EP2999872 - TURBOPUMP WITH ANTI-VIBRATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.03.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 21.02.2024 [2024/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ArianeGroup SAS 51-61 Route de Verneuil 78130 Les Mureaux / FR | [2022/04] |
Former [2018/34] | For all designated states ARIANEGROUP SAS Tour Cristal 7-11 quai André Citroën 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2018/28] | For all designated states Safran Aircraft Engines 2 boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2016/13] | For all designated states SNECMA 2 Boulevard du Général Martial Valin 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LE LOUËDEC, Dominique 19 rue Paul Gauguin F-27950 Saint Marcel / FR | 02 /
CHEMLA, Guillaume 41 Boulevard du Roi F-78000 Versailles / FR | 03 /
EVEN, Philippe 9 rue de la Treille F-27620 Sainte Genevieve les Gasny / FR | 04 /
MILLON, Frédérick 5 ter rue Fosse Rouge F-27950 Saint Marcel / FR | 05 /
COLLONGEAT, Laurent 2 rue Fernandel F-77173 Chevry-Cossygny / FR | [2022/31] |
Former [2016/49] | 01 /
LE LOUËDEC, Dominique 19 rue Paul Gauguin F-27950 Saint Marcel / FR | ||
02 /
CHEMLA, Guillaume 41 Boulevard du Roi F-78000 Versailles / FR | |||
03 /
EVEN, Philippe 9 rue de la Treille F-27620 Sainte Genevieve les Gasny / FR | |||
04 /
MILLON, Frédérick 5 ter rue Fosse Rouge F-27950 Saint Michel / FR | |||
05 /
COLLONGEAT, Laurent 2 rue Fernandel F-77173 Chevry-Cossygny / FR | |||
Former [2016/13] | 01 /
LE LOUËDEC, Dominique 19 rue Paul Gauguin F-27950 Saint Marcel / FR | ||
02 /
CHEMLA, Guillaume 41 Boulevard du Roi F-78000 Versailles / FR | |||
03 /
EVEN, Philippe 9 rue de la Treille F-27620 Sainte Genevieve les Gasny / FR | |||
04 /
MILLON, Frédérick 5 ter rue Fosse Rouge F-27950 Saint Michel / FR | |||
05 /
COLLONGEAT, Laurent 2 Boulevard Maréchal Leclerc Résidence Belle Isle F-27200 Vernon / FR | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2022/31] |
Former [2016/13] | Gilbey, Vincent, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 14729954.9 | 14.05.2014 | [2016/13] | WO2014FR51119 | Priority number, date | FR20130054511 | 20.05.2013 Original published format: FR 1354511 | [2016/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014188109 | Date: | 27.11.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2999872 | Date: | 30.03.2016 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2999872 | Date: | 03.08.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F02K9/48, F02K9/56, F01D11/06, F01D25/04 | [2016/13] | CPC: |
F01D11/06 (EP,US);
F04D27/009 (US);
F01D25/04 (EP,US);
F02K9/48 (EP,US);
F02K9/566 (EP,US);
F04D17/10 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TURBOPUMPE MIT SCHWINGUNGSVERMINDERUNGSSYSTEM | [2022/04] | English: | TURBOPUMP WITH ANTI-VIBRATION SYSTEM | [2016/13] | French: | TURBOPOMPE AVEC SYSTÈME ANTI-VIBRATIONS | [2022/04] |
Former [2016/13] | TURBOPUMPE MIT EINEM SCHWINGUNGSDÄMPFUNGSSYSTEM | ||
Former [2016/13] | TURBOPOMPE AVEC SYSTEME ANTI-VIBRATIONS | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/13] | 22.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.06.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 03.08.2022 | AT | 03.08.2022 | CZ | 03.08.2022 | DK | 03.08.2022 | EE | 03.08.2022 | FI | 03.08.2022 | HR | 03.08.2022 | LT | 03.08.2022 | LV | 03.08.2022 | MC | 03.08.2022 | NL | 03.08.2022 | PL | 03.08.2022 | RO | 03.08.2022 | RS | 03.08.2022 | SE | 03.08.2022 | SI | 03.08.2022 | SK | 03.08.2022 | SM | 03.08.2022 | NO | 03.11.2022 | GR | 04.11.2022 | IS | 03.12.2022 | PT | 05.12.2022 | [2024/08] |
Former [2023/37] | AL | 03.08.2022 | |
AT | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SI | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 03.08.2022 | |
AT | 03.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 03.08.2022 | |
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
EE | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SK | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 03.08.2022 | |
CZ | 03.08.2022 | ||
DK | 03.08.2022 | ||
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RO | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 03.08.2022 | |
FI | 03.08.2022 | ||
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 03.08.2022 | |
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
SM | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 03.08.2022 | |
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
IS | 03.12.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | FI | 03.08.2022 | |
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
PL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 03.08.2022 | |
HR | 03.08.2022 | ||
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
GR | 04.11.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 03.08.2022 | |
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
LV | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | ||
PT | 05.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 03.08.2022 | |
LT | 03.08.2022 | ||
NL | 03.08.2022 | ||
RS | 03.08.2022 | ||
SE | 03.08.2022 | ||
NO | 03.11.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2839005 (MEANS HERBERT E) [X] 1 * column 4, line 34 - line 39; figures 1,2 * [Y] 2,3,6,7,10; | [Y]EP0222262 (SEALOL [FR]) [Y] 1,2,11,12* page 2; figures 1-5; claims 1-7 *; | [XYI]EP1672270 (SNECMA [FR]) [X] 1,3-10 * the whole document * [Y] 3-7,10-12 [I] 2; | [Y]FR2964425 (SNECMA [FR]) [Y] 1,2,11,12 * page 7, line 34 - page 8, line 12; figures 1-4 *; | [Y]FR2967725 (SNECMA [FR]) [Y] 1,2,4,5 * figures 1-6 * | Examination | US3237401 | US6991235 | by applicant | EP1672270 |