EP2994863 - CONSIDERING SOCIAL INFORMATION IN GENERATING RECOMMENDATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2016/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIN, Woo Hyun c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
UPPAL, Siddharth c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2016/11] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2016/11] | Application number, filing date | 14727690.1 | 08.05.2014 | [2016/11] | WO2014US37224 | Priority number, date | US201313890246 | 09.05.2013 Original published format: US201313890246 | [2016/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014182862 | Date: | 13.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2994863 | Date: | 16.03.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.02.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/06, G06Q50/00 | [2016/47] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0631 (EP,RU,US);
G06Q50/01 (EP,RU,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/11] | G06Q30/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/11] | Title | German: | BERÜCKSICHTIGUNG VON SOZIALEN INFORMATIONEN BEI DER ERZEUGUNG VON EMPFEHLUNGEN | [2016/11] | English: | CONSIDERING SOCIAL INFORMATION IN GENERATING RECOMMENDATIONS | [2016/11] | French: | CONSIDÉRATION D'INFORMATIONS SOCIALES POUR LA GÉNÉRATION DE RECOMMANDATIONS | [2016/11] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2015 | Search fee paid | 05.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/11] | 22.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.06.2020 | 04.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/32] | 14.03.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/32] | 22.06.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2011173095 (KASSAEI FARHANG [US], et al); | [A]US2012001919 (LUMER ERIK [IT]); | [Y]US2012233020 (EBERSTADT GEORGE [US], et al); | [A]US2013030950 (LENG SHANSHU [CN]); | [A]US2013054407 (SABUR ZAHEED MD SHAHJAHAN [CH]); | [Y]US2013086057 (HARRINGTON TIMOTHY [US], et al) |