EP3004980 - AN ELECTROPHORETIC SOLAR CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.12.2019 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.09.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vlyte Innovations Limited 4A Knockbeg Point Shannon Airport, Co. Clare / IE | For all designated states Vlyte Limited 4A Knockbeg Point Shannon Airport Shannon County Clare / IE | [2018/26] |
Former [2016/15] | For all designated states Vlyte Innovations Limited 4A Knockbeg Point Shannon Airport, Co. Clare / IE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
O'KEEFFE, Donal 13 Fairyfield Parteen County Clare / IE | [2016/15] | Representative(s) | Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25-26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/08] | Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | ||
Former [2016/15] | Boyce, Conor, et al Hanna Moore + Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2, D02 T668 / IE | Application number, filing date | 14724743.1 | 16.05.2014 | [2016/15] | WO2014EP60076 | Priority number, date | IE20130000182 | 31.05.2013 Original published format: IE 20130182 | [2016/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014191234 | Date: | 04.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3004980 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3004980 | Date: | 20.02.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/167, E06B9/24 | [2016/15] | CPC: |
E06B9/24 (EP);
G02F1/167 (EP,US);
G02F1/1677 (EP,US);
E06B2009/2464 (EP);
G02F1/1681 (EP,US);
G02F2203/02 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROPHORETISCHE SOLARSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2016/15] | English: | AN ELECTROPHORETIC SOLAR CONTROL DEVICE | [2016/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RÉGULATION SOLAIRE ÉLECTROPHORÉTIQUE | [2016/15] | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 28.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.01.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.11.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.05.2014 | AL | 20.02.2019 | AT | 20.02.2019 | CY | 20.02.2019 | CZ | 20.02.2019 | DK | 20.02.2019 | EE | 20.02.2019 | ES | 20.02.2019 | FI | 20.02.2019 | HR | 20.02.2019 | IT | 20.02.2019 | LT | 20.02.2019 | LV | 20.02.2019 | MC | 20.02.2019 | MK | 20.02.2019 | MT | 20.02.2019 | PL | 20.02.2019 | RO | 20.02.2019 | RS | 20.02.2019 | SE | 20.02.2019 | SI | 20.02.2019 | SK | 20.02.2019 | SM | 20.02.2019 | TR | 20.02.2019 | IE | 16.05.2019 | LU | 16.05.2019 | BG | 20.05.2019 | NO | 20.05.2019 | GR | 21.05.2019 | BE | 31.05.2019 | CH | 31.05.2019 | LI | 31.05.2019 | IS | 20.06.2019 | PT | 20.06.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 16.05.2014 | |
AL | 20.02.2019 | ||
AT | 20.02.2019 | ||
CY | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
MT | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
TR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IE | 16.05.2019 | ||
LU | 16.05.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 16.05.2014 | |
AL | 20.02.2019 | ||
AT | 20.02.2019 | ||
CY | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
TR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IE | 16.05.2019 | ||
LU | 16.05.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 20.02.2019 | |
AT | 20.02.2019 | ||
CY | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
TR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IE | 16.05.2019 | ||
LU | 16.05.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 20.02.2019 | |
AT | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
TR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IE | 16.05.2019 | ||
LU | 16.05.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 20.02.2019 | |
AT | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
TR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IE | 16.05.2019 | ||
LU | 16.05.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 20.02.2019 | |
AT | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
TR | 20.02.2019 | ||
LU | 16.05.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 20.02.2019 | |
AT | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SI | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
LU | 16.05.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 20.02.2019 | |
AT | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
MC | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 20.02.2019 | |
AT | 20.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 20.02.2019 | |
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
PL | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 20.02.2019 | |
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
SM | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 20.02.2019 | |
CZ | 20.02.2019 | ||
DK | 20.02.2019 | ||
EE | 20.02.2019 | ||
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
RO | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
SK | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 20.02.2019 | |
ES | 20.02.2019 | ||
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 20.02.2019 | |
FI | 20.02.2019 | ||
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
IT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
HR | 20.02.2019 | ||
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
LV | 20.02.2019 | ||
RS | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
IS | 20.06.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
BG | 20.05.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
GR | 21.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
SE | 20.02.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 20.02.2019 | |
LT | 20.02.2019 | ||
NO | 20.05.2019 | ||
PT | 20.06.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0028147 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,9,11,13,14,16 * the whole document *; | [A]US2009176086 (MARTIN ESTELLE [FR], et al) [A] 1,11,13-17 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0023] ** paragraph [0111] - paragraph [0122]; figures 5-6 *; | [A]KR20120011532 (IMAGE & AMP MATERIALS INC [KR]) [A] 1-47 * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0077]; figures 5B,6 * | Examination | US2011070417 |