EP3016597 - SURGICAL INSTRUMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.2016 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.12.2016 [2016/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Persson, Jan Östratornsvägen 45 224 68 Lund / SE | [2016/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2016/19] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/19] | Awapatent AB P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 14728580.3 | 09.06.2014 | [2016/19] | WO2014EP61932 | Priority number, date | SE20130050843 | 05.07.2013 Original published format: SE 1350843 | [2016/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015000660 | Date: | 08.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3016597 | Date: | 11.05.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.01.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/02 | [2016/19] | CPC: |
A61B17/0218 (EP,SE,US);
A61B17/3423 (US);
A61B17/02 (SE);
A61M27/00 (SE);
A61B2217/005 (EP,US);
A61B2217/007 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/19] | Title | German: | CHIRURGISCHES INSTRUMENT | [2016/19] | English: | SURGICAL INSTRUMENT | [2016/19] | French: | INSTRUMENT CHIRURGICAL | [2016/19] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/19] | 28.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.11.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]BE631649 (JUNGBLUT ALBERT) [X] 1-4,7-9* figures 1-5 *; | [XY]US5893863 (YOON INBAE [US]) [X] 1,6-8 * figures 8,9,22,23,30,31 * * column 10, line 11 - line 16 * * column 10, line 51 - line 65 * * column 12, line 22 - line 25 * [Y] 10-13; | [IY]US2005107671 (MCKINLEY LAURENCE M [US]) [I] 1-5,7,8 * figures 1a-1f * [Y] 14; | [XY]US8109958 (ALLEYNE NEVILLE [US]) [X] 1-3,6,14 * figures 2-4 * * column 4, line 60 - column 5, line 5 * [Y] 14; | [Y]US2012101339 (BRANNON JAMES K [US]) [Y] 10-13 * figures 8-14 * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0052] * |