EP2989110 - TAMOXIFEN DERIVATIVES FOR TREATMENT OF NEOPLASTIC DISEASES, ESPECIALLY WITH HIGH HER2 PROTEIN LEVEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.04.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Smart Brain s.r.o. Vídenská 1083 142 20 Praha 4 / CZ | For all designated states Biotechnologicky ustav AV CR, v.v.i. Prumyslova 595 252 50 Vestec / CZ | For all designated states Neuzil, Jirí Poljanovova 3158/5 14300 Praha 4 / CZ | For all designated states Springtide Ventures s.r.o. Vinohradska 1511/230 100 00 Praha 10 - Strasnice / CZ | [2019/07] |
Former [2018/31] | For all designated states Smart Brain s.r.o. Vídenská 1083 142 20 Praha 4 / CZ | ||
For all designated states Biotechnologicky ustav AV CR, v.v.i. Prumyslova 595 252 50 Vestec / CZ | |||
For all designated states Neuzil, Jirí Poljanovova 3158/5 14300 Praha 4 / CZ | |||
For all designated states KKCG AG Kapellgasse 21 6004 Luzern / CH | |||
Former [2016/43] | For all designated states Smart Brain S.r.o. Vídenská 1083 14220 Praha 4 / CZ | ||
For all designated states Biotechnologicky Ustav AV CR, v.v.i. Videnska 1083 14220 Praha 4 / CZ | |||
For all designated states Neuzil, Jirí Poljanovova 3158/5 14300 Praha 4 / CZ | |||
For all designated states KKCG AG Kapellgasse 21 6004 Luzern / CH | |||
Former [2016/21] | For all designated states Smart Brain S.r.o. Vídenská 1083 14220 Praha 4 / CZ | ||
For all designated states Biotechnologicky Ustav AV CR, v.v.i. Videnska 1083 14220 Praha 4 / CZ | |||
For all designated states Neuzil, Jirí Poljanovova 3158/5 14300 Praha 4 / CZ | |||
For all designated states KKCG PLC 8 Alasias Street 3095 Limassol / CY | |||
Former [2016/09] | For all designated states Smart Brain S.r.o. Vídenská 1083 14220 Praha 4 / CZ | ||
For all designated states Biotechnologicky Ustav AV CR, v.v.i. Videnska 1083 14220 Praha 4 / CZ | |||
For all designated states Neuzil, Jirí Poljanovova 3158/5 14300 Praha 4 / CZ | |||
For all designated states KKCG SE 8 Alasias Street Christodoulides Building 3095 Limassol / CY | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEUZIL, Jirí Poljanovova 3158/5 14300 Praha 4 / CZ | 02 /
STURSA, Jan Petýrkova 1948 14800 Praha4 / CZ | 03 /
WERNER, Lukás Chomutovská 1229 43201 Kadan / CZ | [2016/09] | Representative(s) | Kratochvil, Vaclav Patent and Trademark Office P.O. Box 26 295 01 Mnichovo Hradiste / CZ | [2016/09] | Application number, filing date | 14721738.4 | 07.04.2014 | [2016/09] | WO2014CZ00035 | Priority number, date | CZ20130000308 | 24.04.2013 Original published format: CZ 20130308 | CZ20140000066 | 29.01.2014 Original published format: CZ 20140066 | [2016/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014173374 | Date: | 30.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2989110 | Date: | 02.03.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2989110 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/54, A61P35/04, A61K31/662 | [2016/09] | CPC: |
C07F9/5456 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07F9/5442 (EP,US);
C07F9/5449 (EP,US);
C09B23/0008 (EP,US);
C09B23/0025 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TAMOXIFENDERIVATE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON NEOPLASTISCHEN KRANKHEITEN, INSBESONDERE MIT HOHEM HER2-PROTEIN-SPIEGEL | [2016/09] | English: | TAMOXIFEN DERIVATIVES FOR TREATMENT OF NEOPLASTIC DISEASES, ESPECIALLY WITH HIGH HER2 PROTEIN LEVEL | [2016/09] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE TAMOXIFÈNE DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES NÉOPLASIQUES, SPÉCIALEMENT AVEC UNE TENEUR ÉLEVÉE EN PROTÉINE HER2 | [2016/09] | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/09] | 01.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 08.08.2018 | CZ | 08.08.2018 | EE | 08.08.2018 | LT | 08.08.2018 | LV | 08.08.2018 | MK | 08.08.2018 | RS | 08.08.2018 | SM | 08.08.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2019/37] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
SM | 08.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 08.08.2018 | |
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | LT | 08.08.2018 | |
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RS | 08.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 08.08.2018 | |
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | NL | 08.08.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9206068 (UNIV TEXAS [US]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [YD] - MOREIRA PI ET AL., "Tamoxifen and estradiol interact with the flavin mononucleotide site of complex I leading to mitochondrial failure", J BIOL CHEM, (2006), vol. 281, pages 10143 - 10152, XP002726681 [YD] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/JBC.M510249200 | [Y] - SMITH R A J ET AL, "DELIVERY OF BIOACTIVE MOLECULES TO MITOCHONDRIA IN VIVO", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, US, (20030429), vol. 100, no. 9, doi:10.1073/PNAS.0931245100, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 5407 - 5412, XP008043692 [Y] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0931245100 | by applicant | - HANAHAN D; WEINBERG RA, "Hallmarks of cancer: the next generation", CELL, (2011), vol. 1.44, pages 646 - 674 | - JONES S ET AL., "Core signalling pathways in human pancreatic cancers revealed by global genomic analyses", SCIENCE, (2008), vol. 321, doi:doi:10.1126/science.1164368, pages 1801 - 1806, XP055015968 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1164368 | - PARSONS DW ET AL., "An integrated genomic analysis of human glioblastoma multiforme", SCIENCE, (2008), vol. 321, doi:doi:10.1126/science.1164382, pages 1807 - 1812, XP002555012 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1164382 | - GERLINGER M ET AL., "Intratumor heterogeneity and branched evolution revealed by multiregion sequencing", N ENGL J MED, (2012), vol. 366, doi:doi:10.1056/NEJMoa1113205, pages 883 - 892, XP055078239 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa1113205 | - RALPH SJ ET AL., "The causes of cancer revisited: ''mitochondrial malignancy'' and ROS-induced oncogenic transformation - why mitochondria are targets for cancer therapy", MOL ASPECTS MED, (2010), vol. 31, pages 145 - 170, XP026995982 | - NEUZIL J ET AL., "Molecular mechanism of 'mitocan'-induced apoptosis in cancer cells epitomizes the multiple roles of reactive oxygen species and Bcl-2 family proteins", FEBS LETT, (2008), vol. 580, doi:doi:10.1016/j.febslet.2006.05.072, pages 5125 - 5129, XP028061380 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.febslet.2006.05.072 | - NEUZIL J ET AL., "Classification of mitocans, anti-cancer drugs acting on mitochondria", MITOCHONDRION, (2013), vol. 13, doi:doi:10.1016/j.mito.2012.07.112, pages 199 - 208, XP028529914 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.mito.2012.07.112 | - ARTEAGA CL ET AL., "Treatment of HER2-positive breast cancer: current status and future perspectives", NAT REV CLIN ONCOL., (2011), vol. 9, pages 16 - 32 | - MOREIRA PI ET AL., "Tamoxifen and estradiol interact with the flavin mononucleotide site of complex I leading to mitochondrial failure", J BIOL CHEM, (2006), vol. 281, doi:doi:10.1074/JBC.M510249200, pages 10143 - 10152, XP002726681 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/JBC.M510249200 | - EWER MS; EWER SM, "Cardiotoxicity of anticancer treatments: what the cardiologist needs to know", NAT REV CARDIOL, (2010), vol. 7, doi:doi:10.1038/nrcardio.2010.121, pages 564 - 575, XP009157868 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrcardio.2010.121 | - LIN SX ET AL., "Molecular therapy of breast cancer: progress and future directions", NAT REV ENDOCRINOL, (2010), vol. 6, pages 485 - 493 | - AHN ER ET AL., "Is the improved efficacy of trastuzumab and lapatinib combination worth the added toxicity?", BREAST CANCER, (2012), vol. 6, pages 191 - 207 | - WETTERSKOG D ET AL., "Identification of novel determinants of resistance to lapatinib in ERBB2-amplified cancers", ONCOGENE, (2013), pages 1 - 11 | - DONG LF ET AL., "a-Tocopheryl succinate induces apoptosis by targeting ubiquinone-binding sites in mitochondrial respiratory complex 11", ONCOGENE, (2008), vol. 27, doi:doi:10.1038/onc.2008.69, pages 4324 - 4335, XP002533115 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/onc.2008.69 | - DONG LF ET AL., "Suppression of tumour growth in vivo by the mitocan a-tocopheryl succinate requires respiratory complex 11", CLIN CANCER RES, (2009), vol. 15, pages 1593 - 1600 | - DONG LF ET AL., "Mitochondrial targeting of vitamin E succinate enhances its pro-apoptotic and anti-cancer activity via mitochondrial complex II", J BIOL CHEM, (2011), vol. 286, doi:doi:10.1074/jbc.M110.186643, pages 3717 - 3728, XP055447239 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M110.186643 | - DONG LF ET AL., "Mitochondrial targeting of a-tocopheryl succinate enhances its pro-apoptotic efficacy: A new paradigm of efficient anti-cancer therapy", FREE RADIC BIOL MED, (2011), vol. 50, pages 1546 - 1555 | - ROHLENA J ET AL., "Mitochondrially targeted a-tocopheryl succinate is antiangiogenic: Potential benefit against tumour angiogenesis but caution against wound healing", ANTIOX REDOX SIGNAL, (2011), vol. 15, pages 2923 - 2935 | - PIERRE E. TESSIER; ANDREA J. PENWELL; FABIO E. S. SOUZA; ALEX G. FALLIS, ORGANIC LETTERS, (2003), vol. 5, no. 17, pages 2989 - 2992 | - TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (2010), vol. 51, no. 49, pages 6426 - 6428 | - GUY CT ET AL., "Expression of the neu proto-oncogene in the mammary epithelium of transgenic mice induces metastatic disease", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 10578 - 10582 | - KLUCKOVA K ET AL., "Mitochondrial complex , a novel intriguing target for anti-cancer agents", BIOCHIM BIOPHYS ACTA, (2013), vol. 1827, pages 552 - 564 | - DING Y ET AL., "Receptor tyrosine kinase ErbB2 translocates into mitochondria and regulates cellular metabolism", NAT COMMUN, (2012), vol. 3, page 1271 | - YANG HY; SHAO R; HUNG MC; LEE MH, "p27 Kip1 inhibits HER2/neu-mediated cell growth and tumorigenesis", ONCOGENE, (2001), vol. 20, pages 3695 - 3702 | - HANAHAN D; WEINBERG RA, "The hallmarks of cancer", CELL, (2000), vol. 100, pages 57 - 70, XP055447752 | - THOMAS C; GUSTAFFSON J, "The different roles of ER subtypes in cancer biology and therapy", NAT REV CANCER, (2011), vol. 11, doi:doi:10.1038/nrc3093, pages 597 - 608, XP055248446 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrc3093 | - DEBLOIS D; GIGUERE V, "Oestrogen-related receptors in breast cancer: control of cellular metabolism and beyond", NAT REV CANCER, (2013), vol. 13, pages 27 - 36 | - STINGL J; CALDAS C, "Molecular heterogeneity of breast carcinomas and the cancer stem cell hypothesis", NAT REV CANCER, (2007), vol. 7, pages 791 - 799 | - DESANTIS C ET AL., "Breast cancer statistics", CA CANCER J CLIN, (2011), vol. 1, pages 409 - 4018 |