EP2986322 - COMBINATION THERAPY COMPRISING A TOR KINASE INHIBITOR AND A 5-SUBSTITUTED QUINAZOLINONE COMPOUND FOR TREATING CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.06.2020 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Signal Pharmaceuticals, LLC 10300 Campus Point Drive Suite 100 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2016/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEGE, Kristen, Mae 616 Howard Ave. Burlingame, CA 94010 / US | 02 /
CHOPRA, Rajesh Flat 5 Ruvigny Mansions Embankment, Putney London SW15 1 LE / GB | 03 /
RAYMON, Heather 3520 Vista de la Orilla San Diego, CA 92117 / US | [2019/29] |
Former [2016/08] | 01 /
HEGE, Kristen, Mae 616 Howard Ave. Burlingame, CA 94010 / US | ||
02 /
CHOPRA, Rajesh 54 Eggers Court Summit, NJ 07901 / US | |||
03 /
RAYMON, Heather 3520 Vista de la Orilla San Diego, CA 92117 / US | Representative(s) | Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [2016/08] | Application number, filing date | 14725328.0 | 16.04.2014 | [2016/08] | WO2014US34321 | Priority number, date | US201361813089P | 17.04.2013 Original published format: US 201361813089 P | US201361908408P | 25.11.2013 Original published format: US 201361908408 P | [2016/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014172436 | Date: | 23.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2986322 | Date: | 24.02.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K45/06, A61K31/4985, A61P35/00, A61P35/02 | [2016/08] | CPC: |
A61K31/517 (EP,US);
A61K31/4985 (EP,US);
A61K39/3955 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/4985, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/517, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K39/3955, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/08] | Title | German: | KOMBINATIONSTHERAPIE MIT EINEM TOR-KINASEINHIBITOR UND EINER 5-SUBSTITUIERTEN CHINAZOLINONVERBINDUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS | [2016/08] | English: | COMBINATION THERAPY COMPRISING A TOR KINASE INHIBITOR AND A 5-SUBSTITUTED QUINAZOLINONE COMPOUND FOR TREATING CANCER | [2016/08] | French: | POLYTHÉRAPIE COMPRENANT UN INHIBITEUR DE KINASE TOR ET UN COMPOSÉ DE QUINAZOLINONE SUBSTITUÉ EN 5 POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER | [2016/08] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/08] | 29.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2008051493 (SIGNAL PHARM LLC [US], et al) [Y] 1-19 * page 56, line 11, paragraph 262 * * claim - * * page 56, line 1 * * page 54, paragraph 257 *; | [Y]WO2010057048 (CALISTOGA PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-19 * claim - * * page 16, paragraph 144 - page 17, paragraph 146 * * page 17, line 23 *; | [Y]WO2010062571 (SIGNAL PHARM LLC [US], et al) [Y] 1-19 * page 55, paragraph 106 * * claims 48, 52, 58-60 * * page 34, paragraph 76 - page 43, paragraph 77 * * claim - * * pages 60-62, paragraphs 112-117 * * page 64, paragraph 122 - page 75, paragraph 140 *; | [Y]WO2011053518 (SIGNAL PHARM LLC [US], et al) [Y] 1-19 * pages 61-62, paragraphs 108-109 * * claim - *; | [Y]US2012028972 (WONG LILLY [US], et al) [Y] 1-19 * claims 10-11 * * page 4, paragraph 41 *; | [YD]US2012230983 (MULLER GEORGE W [US], et al) [YD] 1-19 * claims 31-32, 61-62 * * claim - * * page 4, paragraph 34 * * page 4, paragraphs 40, 42 * * page 17, paragraph 233 *; | [YP]WO2013059396 (SIGNAL PHARM LLC [US]) [YP] 1-19* claim - *; | [YP]WO2013082344 (SIGNAL PHARM LLC [US]) [YP] 1-19 * claim - *; | [A] - COSTA ET AL, "Aspects of mTOR biology and the use of mTOR inhibitors in non-Hodgkin's lymphoma", CANCER TREATMENT REVIEWS, SAUNDERS, US, (20070126), vol. 33, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.CTRV.2006.10.004, ISSN 0305-7372, pages 78 - 84, XP005853740 [A] 1-19 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ctrv.2006.10.004 | [A] - JOHNSON A J ET AL, "ADVANCES IN THE THERAPY OF CHRONIC LYMPHOCYTIC LEUKEMIA", CURRENT OPINION IN HEMATOLOGY, RAPID SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (20030701), vol. 10, no. 4, doi:10.1097/00062752-200307000-00008, ISSN 1065-6251, pages 297 - 305, XP009040617 [A] 1-19 * abstract * * page 302, column left, paragraph last * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00062752-200307000-00008 | by applicant | US2009093504 | US7635700 | US2010029610 | WO2010137547 | US7879984 | US2011129412 | US2011223157 | US8057793 | US8084582 | US8101179 | US8110578 | US2012034185 | US8147832 | US8153125 | US2012134990 | US2012183545 | US2012230983 | US2013142873 | US8569494 | - COHEN, NATURE, (2002), vol. 1, pages 309 - 315 | - COHEN, EUR. J BIOCHEM., (2001), vol. 268, pages 5001 - 5010 | - "Protein Kinase Inhibitors for the Treatment of Disease: The Promise and the Problems", Handbook of Experimental Pharmacology, SPRINGER, (2005), vol. 167 | - SRIDHAR ET AL., PHARMACEUTICAL RESEARCH, (2000), vol. 17, no. 11, pages 1345 - 1353 | - PARK ET AL., CELL, (2000), vol. 101, no. 7, pages 777 - 787 | - FABBRO ET AL., PHARMACOLOGY & THERAPEUTICS, (2002), vol. 93, pages 79 - 98 | - FABBRO ET AL., PHANNACOLOGY & THERAPEUTICS, (2002), vol. 93, pages 79 - 98 | - GEORGAKIS; YOUNES, EXPERT REV. ANTICANCER THER., (2006), vol. 6, no. 1, pages 131 - 140 | - JACKSON, S. P.; BARTEK, J., "The DNA-damage response in human biology and disease", NATURE, (2009), vol. 461, doi:doi:10.1038/nature08467, pages 1071 - 1078, XP055070409 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature08467 | - HOEIJMAKERS, J. H., "J. Genome maintenance mechanisms for preventing cancer", NATURE, (2001), vol. 411, pages 366 - 374 | - VAN GENT, D. C.; HOEIJMAKERS, J. H.; KANAAR, R., "Chromosomal stability and the DNA double-stranded break connection", NAT REV GENET, (2001), vol. 2, doi:doi:10.1038/35056049, pages 196 - 206, XP001099022 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/35056049 | - COLLIS, S. J.; DEWEESE, T. L.; JEGGO P. A.; PARKER, A.R., "The life and death ofDNA-PK", ONCOGENE, (2005), vol. 24, pages 949 - 961 | - TAKATA, M.; SASAKI, M. S.; SONODA, E.; MORRISON, C.; HASHIMOTO, M.; UTSUMI, H. ET AL., "Homologous recombination and non-homologous end-joining pathways of DNA double-strand break repair have overlapping roles in the maintenance of chromosomal integrity in vertebrate cells", EMBO J, (1998), vol. 17, doi:doi:10.1093/emboj/17.18.5497, pages 5497 - 5508, XP002267382 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/emboj/17.18.5497 | - HABER, J. E., "Partners and pathways repairing a double-strand break", TRENDS GENET, (2000), vol. 16, doi:doi:10.1016/S0168-9525(00)02022-9, pages 259 - 264, XP004200111 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-9525(00)02022-9 | - COLLIS, S. J.; DEWEESE, T. L.; JEGGO P. A.; PARKER, A.R., "The life and death of DNA-PK", ONCOGENE, (2005), vol. 24, doi:doi:10.1038/sj.onc.1208332, pages 949 - 961, XP008052096 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.onc.1208332 | - SMITH, G. C. M.; JACKSON, S.P, "The DNA-dependent protein kinase", GENES DEV, (1999), vol. 13, pages 916 - 934 | - JEGGO, P.A.; CALDECOTT, K.; PIDSLEY, S.; BANKS, G.R., "Sensitivity of Chinese hamster ovary mutants defective in DNA double strand break repair to topoisomerase II inhibitors", CANCER RES, (1989), vol. 49, pages 7057 - 7063 | - "ch. 12, sect. 10,", STOCKDALE, Medicine, (1998), vol. 3 | - HIGGINS, J.J. ET AL., NEUROLOGY, (2004), vol. 63, pages 1927 - 1931 | - JO, S ET AL., J. NEUROCHEM, (2005), vol. 94, pages 1212 - 1224 | - HOHBERGER B. ET AL., FEBS LETT, (2009), vol. 583, pages 633 - 637 | - ANGERS S. ET AL., NATURE, (2006), vol. 443, pages 590 - 593 | - ITO, T. ET AL., SCIENCE, (2010), vol. 327, pages 1345 - 1350 | - WILEN, S. H. ET AL., TETRAHEDRON, (1977), vol. 33, page 2725 | - WILEN, S. H., Tables ofResolving Agents and Optical Resolutions, UNIV. OF NOTRE DAME PRESS, (1972), page 268 | - CHESON BD; PFISTNER B; JUWEID, ME, "Revised Response Criteria for Malignant Lymphoma", J. CLIN. ONCOL, (2007), pages 579 - 586 | - HALLEK M; CHESON BD; CATOVSKY D ET AL., BLOOD, (2008), vol. 12, no. 111, pages 5446 - 5456 | - DURIE BGM; HAROUSSEAU J-L; MIGUEL JS ET AL., "International uniform response criteria for multiple myeloma", LEUKEMIA, (2006), vol. 10, no. 10, pages 1 - 7 | - THEREASSE P. ET AL., "New Guidelines to Evaluate the Response to Treatment in Solid Tumors", J. OF THE NATIONAL CANCER INSTITUTE, (2000), pages 205 - 216 | - EISENHAUER E.A.; THERASSE P.; BOGAERTS J. ET AL., "New response evaluation criteria in solid tumours: Revised RECIST guideline (version 1.1", EUROPEAN J. CANCER, (2009), doi:doi:10.1016/j.ejca.2008.10.026, pages 228 - 247, XP025841550 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejca.2008.10.026 | - WEN P.; MACDONALD, DR.; REARDON, DA. ET AL., "Updated response assessment criteria for highgrade gliomas: Response assessment in neuro-oncology working group", J CLIN ONCOL, (2010), vol. 28, pages 1963 - 1972 | - BINDER ET AL., BLOOD, (2006), vol. 108, no. 6, pages 1975 - 1978 | - DEANS ET AL., BLOOD, (2008), vol. 111, no. 4, page 2492 | - PEROSA ET AL., J IMMUNOL., (2009), vol. 182, pages 416 - 423 | - PAUL,, Fundamental Immunology Second Edition,, RAVEN PRESS, (1989), pages 332 - 336 | - CHESON B; PFISTNER B; JUWEID M ET AL., "Revised Response Criteria for Malignant Lymphoma", J CLIN ONCOL, (2007), vol. 25, no. 5, pages 579 - 586 | - CHESON ET AL., J CLIN ONCOL, (2007), vol. 25, no. 5, pages 579 - 586 |