EP3134965 - ADAPTIVE SELF-BIAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2017/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOKAS, Jadran 29 Westmeath Crescent Ottawa, Ontario K2K 3B1 / CA | [2017/09] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/09] | Röthinger, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 14727055.7 | 23.04.2014 | [2017/09] | WO2014IB60955 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015162454 | Date: | 29.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3134965 | Date: | 01.03.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H03F1/30 | [2017/09] | CPC: |
H03F1/3247 (EP,US);
G06F1/28 (US);
H03F1/0266 (EP,US);
H03F1/0272 (EP,US);
H03F1/301 (EP,US);
H03F3/19 (US);
H03F3/21 (US);
H03F2200/105 (US);
H03F2200/321 (EP,US);
H03F2200/447 (EP,US);
H03F2200/451 (US);
H03F2200/462 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/09] | Title | German: | ADAPTIVE SELBSTVORSPANNUNG | [2017/09] | English: | ADAPTIVE SELF-BIAS | [2017/09] | French: | AUTO-POLARISATION ADAPTATIVE | [2017/09] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/09] | 17.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/06] | 04.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2023 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US6137354 (DACUS FARRON L [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-7,14-17 * column 13, line 35 - column 14, line 45; figures 11, 12 *[I] 3,4,8-13,18-20; | [XI]WO03038993 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [X] 1,2,5-7,14-17 * page 2, line 29 - page 3, line 4 * * page 4, line 27 - page 9, line 14; figure 1 * [I] 3,4,8-13,18-20 |