.2021 | RO | 10.03.2021 | RS | 10.03.2021 | SE | 10.03.2021 | SI | 10.03.2021 | SK | 10.03.2021 | SM | 10.03.2021 | IE | 09.04.2021 | LU | 09.04.2021 | BG | 10.06.2021 | NO | 10.06.2021 | GR | 11.06.2021 | IS | 10.07.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 09.04.2014 | |
AL | 10.03.2021 | ||
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CY | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
MK | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
IE | 09.04.2021 | ||
LU | 09.04.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 09.04.2014 | |
AL | 10.03.2021 | ||
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CY | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
IE | 09.04.2021 | ||
LU | 09.04.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 09.04.2014 | |
AL | 10.03.2021 | ||
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
IE | 09.04.2021 | ||
LU | 09.04.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
IE | 09.04.2021 | ||
LU | 09.04.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
IE | 09.04.2021 | ||
LU | 09.04.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SI | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
LU | 09.04.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
LU | 09.04.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
DK | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
LU | 09.04.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 10.03.2021 | |
AT | 10.03.2021 | ||
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
MC | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
LU | 09.04.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
LU | 09.04.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
PL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
IS | 10.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RO | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SK | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
CZ | 10.03.2021 | ||
EE | 10.03.2021 | ||
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 10.03.2021 | |
FI | 10.03.2021 | ||
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
SM | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
NL | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
SE | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
LV | 10.03.2021 | ||
RS | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
BG | 10.06.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
GR | 11.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
HR | 10.03.2021 | ||
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 10.03.2021 | |
LT | 10.03.2021 | ||
NO | 10.06.2021 | Cited in | International search | [I]KR20120068367 ; | [Y]JPH07132096 (MICRO ARUJIE CORP KK) [Y] 1-15 * abstract *; | [Y]WO0024369 (HUNER NORMAN [CA], et al) [Y] 1-15 * claims 1-6,10-22,26,28-33,35,36,39,41,43-46 * * page 1, lines 6-9 * * page 3, line 30 - page 4, line 9 * * page 15, line 12 - page 16, line 14 * * page 16, line 30 - page 17, line 6 *; | [XY] - N. J. C. FONG ET AL, "Carotenoid accumulation in the psychrotrophic bacterium Arthrobacter agilis in response to thermal and salt stress", APPLIED MICROBIOLOGY AND BIOTECHNOLOGY, (20010901), vol. 56, no. 5-6, doi:10.1007/s002530100739, ISSN 0175-7598, pages 750 - 756, XP055092879 [X] 1,3-5 * abstract * * materials and methods; identification of pigments; page 751 * * table 1 * * figures 4A,4B, 7 * [Y] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s002530100739 | [XY] - DIESER M, GREENWOOD M, FOREMAN C M, "Carotenoid Pigmentation in Antarctic Heterotrophic Bacteria as a Strategy to Withstand Environmental Stresses", ARCTIC, ANTARCTIC AND ALPINE RESEARCH, Colorado, USA, (20100301), vol. 42, no. 4, doi:10.1657/1938-4246-42.4.396, pages 396 - 405, XP009175105 [X] 1,3,7,8 * abstract * * table 1 * * figure 1 * * characteristics of extracted pigments; page 398 * [Y] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1657/1938-4246-42.4.396 | [I] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2012, no. 49, Database accession no. 2012-H70470, XP002717875 & KR20120068367 A 20120627 (LG HOUSEHOLD&HEALTHCARE LTD) [I] 1-15 * abstract * | [Y] - KRINSKY ET AL, "Antioxidant functions of carotenoids", FREE RADICAL BIOLOGY AND MEDICINE, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, US, vol. 7, no. 6, doi:10.1016/0891-5849(89)90143-3, ISSN 0891-5849, (19890101), pages 617 - 635, (19890101), XP025591958 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0891-5849(89)90143-3 | [Y] - MECKEL R A ET AL, "EXTRACTABILITY OF CAROTENOID PIGMENTS FROM NON-PHOTOSYNTHETIC BACTERIA WITH SOLVENTS AND DETERGENTS: IMPLICATIONS FOR THE LOCATION AND BINDING OF THE PIGMENTS", JOURNAL OF GENERAL MICROBIOLOGY, SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, READING, GB, (19800101), vol. 120, no. 1, ISSN 0022-1287, pages 111 - 116, XP001147977 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * | [Y] - SAITO T ET AL, "Hydroxyl radical scavenging ability of bacterioruberin", RADIATION PHYSICS AND CHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV, AMSTERDAM NL, (19970901), vol. 50, no. 3, doi:10.1016/S0969-806X(97)00036-4, ISSN 0969-806X, pages 267 - 269, XP004094273 [Y] 9-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0969-806X(97)00036-4 | [A] - SAPERSTEIN S ET AL, "Association of carotenoid pigments with protein components in non-photosynthetic bacteria", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, ELSEVIER, NL, vol. 16, doi:10.1016/0006-3002(55)90267-5, ISSN 0006-3002, (19550101), pages 482 - 488, (19550101), XP025667425 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0006-3002(55)90267-5 | [A] - Cathrin Koch ET AL, "Reclassification of Micrococcus agilis (Ali-Cohen 1889) to the Genus Arthrobacter as Arthrobacter agilis comb. nov. and Emendation of the Genus Arthrobacter", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF SYSTEMATIC BACTERIOLOGY Copyright, (19951001), pages 837 - 839, URL: http://ijs.sgmjournals.org/content/45/4/837.full.pdf, (20131211), XP055092874 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 4A,4B,7 * * pigment isolation and separation; page 751 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1099/00207713-45-4-837 | [XY] - Ecco Bella Botanicals, "M.D Formulated Age Antidote Day Cream", GNPD, MINTEL, (20041101), Database accession no. 10194702, XP002732011 [X] 15 * product description * * ingredients * [Y] 1-15 | [XY] - Bolaiya Cosmetics, "Shining Star Eye Cream", GNPD, MINTEL, (20100401), Database accession no. 1305663, XP002732012 [X] 15 * product description * * ingredients * [Y] 1-15 | [XY] - Parafarm, "Dietary Supplement Planeta M Vikal'gin Laminariya Biologicheski Aktivnaya Dobavka", GNPD, MINTEL, (20100101), Database accession no. 1230777, XP002732013 [X] 15 * product description * * ingredients * [Y] 1-15 | by applicant | - KOCH ET AL., INT J SYST BACTERIOL, (1995), vol. 45, no. 4, pages 837 - 9 | - KOCH ET AL., INT J SYST BACTERIOL., (1995), vol. 45, no. 4, pages 837 - 9 | - FONG ET AL., APPL MICROBIOL BIOTECHNOL., (2001), vol. 56, no. 5-6, pages 750 - 6 | - ALI-COHEN, ZENTRALBL. BAKTERIOL. PARASITENKD. INFEKTIONSKR. HYG. ABT. 1 ORIG., vol. 6, pages 33 - 36 | - FONG ET AL., APPL MICROBIOL BIOTECHNOL, (2001), vol. 56, pages 750 - 756 | - RE ET AL., FREE RADIC. BIOL. MED., (1999), vol. 26, no. 9-10, pages 1231 - 7 | - BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (1984), vol. 123.1, pages 291 - 298 | - SINGH, NARENDRA P. ET AL., EXPERIMENTAL CELL RESEARCH, (1988), vol. 175.1, pages 184 - 191 |