EP2994025 - SYSTEM AND METHOD OF MONITORING RETAIL UNITS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trax Technology Solutions Pte Ltd. 28 Bukit Pasoh Road Singapore 089842 / SG | [2016/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLEIN, Shavit Noa 86 Jellicoe Rd, 10-18 Singapore 208745 / SG | [2016/11] | Representative(s) | Finnegan Europe LLP 1 London Bridge London SE1 9BG / GB | [2023/38] |
Former [2016/11] | Sadler, Peter Frederick Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 14727260.3 | 24.04.2014 | [2016/11] | WO2014IL50378 | Priority number, date | IL20130226146 | 05.05.2013 Original published format: IL 22614613 | [2016/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014181324 | Date: | 13.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2994025 | Date: | 16.03.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2994025 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A47F10/02 | [2016/11] | CPC: |
A47F10/02 (EP,US);
A47F3/02 (US);
A47F3/08 (US);
A47F3/125 (US);
A47F2010/025 (EP,US);
B65D2211/00 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG VON VERKAUFSEINHEITEN | [2016/11] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD OF MONITORING RETAIL UNITS | [2016/11] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE CONTRÔLE D'UNITÉS DE VENTE AU DÉTAIL | [2016/11] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/11] | 21.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 21.06.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | deleted | [2021/51] |
Former [2021/12] | ID: | 01 | |
For: | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | ||
Date: | 10.02.2021 | ||
[2021/51] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 20.09.2023 | ES | 20.09.2023 | HR | 20.09.2023 | PL | 20.09.2023 | RO | 20.09.2023 | RS | 20.09.2023 | SK | 20.09.2023 | SM | 20.09.2023 | NO | 20.12.2023 | GR | 21.12.2023 | IS | 20.01.2024 | [2024/25] |
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 20.09.2023 | |
ES | 20.09.2023 | ||
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
RO | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SK | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 20.09.2023 | |
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/11] | HR | 20.09.2023 | |
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 20.12.2023 | |
GR | 21.12.2023 | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2002295959 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [X] 1-18 * figure 1 * * abstract *; | [X]JP2003004366 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1-8,10-18 * figures 1-8 * * abstract *; | [X]JP2007046833 (FUNAI ELECTRIC CO) [X] 1-5,11,13-18 * figure 2 ** abstract * |