EP2984630 - RECONSTRUCTED IMAGE DATA VISUALIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.09.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2020/12] |
Former [2016/07] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DHANANTWARI, Amar High Tech Campus 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
JOSHI, Mukta High Tech Campus 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
NAE, Yael High Tech Campus 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2016/07] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2016/07] | Versteeg, Dennis John Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 14720256.8 | 28.03.2014 | [2016/07] | WO2014IB60253 | Priority number, date | US201361810353P | 10.04.2013 Original published format: US 201361810353 P | [2016/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014167450 | Date: | 16.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2984630 | Date: | 17.02.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06T11/00, A61B5/00 | [2016/07] | CPC: |
G06T11/003 (EP,US);
A61B6/032 (RU,US);
A61B6/461 (RU,US);
A61B6/467 (US);
G06T11/60 (RU,US);
G06T15/08 (US);
G06T5/70 (US);
G06T7/0012 (US);
G06T2200/04 (US);
G06T2207/10081 (US);
G06T2207/30024 (US);
G06T2210/41 (US);
G06T2211/421 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/07] | Title | German: | ANSICHT VON REKONSTRUIERTEN BILDDATEN | [2016/07] | English: | RECONSTRUCTED IMAGE DATA VISUALIZATION | [2016/07] | French: | VISUALISATION DE DONNÉES IMAGE RECONSTRUITES | [2016/07] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/07] | 17.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.10.2018 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 02.08.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 02.08.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.08.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2007034342 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al); | [XI]WO2011036624 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al); |