EP2920481 - BRAKE SHIELD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2018 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bentley Motors Limited Pym's Lane Crewe, Cheshire CW1 3PL / GB | [2015/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELLIOT, Gary Stephen Chirkwall Alkington Road Whitchurch Shropshire SY13 1TE / GB | [2015/39] | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Blackfriars House The Parsonage 5th Floor Manchester M3 2JA / GB | [2015/39] | Application number, filing date | 14725754.7 | 23.04.2014 | [2015/39] | WO2014GB51258 | Priority number, date | GB20130007295 | 23.04.2013 Original published format: GB 201307295 | [2015/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014174280 | Date: | 30.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2920481 | Date: | 23.09.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2920481 | Date: | 15.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F16D65/00, F16D65/847 | [2015/39] | CPC: |
F16D55/00 (US);
F16D65/0025 (EP,GB,US);
F16D65/847 (EP,GB,US);
F16D2055/0037 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BREMSENABSCHIRMUNG | [2015/39] | English: | BRAKE SHIELD | [2015/39] | French: | PANNEAU DE FREINAGE | [2015/39] | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2015 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/39] | 09.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.04.2014 | AL | 15.03.2017 | AT | 15.03.2017 | CY | 15.03.2017 | CZ | 15.03.2017 | DK | 15.03.2017 | EE | 15.03.2017 | ES | 15.03.2017 | FI | 15.03.2017 | HR | 15.03.2017 | IT | 15.03.2017 | LT | 15.03.2017 | LV | 15.03.2017 | MC | 15.03.2017 | MK | 15.03.2017 | NL | 15.03.2017 | PL | 15.03.2017 | RO | 15.03.2017 | RS | 15.03.2017 | SE | 15.03.2017 | SI | 15.03.2017 | SK | 15.03.2017 | SM | 15.03.2017 | TR | 15.03.2017 | IE | 23.04.2017 | LU | 23.04.2017 | MT | 23.04.2017 | BE | 30.04.2017 | CH | 30.04.2017 | LI | 30.04.2017 | BG | 15.06.2017 | NO | 15.06.2017 | GR | 16.06.2017 | IS | 15.07.2017 | PT | 17.07.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 23.04.2014 | |
AT | 15.03.2017 | ||
CY | 15.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
MK | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
TR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IE | 23.04.2017 | ||
LU | 23.04.2017 | ||
MT | 23.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 23.04.2014 | |
AT | 15.03.2017 | ||
CY | 15.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
MK | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
IE | 23.04.2017 | ||
LU | 23.04.2017 | ||
MT | 23.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/48] | HU | 23.04.2014 | |
AT | 15.03.2017 | ||
CY | 15.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
IE | 23.04.2017 | ||
LU | 23.04.2017 | ||
MT | 23.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 23.04.2014 | |
AT | 15.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
IE | 23.04.2017 | ||
LU | 23.04.2017 | ||
MT | 23.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
IE | 23.04.2017 | ||
LU | 23.04.2017 | ||
MT | 23.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
IE | 23.04.2017 | ||
LU | 23.04.2017 | ||
BE | 30.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
LU | 23.04.2017 | ||
CH | 30.04.2017 | ||
LI | 30.04.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
SM | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 15.03.2017 | |
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | FI | 15.03.2017 | |
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RS | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE102008022967 (KNORR BREMSE SYSTEME [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-7 * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0056]; figure 2 *; | [A]US6155650 (BARGER ROBERT E [US]) [A] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]EP0555822 (GOODRICH CO B F [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [AD]WO03071153 (VOLVO LASTVAGNAR AB [SE]; SABELSTROEM MATS [SE]; BAGGE LARS [SE]) [AD] 1 * figure 1 * |