EP2958531 - TECHNIQUE FOR SETTING ENERGY-RELATED LASER-PULSE PARAMETERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.07.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2019 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WaveLight GmbH Am Wolfsmantel 5 91058 Erlangen / DE | [2016/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOESEL, Matthias Trautmannstrasse 30 96117 Memmelsdorf / DE | 02 /
DONITZKY, Christof Beerbacher Strasse 2 90542 Eckental/Eschenau / DE | 03 /
VOGLER, Klaus Am Viehhügel 50 99444 Blankenhain / DE | 04 /
KITTELMANN, Olaf Lohengrinstraße 8c 14109 Berlin / DE | [2016/36] |
Former [2016/01] | 01 /
FOESEL, Matthias Trautmannstrasse 30 96117 Memmelsdorf / DE | ||
02 /
DONITZKY, Christof Beerbacher Strasse 2 90542 Eckental/Eschenau / DE | |||
03 /
VOGLER, Klaus Goethestrasse 13 90542 Eckental/Eschenau / DE | |||
04 /
KITTELMANN, Olaf Lindenthaler Allee 26 14163 Berlin / DE | Representative(s) | Katérle, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [2016/01] | Application number, filing date | 14725700.0 | 22.05.2014 | [2016/01] | WO2014EP60565 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015176759 | Date: | 26.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2958531 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2958531 | Date: | 07.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61F9/008 | [2016/01] | CPC: |
A61F9/0084 (EP,KR,RU,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR EINSTELLUNG ENERGIEBEZOGENER LASERIMPULSPARAMETER | [2016/01] | English: | TECHNIQUE FOR SETTING ENERGY-RELATED LASER-PULSE PARAMETERS | [2016/01] | French: | TECHNIQUE POUR RÉGLER DES PARAMÈTRES D'IMPULSION LASER ASSOCIÉS À L'ÉNERGIE | [2016/01] | Entry into regional phase | 27.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 27.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2014 | Examination requested [2015/53] | 05.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.05.2014 | AL | 07.09.2016 | AT | 07.09.2016 | CY | 07.09.2016 | CZ | 07.09.2016 | EE | 07.09.2016 | FI | 07.09.2016 | HR | 07.09.2016 | LT | 07.09.2016 | LV | 07.09.2016 | MC | 07.09.2016 | MK | 07.09.2016 | RO | 07.09.2016 | RS | 07.09.2016 | SE | 07.09.2016 | SI | 07.09.2016 | SK | 07.09.2016 | SM | 07.09.2016 | BG | 07.12.2016 | NO | 07.12.2016 | IS | 07.01.2017 | IE | 22.05.2017 | LU | 22.05.2017 | MT | 22.05.2017 | [2019/52] |
Former [2019/48] | HU | 22.05.2014 | |
AL | 07.09.2016 | ||
AT | 07.09.2016 | ||
CY | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
IE | 22.05.2017 | ||
LU | 22.05.2017 | ||
MT | 22.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 22.05.2014 | |
AL | 07.09.2016 | ||
AT | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
IE | 22.05.2017 | ||
LU | 22.05.2017 | ||
MT | 22.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 07.09.2016 | |
AT | 07.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
IE | 22.05.2017 | ||
LU | 22.05.2017 | ||
MT | 22.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
IE | 22.05.2017 | ||
LU | 22.05.2017 | ||
MT | 22.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
IE | 22.05.2017 | ||
LU | 22.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/17] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
LU | 22.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
MC | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SI | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
LU | 31.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 07.09.2016 | |
CZ | 07.09.2016 | ||
EE | 07.09.2016 | ||
FI | 07.09.2016 | ||
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
RO | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
SK | 07.09.2016 | ||
SM | 07.09.2016 | ||
BG | 07.12.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
IS | 07.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/21] | FI | 07.09.2016 | |
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
LV | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 07.09.2016 | |
HR | 07.09.2016 | ||
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
RS | 07.09.2016 | ||
SE | 07.09.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 07.09.2016 | |
LT | 07.09.2016 | ||
NO | 07.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 07.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US5656186 (MOUROU GERARD A [US], et al); | [XI]WO2013152875 (WAVELIGHT GMBH [DE]) |