EP2994103 - CONSUMER PRODUCTS COMPRISING SILANE-MODIFIED OILS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.04.2018 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.05.2018 [2018/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2016/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOS, John, August One Procter&Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | 02 /
ZANNONI, Luke, Andrew One Procter&Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | 03 /
PANANDIKER, Rajan, Keshav One Procter&Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | 04 /
SCHUBERT, Beth, Ann One Procter&Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | 05 /
WHITELY, Nathan, Ray One Procter&Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | [2016/11] | Representative(s) | Kremer, Véronique Marie Joséphine, et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Sulzbacher Straße 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/11] | Hirsch, Uwe Thomas M.H. Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Frankfurter Strasse 145 61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 14727354.4 | 08.05.2014 | [2016/11] | WO2014US37305 | Priority number, date | US201361821818P | 10.05.2013 Original published format: US 201361821818 P | [2016/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014182902 | Date: | 13.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2994103 | Date: | 16.03.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.03.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/58, A61K8/91, C11D3/16, A61Q3/00, A61Q3/02, A61Q15/00, A61Q13/00, A61Q19/00, C11D3/22, C11D3/37, C11B9/00, A61Q5/02, A61Q9/04, A61Q5/00, A61Q19/10 | [2016/11] | CPC: |
A61K8/922 (EP,US);
A61K8/893 (EP,US);
A61Q13/00 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
A61Q19/10 (EP,US);
A61Q3/02 (US);
A61Q5/02 (EP,US);
A61Q5/12 (EP,US);
C07F7/1804 (US);
C11B9/00 (US);
C11D3/162 (EP,US);
C11D3/221 (EP,US);
C11D3/222 (EP,US);
C11D3/373 (EP,US);
A61K2800/57 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/11] | Title | German: | VERBRAUCHERPRODUKTE MIT SILANMODIFIZIERTEN ÖLEN | [2016/11] | English: | CONSUMER PRODUCTS COMPRISING SILANE-MODIFIED OILS | [2016/11] | French: | PRODUITS DE CONSOMMATION COMPRENANT DES HUILES MODIFIÉES SILANE | [2016/11] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/11] | 27.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/19] | 04.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2010083871 (NARAYAN RAMANI [US] ET AL) [X] 1-4,8,13-15 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0021]; figure 1; examples 1-5,10; claim - * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0051] *; | [X]US5994474 (WEY HANS GUENTHER [DE] ET AL) [X] 1-3,5-8,12,14,15 * column 2, line 3 - column 4, line 35; examples 1-26; claim - * * column 1, line 5 - line 13 *; | [X]US2007183998 (SUZUKI TAKAHIRO [JP] ET AL) [X] 1-3,8-12,14,15 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0113]; examples 3-5; claim -; table 1 *; | [XI]WO2011034836 (UNION CARBIDE CHEM PLASTIC [US]; DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US]; ESS) [X] 1-3,5,7,8,11,13 * paragraphs [0002] , [0005] - paragraph [0073]; example -; claim - * * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0090] * [I] 6; | [X]WO2012055812 (OREAL [FR]; KHENNICHE SAMIRA [FR]; PLOS GREGORY [FR]) [X] 1-3,5,8,10-15 * page 2, line 26 - page 3, line 25; examples 1,2; claim - *; | [E]WO2014099256 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US]; ROHM & HAAS [US]) [E] 1-3,5,7,8,10-15 * Formulations A,B; page 2, paragraph 5 - page 4, paragraph 4; example 1; claim -; table I *; | [X]EP0473039 (DOW CORNING [US]) [X] 1-3,8,11-15 * page 3, line 11 - page 8, line 6; examples 1-6,8; claim - *; | [X]US6432451 (LEE JANG YOUNG [KR] ET AL) [X] 1-3,8-15 * column 2, line 19 - column 7, line 35; examples 2,6,11; table 2 *; | [X]EP0610026 (DOW CORNING [US]) [X] 1-3,8,10-15 * page 2, line 24 - page 3, line 57; examples IB,IIE; tables I,II *; | [XI]EP2407496 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES LLC FORMERLY KNOWN AS DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES) [X] 1-3,5,7,8,14,15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0010] - paragraph [0106]; claim -; tables 1,2,3,5 * * paragraph [0151] - paragraph [0169] * [I] 6,12 |