EP3084947 - MULTI-PHASE ELECTRIC DRIVE AND POWER UNIT THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Schweiz AG Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | [2017/41] |
Former [2016/43] | For all designated states ABB Technology Ltd. Affolternstrasse 44 8050 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VOEGELI, Andreas Chaeppelistrasse 37 CH-5312 Doettingen / CH | 02 /
PALOMAKI, Jukka Room 807 Building B Yishengge No. 10 Sanlitunxindong Road Chaoyang District Beijing 100027 / CN | [2016/43] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Josephspitalstr. 15 80331 München / DE | [2016/43] | Application number, filing date | 14723089.0 | 12.05.2014 | [2016/43] | WO2014EP59652 | Priority number, date | CN201310706158 | 19.12.2013 Original published format: CN201310706158 | [2016/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015090629 | Date: | 25.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3084947 | Date: | 26.10.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3084947 | Date: | 17.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H02M5/27 | [2016/43] | CPC: |
H02M5/458 (EP,US);
H02M1/12 (US);
H02M1/14 (US);
H02M1/16 (US);
H02M5/00 (US);
H02M5/46 (US);
H02M7/49 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRPHASIGER ELEKTRISCHER ANTRIEB UND ANTRIEBSEINHEIT DAFÜR | [2016/43] | English: | MULTI-PHASE ELECTRIC DRIVE AND POWER UNIT THEREOF | [2016/43] | French: | COMMANDE ÉLECTRIQUE POLYPHASÉE ET SON UNITÉ D'ALIMENTATION | [2016/43] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2016 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/43] | 14.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 08.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.06.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.05.2014 | AL | 17.07.2019 | AT | 17.07.2019 | CY | 17.07.2019 | CZ | 17.07.2019 | DK | 17.07.2019 | EE | 17.07.2019 | ES | 17.07.2019 | FI | 17.07.2019 | HR | 17.07.2019 | IT | 17.07.2019 | LT | 17.07.2019 | LV | 17.07.2019 | MC | 17.07.2019 | MK | 17.07.2019 | MT | 17.07.2019 | NL | 17.07.2019 | PL | 17.07.2019 | RO | 17.07.2019 | RS | 17.07.2019 | SE | 17.07.2019 | SI | 17.07.2019 | SK | 17.07.2019 | SM | 17.07.2019 | TR | 17.07.2019 | BG | 17.10.2019 | NO | 17.10.2019 | GR | 18.10.2019 | IS | 17.11.2019 | PT | 18.11.2019 | IE | 12.05.2020 | LU | 12.05.2020 | BE | 31.05.2020 | CH | 31.05.2020 | LI | 31.05.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 12.05.2014 | |
AL | 17.07.2019 | ||
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
CY | 17.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
MC | 17.07.2019 | ||
MT | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
SI | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
SM | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
IE | 12.05.2020 | ||
LU | 12.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 17.07.2019 | |
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
MC | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
SI | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
SM | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
IE | 12.05.2020 | ||
LU | 12.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 17.07.2019 | |
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
MC | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
SI | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
SM | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
IE | 12.05.2020 | ||
LU | 12.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 17.07.2019 | |
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
MC | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
SI | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
SM | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
LU | 12.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 17.07.2019 | |
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
MC | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
SI | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
SM | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | AL | 17.07.2019 | |
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
SI | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
SM | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 17.07.2019 | |
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
SI | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
SM | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 17.07.2019 | |
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
SM | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 17.07.2019 | |
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
SM | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 17.07.2019 | |
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
SK | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 17.07.2019 | |
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 17.07.2019 | |
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
IT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
PL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RO | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 17.07.2019 | |
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
DK | 17.07.2019 | ||
EE | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 17.07.2019 | |
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
TR | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 17.07.2019 | |
AT | 17.07.2019 | ||
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 17.07.2019 | |
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
IS | 17.11.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 17.07.2019 | |
ES | 17.07.2019 | ||
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
HR | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
LV | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
RS | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
GR | 18.10.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 17.07.2019 | |
FI | 17.07.2019 | ||
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
SE | 17.07.2019 | ||
BG | 17.10.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
PT | 18.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 17.07.2019 | |
LT | 17.07.2019 | ||
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 17.07.2019 | |
NL | 17.07.2019 | ||
NO | 17.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | NL | 17.07.2019 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6301130 (AIELLO MARC F [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-17 * column 5, line 32 - column 6, line 9 * * claim 1 * * figures 1, 3 *; | [Y]US2007291522 (TOBA MASAHIRO [JP] ET AL) [Y] 1-17 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0037] * * figure 1 * | Examination | US2010073970 |