EP2967669 - EXTERNAL BONE FIXATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DePuy Synthes Products, Inc. 325 Paramount Drive Raynham, MA 02767 / US | [2017/37] |
Former [2016/03] | For all designated states DePuy Synthes Products, Inc. 325 Paramount Drive Raynham, MA 02767 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BORDEAUX, Jean-Noel 1302 Wrights Lane East West Chester, Pennsylvania 19380 / US | 02 /
WAHL, Michael 1302 Wrights Lane East West Chester, Pennsylvania 19380 / US | 03 /
MAUGHAN, Thomas 1302 Wrights Lane East West Chester, Pennsylvania 19380 / US | 04 /
MURRAY, Nicole 5 Mary Street West Milford, New Jersey 07480 / US | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [2017/37] |
Former [2016/03] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14721066.0 | 13.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014US25263 | Priority number, date | US201313800545 | 13.03.2013 Original published format: US201313800545 | US201313800319 | 13.03.2013 Original published format: US201313800319 | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014159824 | Date: | 02.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/40] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2967669 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2967669 | Date: | 13.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/62 | [2016/03] | CPC: |
A61B17/6416 (EP,US);
A61B17/60 (US);
A61B17/62 (EP,US);
A61B17/6466 (US);
A61B17/66 (EP,US);
A61B17/64 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EXTERNER FIXATEUR | [2017/15] | English: | EXTERNAL BONE FIXATION DEVICE | [2016/03] | French: | FIXATEUR EXTERNE | [2016/03] |
Former [2016/03] | EXTERNE VORRICHTUNG ZUR KNOCHENFIXIERUNG | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 26.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17184793.2 / EP3281592 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.03.2014 | AL | 13.09.2017 | AT | 13.09.2017 | CY | 13.09.2017 | CZ | 13.09.2017 | DK | 13.09.2017 | EE | 13.09.2017 | FI | 13.09.2017 | HR | 13.09.2017 | LT | 13.09.2017 | LV | 13.09.2017 | MC | 13.09.2017 | MK | 13.09.2017 | NL | 13.09.2017 | PL | 13.09.2017 | PT | 13.09.2017 | RO | 13.09.2017 | RS | 13.09.2017 | SE | 13.09.2017 | SI | 13.09.2017 | SK | 13.09.2017 | SM | 13.09.2017 | TR | 13.09.2017 | BG | 13.12.2017 | NO | 13.12.2017 | GR | 14.12.2017 | IS | 13.01.2018 | IE | 13.03.2018 | LU | 13.03.2018 | MT | 13.03.2018 | BE | 31.03.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 13.03.2014 | |
AT | 13.09.2017 | ||
CY | 13.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
MK | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PT | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
TR | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
IE | 13.03.2018 | ||
LU | 13.03.2018 | ||
MT | 13.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 13.03.2014 | |
AT | 13.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PT | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
TR | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
IE | 13.03.2018 | ||
LU | 13.03.2018 | ||
MT | 13.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PT | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
TR | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
IE | 13.03.2018 | ||
LU | 13.03.2018 | ||
MT | 13.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
TR | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
IE | 13.03.2018 | ||
LU | 13.03.2018 | ||
MT | 13.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
IE | 13.03.2018 | ||
LU | 13.03.2018 | ||
MT | 13.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
IE | 13.03.2018 | ||
LU | 13.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
IE | 13.03.2018 | ||
LU | 13.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
LU | 13.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
SM | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/15] | FI | 13.09.2017 | |
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | FI | 13.09.2017 | |
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | FI | 13.09.2017 | |
HR | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
RS | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 13.09.2017 | |
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 13.09.2017 | |
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
NO | 13.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 13.09.2017 | |
NO | 13.12.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4450834 (FISCHER DAVID A [US]) [X] 68-72 * column 3, lines 54-66; figures 1,4 * * column 5, lines 8-17 * * column 6, lines 3-61 * * column 10, lines 12-44 *; | [XAI]US4615338 (ILIZAROV GAVRIIL A [SU], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 4, lines 11-35; figure 8 * * column 6, line 65 - column 7, line 16 * [A] 5-9 [I] 3,4,10-12; | [XY]WO9812975 (TOSIC ALEKSANDAR [US]) [X] 20-26 * figures 1,18,19,20,21,27,28 * * page 5, lines 1-18 * * page 11, line 14 - page 12, line 16 * * page 15, lines 5-18 * [Y] 73-81; | [X]WO0115611 (SMITH & NEPHEW [US], et al) [X] 68-72 * page 7, lines 18-22; figures 1-3,6, * * page 8, line 14 - page 10, line 10 * * page 10, line 29 - page 11, line 16 * * page 11, lines 28-32 *; | [Y]US2002010465 (KOO JA KYO [KR], et al) [Y] 73-85 * figures 1-4, * * paragraphs [0036] - [0042] *; | [Y]WO03030759 (LANGMAID MICHAEL N [US], et al) [Y] 73-85 * page 8, line 33 - page 9, line 21; figures 1,2,2a-2c,4a-4c, ** page 10, line 29 - page 11, line 17 *; | [Y]EP1690506 (STRYKER TRAUMA SA [CH]) [Y] 73-85 * figures 1-7 * * paragraphs [0018] , [0019] , [0022] - [0028] - [0037] *; | [XAI]WO2007024904 (HFSC CO [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6 * paragraphs [0040] , [0049] , [0051] - [0055] - [0057] , [0058] , [0070] - [0088]; figures 1,3a,3b,8,9a,9b, * [A] 7-9 [I] 3,4,10-12; | [XAI]US2007161984 (CRESINA JEFFERY [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6 * paragraphs [0024] , [0030] , [0031] , [0033]; figures 1,5a-5c, * [A] 7-9 [I] 3,4,10-12; | [X]WO2009102904 (TEXAS SCOTTISH RITE HOSPITAL [US], et al) [X] 68-72 * paragraphs [0017] - [0046]; figures 1-12 *; | [XAI]US2012303028 (WONG KIAN-MING KEVIN [US]) [X] 1,2,5,13-16,20-26 * paragraphs [0038] , [0042] - [0044] - [0047] , [0050] , [0051] - [0053] - [0058] , [0063] - [0076]; figures 1,3a-3c,4a-4c,5,6a,6b,7,8,9a-9d,10a-10d * [A] 6-9,68-72 [I] 3,4,10-12,17-19 |