EP2968716 - THORACIC AORTA VENTRICULAR ASSIST SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.03.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VASCOR, Inc. P.O. Box M Sarver, PA 16055 / US | [2023/52] |
Former [2016/03] | For all designated states VASCOR, Inc. 566 Alpha Drive Pittsburgh, PA 15238 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEILMAN, Marlin, S. 187 Iron Bridge Road Saver, PA 16055-8731 / US | 02 /
KOHLER, Charles, R. 607 Pillow Drive Cheswick, PA 15024 / US | 03 /
REILLY, David, M. 146 Wescott Drive Pittsburgh, PA 15237-1765 / US | 04 /
WAGNER, Jon, D. 519 Woodland Road Pittsburgh, PA 15237 / US | 05 /
BADSTIBNER, Kurt, D. 4 Mehaffey Road North Versailles, PA 15137 / US | 06 /
BATES, Richard, A. 2631 Lynnhaven Drive Allison Park, PA 15101 / US | 07 /
SPEICHER, Jonathan, R. 453 S. Braddock Avenue Pittsburgh, PA 15221 / US | 08 /
RUSSIAL, Joseph, F. 7 Indian River Avenue, Unit 301 Titusville, Florida 32796 / US | [2016/29] |
Former [2016/03] | 01 /
HEILMAN, Marlin, S. 187 Iron Bridge Road Saver, PA 16055-8731 / US | ||
02 /
KOHLER, Charles, R. 607 Pillow Drive Cheswick, PA 15024 / US | |||
03 /
REILLY, David, M. 146 Wescott Drive Pittsburgh, PA 15237-1765 / US | |||
04 /
WAGNER, Jon, D. 519 Woodland Road Pittsburgh, PA 15237 / US | |||
05 /
BADSTIBNER, Kurt, D. 4 Mehaffey Road North Versailles, PA 15137 / US | |||
06 /
BATES, Richard, A. 2631 Lynnhaven Drive Allison Park, PA 15101 / US | |||
07 /
SPEICHER, Jonathan, R. 453 S. Braddock Avenue Pittsburgh, PA 15221 / US | |||
08 /
RUSSIAL, Joseph, F. 2508 Hollywood Drive Pittsburgh, PA 15235 / US | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [2023/37] |
Former [2016/03] | Nash, David Allan Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 14721669.1 | 17.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014US30472 | Priority number, date | US201361788030P | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361788030 P | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014145667 | Date: | 18.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2968716 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2968716 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61M60/148, A61M60/274, A61M60/178, A61M60/462, A61M60/515, A61M60/538, A61M60/873 | [2023/15] | CPC: |
A61M60/274 (EP,CN,US);
A61M60/148 (EP,CN,US);
A61M60/178 (EP,CN,US);
A61M60/462 (EP,CN,US);
A61M60/515 (EP,CN,US);
A61M60/538 (EP,CN,US);
A61M60/873 (EP,CN,US);
A61M2205/8243 (EP,CN,US);
A61M2230/005 (CN,US);
A61M2230/04 (CN,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2016/03] | A61M1/10, A61M1/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | THORAX-AORTA-HERZKAMMERUNTERSTÜTZUNGSSYSTEM | [2016/03] | English: | THORACIC AORTA VENTRICULAR ASSIST SYSTEM | [2016/03] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ASSISTANCE VENTRICULAIRE D'AORTE THORACIQUE | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 23.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.04.2021 | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.09.2023 | CZ | 13.09.2023 | DK | 13.09.2023 | EE | 13.09.2023 | ES | 13.09.2023 | FI | 13.09.2023 | HR | 13.09.2023 | IT | 13.09.2023 | LT | 13.09.2023 | LV | 13.09.2023 | NL | 13.09.2023 | PL | 13.09.2023 | RO | 13.09.2023 | RS | 13.09.2023 | SE | 13.09.2023 | SK | 13.09.2023 | SM | 13.09.2023 | NO | 13.12.2023 | GR | 14.12.2023 | IS | 13.01.2024 | PT | 15.01.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
IT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
PL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
ES | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
SE | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 13.09.2023 | |
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3553736 (KANTROWITZ ADRIAN, et al) [A] 1-3* flexible inflatable and collapsible bulb 14 compressed air tube 26;; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US3857382 (WILLIAMS M, et al) [A] 1-3 * column 2, line 43 - line 52; figure 2 * * column 3, lines 5-25; figures 4,5 *; | [X]EP1466635 (MINISTERO DELL ISTRUZIONE DELL [IT]) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0004] - [0010]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2006014999 (HEILMAN MARLIN S [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * the whole document * * 182a,b leads; paragraph [0088]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2011071337 (THOMPSON RAYMOND [GB], et al) [A] 1-3 * paragraphs [0039] - [0043]; figures 3,4,5,7,8 *; | [A]US2012220816 (PETERS WILLIAM SUTTLE [NZ], et al) [A] 1-3 * paragraph [0114]; figure 17 * * sensing means; paragraphs [0048] - [0049] * | by applicant | US7347811 | US2013041204 | US2013289334 |