EP2974034 - HIGH VOLTAGE MONITORING SUCCESSIVE APPROXIMATION ANALOG TO DIGITAL CONVERTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.02.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.02.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.01.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alfred E. Mann Foundation for Scientific Research P.O. Box 905 Santa Clarita, CA 91380 / US | [2021/09] |
Former [2016/03] | For all designated states The Alfred E. Mann Foundation for Scientific Research P.O. Box 905 Santa Clarita, CA 91380-9005 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Edward K. F. 1819 Catlin Street Fullerton, California 92833 / US | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | Clark, Jane Anne, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2021/28] |
Former [2016/03] | Clark, Jane Anne, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | Application number, filing date | 14721672.5 | 17.03.2014 | [2016/03] | WO2014US30890 | Priority number, date | US201361788926P | 15.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361788926 P | [2016/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014146019 | Date: | 18.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2974034 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2974034 | Date: | 14.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.03.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H03M1/12, A61N1/36, A61N1/372, H03M1/46 | [2016/03] | CPC: |
A61N1/36125 (EP,US);
A61N1/36071 (EP,US);
A61N1/37235 (US);
H03M1/129 (EP,US);
H03M1/38 (US);
H03M1/00 (US);
H03M1/12 (US);
H03M1/468 (EP,US);
H03M1/685 (US);
H03M1/804 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANALOG-DIGITAL-WANDLER MIT HOCHSPANNUNGSÜBERWACHUNG UND SCHRITTWEISER ANNÄHERUNG | [2016/03] | English: | HIGH VOLTAGE MONITORING SUCCESSIVE APPROXIMATION ANALOG TO DIGITAL CONVERTER | [2016/03] | French: | CONVERTISSEUR ANALOGIQUE-NUMÉRIQUE PAR APPROXIMATIONS SUCCESSIVES AVEC SURVEILLANCE HAUTE TENSION | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 19.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division to which search results under Rule 164(2) EPC are annexed (Time limit: M04) [2020/25] | 19.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.05.2020 | Opposition(s) | 19.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.05.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.03.2014 | AL | 14.07.2021 | AT | 14.07.2021 | CY | 14.07.2021 | CZ | 14.07.2021 | DK | 14.07.2021 | EE | 14.07.2021 | ES | 14.07.2021 | FI | 14.07.2021 | HR | 14.07.2021 | IT | 14.07.2021 | LT | 14.07.2021 | LV | 14.07.2021 | MC | 14.07.2021 | MK | 14.07.2021 | NL | 14.07.2021 | PL | 14.07.2021 | RO | 14.07.2021 | RS | 14.07.2021 | SE | 14.07.2021 | SI | 14.07.2021 | SK | 14.07.2021 | SM | 14.07.2021 | BG | 14.10.2021 | NO | 14.10.2021 | GR | 15.10.2021 | IS | 14.11.2021 | PT | 15.11.2021 | IE | 17.03.2022 | LU | 17.03.2022 | BE | 31.03.2022 | CH | 31.03.2022 | FR | 31.03.2022 | LI | 31.03.2022 | [2024/22] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 17.03.2014 | |
AL | 14.07.2021 | ||
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CY | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
IE | 17.03.2022 | ||
LU | 17.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
FR | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 17.03.2014 | |
AL | 14.07.2021 | ||
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
IE | 17.03.2022 | ||
LU | 17.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
FR | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
IE | 17.03.2022 | ||
LU | 17.03.2022 | ||
BE | 31.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
FR | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
IE | 17.03.2022 | ||
LU | 17.03.2022 | ||
CH | 31.03.2022 | ||
FR | 31.03.2022 | ||
LI | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
IE | 17.03.2022 | ||
LU | 17.03.2022 | ||
FR | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
FR | 31.03.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
MC | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
IT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 14.07.2021 | |
AT | 14.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SI | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
SM | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
CZ | 14.07.2021 | ||
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
EE | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RO | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
SK | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
DK | 14.07.2021 | ||
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
HR | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
LV | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
PL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
GR | 15.10.2021 | ||
IS | 14.11.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
RS | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
PT | 15.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
ES | 14.07.2021 | ||
FI | 14.07.2021 | ||
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
SE | 14.07.2021 | ||
BG | 14.10.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 14.07.2021 | |
LT | 14.07.2021 | ||
NL | 14.07.2021 | ||
NO | 14.10.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6363277 (DOOLEY MICHAEL W [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * Title * * column 1, lines 41-51 * * column 4, lines 42-47 * * column 4, lines 55-57 * * column 5, lines 8-15 * * column 5, line 63 - column 6, line 4 * * column 7, lines 31-33 * * column 8, lines 43-49 * * figures 2,3,4,5,6,7 *; | [Y]US2012326901 (ZHAO JIAN HUA [CN], et al) [Y] 1-12 * paragraphs [0025] - [0029] * * paragraph [0042] * * figures 3a-3d * | International search | [XI]US6313779 (LEUNG KA Y [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-11 * column 2, lines 66-67 * * column 3, lines 1-2 * * column 3, lines 25-32 * * column 3, lines 51-54 * * column 4, lines 14-18 * * column 4, lines 39-42 * * column 4, lines 45-48 * * column 4, lines 54-57 * * column 4, lines 59-65 * * column 5, lines 18-40 * * column 5, lines 51-57 * * column 6, lines 7-9 * * column 6, lines 48-60 * * column 6, line 65 - column 7, line 14 * * column 7, lines 9-14 * * column 7, lines 23-37 * * column 8, line 4 * * column 8, lines 6-9 * * column 8, lines 11-16 * * column 8, lines 23-28 * * column 8, lines 32-35 * * table 2 * * figures 1-3 * [I] 6 | Examination | US6363277 | US2012326901 |