EP3143010 - ENERGY EFFICIENT MANUFACTURING PROCESS FOR PREPARING N,O-TRIGLYCIDYL AMINOPHENOLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/12] | [0001]ENERGY EFFICIENT MANUFACTURING PROCESS FOR PREPARING N,0- TRIGLYCIDYL AMINOPHENOLS | ||
[2019/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.11.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.10.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aditya Birla Chemicals (Thailand) Ltd. 888/167 16th Floor Mahatun Plaza Building Ploenchit Road Lumpini Bangkok 10330 / TH | [2017/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUBEY PRADIP, Kumar 888/167 16th Floor Mahatun Plaza Building Ploenchit Road, Lumpini Bangkok 10330 / TH | 02 /
KHULLAR, Alok 888/167 16th Floor Mahatun Plaza Building Ploenchit Road, Lumpini Bangkok 10330 / TH | 03 /
NAYAWAT, Thipa 888/167 16th Floor Mahatun Plaza Building Ploenchit Road, Lumpini Bangkok 10330 / TH | 04 /
VISATSINGH, Kamonsun 888/167 16th Floor Mahatun Plaza Building Ploenchit Road, Lumpini Bangkok 10330 / TH | 05 /
SAMUTHSEN, Patcharin 888/167 16th Floor Mahatun Plaza Building Ploenchit Road, Lumpini Bangkok 10330 / TH | 06 /
SAMANT, Prashant 888/167 16th Floor Mahatun Plaza Building Ploenchit Road, Lumpini Bangkok 10330 / TH | [2017/12] | Representative(s) | Curell Suñol S.L.P. Muntaner 240, 4º 2ª 08021 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2017/12] | Curell Suñol S.L.P. Via Augusta 21 08006 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 14728691.8 | 15.05.2014 | [2017/12] | WO2014TH00024 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015174936 | Date: | 19.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3143010 | Date: | 22.03.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3143010 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07D301/24, C07D303/36 | [2017/12] | CPC: |
C07D301/24 (EP,KR,US);
C07D303/36 (EP,KR,US);
Y02P20/582 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENERGIEEFFIZIENTES HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON N, O-TRIGLYCIDYLAMINOPHENOLEN | [2019/49] | English: | ENERGY EFFICIENT MANUFACTURING PROCESS FOR PREPARING N,O-TRIGLYCIDYL AMINOPHENOLS | [2019/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION ÉCONOME EN ÉNERGIE SERVANT À PRÉPARER DES N,O-TRIGLYCIDYLAMINOPHÉNOLS | [2017/12] |
Former [2017/12] | ENERGIEEFFIZIENTER HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON N, 0-TRIGLYCIDYLAMINOPHENOLEN | ||
Former [2017/12] | [0001]ENERGY EFFICIENT MANUFACTURING PROCESS FOR PREPARING N,0- TRIGLYCIDYL AMINOPHENOLS | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/12] | 14.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 24.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.02.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/11] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 24.07.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 24.07.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.08.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.05.2014 | AL | 08.04.2020 | AT | 08.04.2020 | CY | 08.04.2020 | DK | 08.04.2020 | EE | 08.04.2020 | ES | 08.04.2020 | FI | 08.04.2020 | HR | 08.04.2020 | LT | 08.04.2020 | LV | 08.04.2020 | MC | 08.04.2020 | MK | 08.04.2020 | MT | 08.04.2020 | RO | 08.04.2020 | RS | 08.04.2020 | SE | 08.04.2020 | SI | 08.04.2020 | SK | 08.04.2020 | SM | 08.04.2020 | TR | 08.04.2020 | IE | 15.05.2020 | LU | 15.05.2020 | BE | 31.05.2020 | CH | 31.05.2020 | LI | 31.05.2020 | FR | 08.06.2020 | BG | 08.07.2020 | NO | 08.07.2020 | GR | 09.07.2020 | IS | 08.08.2020 | PT | 17.08.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 15.05.2014 | |
AL | 08.04.2020 | ||
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
CY | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
MT | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
TR | 08.04.2020 | ||
IE | 15.05.2020 | ||
LU | 15.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
FR | 08.06.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SI | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
IE | 15.05.2020 | ||
LU | 15.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
FR | 08.06.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
IE | 15.05.2020 | ||
LU | 15.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
LU | 15.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SK | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
AT | 08.04.2020 | ||
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
EE | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
MC | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
ES | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
RO | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
SM | 08.04.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
DK | 08.04.2020 | ||
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 08.04.2020 | |
FI | 08.04.2020 | ||
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
BG | 08.07.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
RS | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
HR | 08.04.2020 | ||
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
LV | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
GR | 09.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 08.04.2020 | |
LT | 08.04.2020 | ||
SE | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
PT | 17.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 08.04.2020 | |
NO | 08.07.2020 | ||
IS | 08.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 08.08.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XD]US2951825 (REINKING NORMAN H, et al) [XD] 1-26 * column 2, paragraph 2 - column 3, paragraph 4; claims 5-7 *; | [XD]JPH04139230 (SUMITOMO METAL IND) [XD] 1-26* page 3; example 1; claim - * |