EP2992046 - HALOGEN-FREE FLAME RETARDANT TPU [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.12.2021 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.01.2022 [2022/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lubrizol Advanced Materials, Inc. 9911 Brecksville Road Cleveland, OH 44141-3247 / US | [2016/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUDALA, Bela B. Nijverheidsstraat 30 B-2260 Westerlo-Oevel / BE | 02 /
GIOVANNITTI-JENSEN, Ann 9911 Brecksville Road Cleveland, Ohio 44141-3247 / US | 03 /
REMS, Nico Nijverheidsstraat 30 B-2260 Westerlo-Oevel / BE | 04 /
CRAVILLON, Wim Nijverheidsstraat 30 B-2260 Westerlo-Oevel / BE | 05 /
MAKADIA, Chetan M. 9911 Brecksville Road Cleveland, Ohio 44141-3247 / US | [2016/10] | Representative(s) | Bradley, Josephine Mary Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/10] | Bradley, Josephine Mary Marks & Clerk LLP Atholl Exchange 6 Canning Street Edinburgh EH3 8EG / GB | Application number, filing date | 14726283.6 | 21.04.2014 | [2016/10] | WO2014US34783 | Priority number, date | US201361816991P | 29.04.2013 Original published format: US 201361816991 P | [2016/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014179092 | Date: | 06.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2992046 | Date: | 09.03.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C08K3/32, C08K3/34, C08K5/053, C08K5/3492, C08K5/521, C08K5/5313, C08K13/02, C09K21/00 | [2016/10] | CPC: |
C08K5/34924 (EP,US);
C08K13/02 (EP,US);
C08K3/32 (EP,US);
C08K3/34 (EP,US);
C08K5/053 (EP,US);
C08K5/34922 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08K13/02, C08L75/04 (US,EP);
C08K3/32, C08L75/04 (US,EP);
C08K3/34, C08K3/32, C08K5/34922, C08L75/04 (EP,US);
C08K3/34, C08L75/04 (US,EP);
C08K5/053, C08L75/04 (US,EP);
C08K5/34922, C08L75/04 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/10] | Title | German: | HALOGENFREIE FLAMMHEMMENDE TPU | [2016/10] | English: | HALOGEN-FREE FLAME RETARDANT TPU | [2016/10] | French: | TPU RETARDATEUR DE FLAMME EXEMPT D'HALOGÈNE | [2016/10] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/10] | 21.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/01] | 25.08.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2007010318 (ITALMATCH CHEMICALS SPA [IT], et al) [Y] 1-27 * page 11, line 12 - line 13 * * example - *; | [T]WO2008151897 (TESA AG [DE], et al) [T] * page 35, line 3 *; | [Y]EP2031016 (LUBRIZOL ADVANCED MAT INC [US]) [Y] 1-27 * paragraphs [0002] , [0012] * * tables 1-2 *; | [Y]EP2476730 (BASF SE [DE]) [Y] 1-27 * paragraph [0069] * | by applicant | DE2252258 | DE2447727 | US4131731 | US5110850 | WO9739053 | US5837760 | EP0932643 | US6777466 | WO2006121549 | EP2100919 | WO2012067685 |