EP2979249 - METHOD OF LOCALIZATION OF ELECTRODES FOR MONITORING BIOELECTRIC SIGNALS FROM THE PATIENT'S BRAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innomed S.r.l. Loc. Camerelle 6 86077 Pozzilli (IS) / IT | [2016/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAVONE, Luigi Via Iconicella 97/C I-86029 Trivento (CB) / IT | 02 /
SEBASTIANO, Fabio Via Torretta 21 I-86029 Trivento (CB) / IT | [2016/05] | Representative(s) | Cardelli, Guido, et al c/o INGENIIS s.a.s. di B. Ciccarello e C. Via Antonio De Berti, 24 00143 Roma / IT | [2017/12] |
Former [2016/05] | Cardelli, Guido, et al c/o Ingeniis s.a.s. di Basilio Ciccarello e C. Via Antonio De Berti, 24 00143 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 14728277.6 | 27.03.2014 | [2016/05] | WO2014IB00678 | Priority number, date | IT2013RM00186 | 28.03.2013 Original published format: IT RM20130186 | [2016/05] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014155203 | Date: | 02.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2979249 | Date: | 03.02.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2979249 | Date: | 22.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00 | [2016/05] | CPC: |
G06T7/11 (EP);
G06T7/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR LOKALISIERUNG VON ELEKTRODEN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG BIOELEKTRISCHER SIGNALE AUS DEM GEHIRN EINES PATIENTEN | [2016/05] | English: | METHOD OF LOCALIZATION OF ELECTRODES FOR MONITORING BIOELECTRIC SIGNALS FROM THE PATIENT'S BRAIN | [2016/05] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE LOCALISATION D'ÉLECTRODES PERMETTANT DE SURVEILLER DES SIGNAUX BIOÉLECTRIQUES PROVENANT DU CERVEAU D'UN PATIENT | [2016/05] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/05] | 24.05.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.10.2016 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.03.2014 | AL | 22.03.2017 | AT | 22.03.2017 | CY | 22.03.2017 | CZ | 22.03.2017 | DK | 22.03.2017 | EE | 22.03.2017 | ES | 22.03.2017 | FI | 22.03.2017 | HR | 22.03.2017 | LT | 22.03.2017 | LV | 22.03.2017 | MC | 22.03.2017 | MK | 22.03.2017 | NL | 22.03.2017 | PL | 22.03.2017 | RO | 22.03.2017 | RS | 22.03.2017 | SE | 22.03.2017 | SI | 22.03.2017 | SK | 22.03.2017 | SM | 22.03.2017 | TR | 22.03.2017 | IE | 27.03.2017 | LU | 27.03.2017 | MT | 27.03.2017 | BE | 31.03.2017 | CH | 31.03.2017 | LI | 31.03.2017 | FR | 22.05.2017 | BG | 22.06.2017 | NO | 22.06.2017 | GR | 23.06.2017 | IS | 22.07.2017 | PT | 24.07.2017 | DE | 03.10.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 27.03.2014 | |
AT | 22.03.2017 | ||
CY | 22.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
MK | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
TR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IE | 27.03.2017 | ||
LU | 27.03.2017 | ||
MT | 27.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 22.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
DE | 03.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 27.03.2014 | |
AT | 22.03.2017 | ||
CY | 22.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
MK | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
IE | 27.03.2017 | ||
LU | 27.03.2017 | ||
MT | 27.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 22.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
DE | 03.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 27.03.2014 | |
AT | 22.03.2017 | ||
CY | 22.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
IE | 27.03.2017 | ||
LU | 27.03.2017 | ||
MT | 27.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 22.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
DE | 03.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 27.03.2014 | |
AT | 22.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
IE | 27.03.2017 | ||
LU | 27.03.2017 | ||
MT | 27.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 22.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
DE | 03.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
IE | 27.03.2017 | ||
LU | 27.03.2017 | ||
MT | 27.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 22.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
DE | 03.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
IE | 27.03.2017 | ||
LU | 27.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 22.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
DE | 03.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SI | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
IE | 27.03.2017 | ||
LU | 27.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 22.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
DE | 03.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
LU | 27.03.2017 | ||
FR | 22.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
DE | 03.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
DK | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
FR | 22.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
FR | 22.05.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
MC | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
SM | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
PT | 24.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
PL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 22.03.2017 | |
CZ | 22.03.2017 | ||
EE | 22.03.2017 | ||
ES | 22.03.2017 | ||
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RO | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
SK | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
IS | 22.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 22.03.2017 | |
FI | 22.03.2017 | ||
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | FI | 22.03.2017 | |
HR | 22.03.2017 | ||
LT | 22.03.2017 | ||
LV | 22.03.2017 | ||
NL | 22.03.2017 | ||
RS | 22.03.2017 | ||
SE | 22.03.2017 | ||
BG | 22.06.2017 | ||
NO | 22.06.2017 | ||
GR | 23.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X] - HERMES D ET AL, "Automated electrocorticographic electrode localization on individually rendered brain surfaces", JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE METHODS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHER B.V., AMSTERDAM, NL, (20100115), vol. 185, no. 2, pages 293 - 298, XP026819084 [X] 1-6 * page 294, column r, paragraph 3 - page 295, column l, paragraph 1 * | [A] - YANG A. I. ET AL., "Localization of dense intracranial electrode arrays using magnetic resonance imaging", NEUROIMAGE, (2012), pages 157 - 165, XP002715902 [A] 1-6 * page 157, column r, paragraph l - page 158, column r, paragraph 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.neuroimage.2012.06.039 | [A] - MILLER K J ET AL, "Cortical electrode localization from X-rays and simple mapping for electrocorticographic research: The ''Location on Cortex'' (LOC) package for MATLAB", JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE METHODS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHER B.V., AMSTERDAM, NL, (20070515), vol. 162, no. 1-2, pages 303 - 308, XP027016081 [A] 1-6 * Section 2. Methods * | [A] - DALAL S S ET AL, "Localization of neurosurgically implanted electrodes via photograph-MRI-radiograph coregistration", JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE METHODS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHER B.V., AMSTERDAM, NL, (20080915), vol. 174, no. 1, pages 106 - 115, XP026073401 [A] 1-6 * abstract * * Section 2.6 MRI-radiograph registration * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jneumeth.2008.06.028 | [AD] - ANDREW R DYKSTRA ET AL, "Individualized localization and cortical surface-based registration of intracranial electrodes", NEUROIMAGE, ACADEMIC PRESS, ORLANDO, FL, US, (20111116), vol. 59, no. 4, pages 3563 - 3570, XP028456614 [AD] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.neuroimage.2011.11.046 | Examination | - Dimitri Kovalev ET AL, "Rapid and Fully Automated Visualization of Subdural Electrodes in the Presurgical Evaluation of Epilepsy Patients", American Journal of Neuroradiology, United States, (20050501), page 1078, URL: http://www.ajnr.org/content/26/5/1078.full.pdf#page=1&view=FitH, XP055296221 | - Kevin Morris ET AL, "A Computer-Generated Stereotactic "Virtual Subdural Grid" to Guide Resective Epilepsy Surgery", American Journal of Neuroradiology, United States, (20040101), page 77, XP055296228 | by applicant | - DYKSTRA ET AL., "Individualized localization and cortical surface -based registration of intracranial electrodes", NEUROIMAGE, (2012), vol. 59, doi:doi:10.1016/j.neuroimage.2011.11.046, pages 3563 - 70, XP028456614 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.neuroimage.2011.11.046 | - LAVIOLETTE ET AL., "Three-dimensional visualization of subdural electrodes for presurgical planning", NEUROSURGERY, (2011), vol. 68, no. 1, pages 152 - 60 | - "Automated multimodality image registration based on information theory", COLLIGNON ET AL., Proc Information Processing in Medical Imaging, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, (1995), pages 263 - 274 | - J. ASHBURNER; K.J. FRISTON, "Unified segmentation", NEUROIMAGE, (2005), vol. 26, doi:doi:10.1016/j.neuroimage.2005.02.018, pages 839 - 851, XP004936781 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.neuroimage.2005.02.018 |