EP2997373 - RECEPTORS FOR B7-H4 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.2016 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.01.2017 [2017/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MedImmune, LLC One MedImmune Way Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US | [2016/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LANGERMANN, Solomon 6606 Cross Country Blvd. Baltimore, MD 21215 / US | 02 /
PODOJIL, Joseph R. 4533 Saratoga Avenue Downers Grove, IL 60515 / US | 03 /
MILLER, Stephen D. 946 Gunderson Avenue Oak Park, IL 60304 / US | [2016/12] | Representative(s) | Johnson, Yvonne Catherine Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2016/12] | Application number, filing date | 14730049.5 | 19.05.2014 | [2016/12] | WO2014US38623 | Priority number, date | US201361824860P | 17.05.2013 Original published format: US 201361824860 P | [2016/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014186798 | Date: | 20.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2997373 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/564, A61K38/00, A61K39/00, G01N33/68 | [2016/12] | CPC: |
G01N33/564 (EP,US);
A61K38/1709 (EP,US);
A61K38/177 (EP,US);
A61K38/1774 (EP,US);
C07K14/70532 (US);
C07K14/71 (US);
C07K16/2827 (US);
C12N15/1138 (US);
G01N33/6893 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (US);
C07K2317/76 (US);
C07K2319/30 (US);
G01N2333/70532 (EP,US);
G01N2800/24 (EP,US);
G01N2800/245 (EP,US);
G01N2800/52 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/12] | Title | German: | REZEPTOREN FÜR B7-H4 | [2016/12] | English: | RECEPTORS FOR B7-H4 | [2016/12] | French: | RÉCEPTEURS POUR B7-H4 | [2016/12] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/12] | 02.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/04] | 02.08.2016 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 08.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2017/04] | 08.09.2016 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO9929858 (CHILDRENS MEDICAL CENTER [US], et al) [X] 12-15 * claims 1-9; abstract * [I] 16-20; | [XI]WO9955855 (GENESENSE TECHNOLOGIES INC [CA], et al) [X] 30,32,34-38,40-55 * Claims; page 35, par 3 * [I] 31,33,39; | [X]WO2007009816 (STICHTING KATHOLIEKE UNIV [NL], et al) [X] 7-9* abstact; claims *; | [XD]US2008206235 (CHEN LIEPING [US]) [XD] 12,13,21-29,40-55 * Claims *; | [XDI]US2009142342 (CHEN LIEPING [US]) [XD] 56-63,71-97,99 * Claims * [I] 69,70,98; | [XI]WO2011026122 (AMPLIMMUNE INC [US], et al) [X] 56-63,71-97,99 * Figure 1a; abstract; claims 1-30 * [I] 69,70,98; | [A]US2012039883 (CHEN LIEPING [US]) [A] 1-11 * Claims; paragraphs 59-79 *; | [XI]WO2013025779 (AMPLIMMUNE INC [US], et al) [X] 12,13,23,40-56,64-68,76-82 * Claims * [I] 24-29,39,69,70; | [A] - XIAOJIE WANG ET AL, "B7-H4 Treatment of T Cells Inhibits ERK, JNK, p38, and AKT Activation", PLOS ONE, (20120104), vol. 7, no. 1, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0028232, page e28232, XP055134288 [A] 1-99 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0028232 | [A] - JANELLE M. FAUCI ET AL, "A review of B7-H3 and B7-H4 immune molecules and their role in ovarian cancer", GYNECOLOGIC ONCOLOGY, (20121101), vol. 127, no. 2, doi:10.1016/j.ygyno.2012.08.017, ISSN 0090-8258, pages 420 - 425, XP055134637 [A] 1-99 * Table 1 ; abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ygyno.2012.08.017 | by applicant | US5120727 | US5162333 | US5202332 | US5283173 | US5385908 | WO9504738 | WO9516691 | WO9522972 | US5484790 | US5530006 | US5559112 | US5567709 | US5780462 | US5821333 | WO9856401 | US5932448 | US5989591 | WO0001385 | US6015809 | WO0100814 | WO0244321 | US6562576 | US6673545 | US6677157 | US6699475 | US6790624 | US2008206235 | WO2009005352 | US2009142342 | US7931896 | US7989173 | US2012177645 | US2012276095 | - LENSHOW ET AL., ANNU. REV. IMMUNOL., (1996), vol. 14, pages 233 - 258 | - CHAMBERS; ALLISON, CURR. OPIN. IMMUNOL., (1997), vol. 9, pages 396 - 404 | - RATHMELL; THOMPSON, ANNU. REV. IMMUNOL., (1999), vol. 17, pages 81 - 828 | - KRUMMEL; ALLISON, J. EXP. MED., (1996), vol. 183, pages 2533 - 2540 | - WALUNAS ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1996), vol. 183, pages 2541 - 2550 | - DONG ET AL., NATURE MED., (1999), vol. 5, pages 1365 - 1369 | - FREEMAN ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (2000), vol. 192, pages 1 - 9 | - TSENG ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (2001), vol. 193, pages 839 - 846 | - LATCHMAN ET AL., NATURE IMMUNOL., (2001), vol. 2, pages 261 - 268 | - WANG ET AL., BLOOD, (2000), vol. 96, pages 2808 - 2813 | - SWALLOW ET AL., IMMUNITY, (1999), vol. 11, pages 423 - 432 | - YOSHINAGA ET AL., NATURE, (1999), vol. 402, pages 827 - 832 | - CHAPOVAL ET AL., NATURE IMMUNOL., (2001), vol. 2, pages 269 - 274 | - CHOI ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2003), vol. 171, pages 4650 - 4654 | - SICA ET AL., IMMUNITY, (2003), vol. 18, pages 849 - 861 | - PRASAD ET AL., IMMUNITY, (2003), vol. 18, pages 863 - 873 | - ZANG ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (2003), vol. 100, pages 10388 - 10392 | - ZHU ET AL., NATURE COMM. | - BRANDT ET AL., J EXP MED., (20090706), vol. 206, no. 7, pages 1495 - 503 | - DONG ET AL., IMMUNOL. RES., (2003), vol. 28, pages 39 - 48 | - PRASAD, IMMUNITY, (2003), vol. 18, pages 863 - 873 | - PRUD'HOMME ET AL., ONCOTARGET, (2012), vol. 3, pages 921 - 939 | - YAMAMOTO ET AL., INTERNATIONAL IMMUNOLOGY, (2008), vol. 20, no. 3, pages 413 - 420 | - ELLIS, L., MOL CANCER THER, (2006), vol. 5, page 1099 | - NEEDLEMAN; WUNSCH, J. MOL. BIOL., (1970), vol. 48, pages 443 - 453 | - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1992), vol. 89, pages 10915 - 10919 | - CHAPOVAL ET AL., METHODS MOL. MED., (2000), vol. 45, pages 247 - 255 | - VIDAL ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (2004), vol. 43, pages 7336 - 44 | - ZHOU ET AL., NATURE, (1995), vol. 378, pages 584 - 592 | - SUDOL, PROG. BIOCHYS. MOL. BIO., (1996), vol. 65, pages 113 - 132 | - KIM ET AL., NATURE, (1995), vol. 378, pages 85 - 88 | - KOMAU ET AL., SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 269, pages 1737 - 1740 | - HU ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1998), vol. 273, pages 33489 - 33494 | - ARAKAWA ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1994), vol. 269, no. 45, pages 27833 - 27839 | - RADZIEJEWSKI ET AL., BIOCHEM., (1993), vol. 32, no. 48, page 1350 | - KATAHIRA ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2002), vol. 277, pages 9242 - 9246 | - GUO, EMBO J., (1998), vol. 17, pages 5265 - 5272 | - MALASHKEVICH ET AL., SCIENCE, (1996), vol. 274, pages 761 - 765 | - SIMON ET AL., CANCER RES., (2006), vol. 66, no. 3, pages 1570 - 5 | - AZUMA ET AL., PLOS MED., (20091020), vol. 6, no. 10, page E1000166 | - WOLFF ET AL., CANCER RES., (1993), vol. 53, pages 2560 - 2565 | - FIRE, A. ET AL., NATURE, (1998), vol. 391, pages 806 - 11 | - NAPOLI, C. ET AL., PLANT CELL, (1990), vol. 2, pages 279 - 89 | - HANNON, G.J., NATURE, (2002), vol. 418, pages 44 - 1 | - ELBASHIR, S.M. ET AL., GENES DEV., (2001), vol. 15, pages 188 - 200 | - BERNSTEIN, E. ET AL., NATURE, (2001), vol. 409, pages 363 - 6 | - HAMMOND, S.M. ET AL., NATURE, (2000), vol. 404, pages 293 - 6 | - NYKANEN, A. ET AL., CELL, (2001), vol. 107, pages 309 - 21 | - MARTINEZ, J. ET AL., CELL, (2002), vol. 110, pages 563 - 74 | - ELBASHIR, S.M. ET AL., NATURE, (2001), vol. 411, pages 494 - 498 | - UI-TEI, K. ET AL., FEBS LETT, (2000), vol. 479, pages 79 - 82 | - WOLFF ET AL., CANCER RES., vol. 53, pages 2560 - 2565 | - MATHIOWITZ; LANGER, J. CONTROLLED RELEASE, (1987), vol. 5, pages 13 - 22 | - MATHIOWITZ ET AL., REACTIVE POLYMERS, (1987), vol. 6, pages 275 - 283 | - MATHIOWITZ ET AL., J. APPL. POLYMER SCI., (1988), vol. 35, pages 755 - 774 | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, LIPPINCOTT, WILLIAMS & WILINS, (2005), pages 889 - 964 | - MOORE ET AL., CHEM. REV., (2001), vol. 101, no. 12, pages 3893 - 4012 | - GENTILUCCI ET AL., CURR. MED. CHEM, (2006), vol. 13, no. 20, pages 2449 - 66 | - SARRIS ET AL., IMMUNITY, (2008), vol. 28, pages 402 - 413 | - SHEVACH, IMMUNITY, (2009), vol. 30, pages 636 - 645 | - SOLOMON ET AL., PNAS, (2011), vol. 108, no. 5, pages 2040 - 2045 | - XQ ET AL., SCAND J RHEUMATOL., (2012), vol. 41, pages 413 - 420 | - HANSEN, ONCOIMMUNOLOGY, (2013), vol. 2:2, page E23039 | - BALKWILL, F. ET AL., "Inflammation And Cancer: Back To Virchow?,", LANCET, (2001), vol. 357, pages 539 - 545 | - COUSSENS, L. M. ET AL., "Inflammation and Cancer,", NATURE, (2002), vol. 420, pages 860 - 867 | - ALLAVENA, P. ET AL., "Pathways Connecting Inflammation and Cancer,", CURR. OPIN. GENET. DEVEL., (2008), vol. 18, page 10 | - COLOTTA, F., "Cancer-Related Inflammation, The Seventh Hallmark of Cancer: Links to Genetic Instability,", CARCINOGENESIS, (2009), vol. 30, no. 7, pages 1073 - 1081 | - PORTA, C. ET AL., "Cellular and Molecular Pathways Linking Inflammation and Cancer,", IMMUNOBIOLOGY, (2009), vol. 214, pages 761 - 777 | - SOLINAS, G. ET AL., "Tumor-Associated Macrophages (TAM) As Major Players Of The Cancer-Related Inflammation,", J. LEUKOC. BIOL., (2009), vol. 86, no. 5, pages 1065 - 1073 | - POLLARD, J.W., "Trophic Macrophages In Development And Disease,", NAT. REV. IMMUNOL., (2009), vol. 9, pages 259 - 270 | - FARINHA, P. ET AL., "Analysis Of Multiple Biomarkers Shows That Lymphoma-Associated Macrophage (LAM) Content Is An Independent Predictor Of Survival In Follicular Lymphoma (FL)", BLOOD, (2005), vol. 106, pages 2169 - 2174 | - DAVE, S.S. ET AL., "Prediction Of Survival In Follicular Lymphoma Based On Molecular Features Of Tumor-Infiltrating Immune Cells,", N. ENGL. J. MED., (2004), vol. 351, pages 2159 - 2169 | - KRYCZEK, 1. ET AL., "B7-H4 Expression Identifies A Novel Suppressive Macrophage Population In Human Ovarian Carcinoma,", J. EXP. MED., (2006), vol. 203, no. 4, pages 871 - 881 | - KRYCZEK, I. ET AL., "Relationship Between B7-H4, Regulatory T Cells, And Patient Outcome In Human Ovarian Carcinoma,", CANCER RES., (2007), vol. 67, no. 18, pages 8900 - 8905 | - KALER, P. ET AL., "Tumor Associated Macrophages Protect Colon Cancer Cells from TRAIL-Induced Apoptosis through IL-lfl-Dependent Stabilization of Snail in Tumor Cells,", PLOS ONE, (2010), vol. 5, no. 7, pages E11700 1 - 13 | - ZAMARRON, B.F. ET AL., "Dual Roles Of Immune Cells And Their Factors In Cancer Development And Progression,", INT. J. BIOL. SCI., (2011), vol. 7, no. 5, pages 651 - 658 | - LIU, J. ET AL., "Tumor-Associated Macrophages Recruit CCR6+ Regulatory T Cells And Promote The Development Of Colorectal Cancer Via Enhancing CCL20 Production In Mice,", PLOS ONE., (2011), vol. 6, no. 4, page E19495 | - RIGO, A. ET AL., "Macrophages May Promote Cancer Growth Via A GM-CSF/HB-EGF Paracrine Loop That Is Enhanced By CXCLl2,", MOLEC. CANCER, (2010), vol. 9, no. 273, pages 1 - 13 | - LIN, J.Y. ET AL., "Clinical Significance Of Tumor-Associated Macrophage Infiltration In Supraglottic Laryngeal Carcinoma,", CHIN. J. CANCER, (2011), vol. 30, no. 4, pages 280 - 286 | - VERGATI, M., "The Consequence Of Immune Suppressive Cells In The Use Of Therapeutic Cancer Vaccines And Their Importance In Immune Monitoring,", J. BIOMED. BIOTECHNOL., (2011), page 182413 | - KRYCZEK, I. ET AL., "B7-H4 Expression Identifies A Novel Suppressive Macrophage Population In Human Ovarian Carcinoma,", J. EXP. MED., (2006), vol. 203, no. 4, pages 871 - 881 | - KRYCZEK, I. ET AL., "Cutting Edge: Induction Of B7-H4 On APCs Through IL-10: Novel Suppressive Mode For Regulatory T Cells,", J. IMMUNOL., (2006), vol. 177, no. 1, pages 40 - 44 | - JAGER ET AL., INT. J. CANCER, (2003), vol. 106, pages 817 - 20 | - KENNEDY ET AL., INT. REV. IMMUNOL., (2003), vol. 22, pages 141 - 72 | - SCANLAN ET AL., CANCER IMMUN., (2004), vol. 4, page 1 | - BROWN ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1981), vol. 127, pages 539 - 46 | - ROSE ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1986), vol. 83, pages 1261 - 61 | - MCMANUS ET AL., CANCER RES., (1976), vol. 36, pages 3476 - 81 | - YOSHIMURA ET AL., CANCER, (1994), vol. 73, pages 2745 - 52 | - YAMAGUCHI ET AL., BR. J. CANCER, (1989), vol. 60, pages 382 - 84 | - ALFTHAN ET AL., CANCER RES., (1992), vol. 52, pages 4628 - 33 | - HOON ET AL., INT. J. CANCER, (1989), vol. 43, pages 857 - 62 | - ANDO ET AL., INT. J. CANCER, (1987), vol. 40, pages 12 - 17 | - TSUCHIDA ET AL., J. NATL. CANCER, (1987), vol. 78, pages 45 - 54 | - TSUCHIDA ET AL., J. NATL. CANCER, (1987), vol. 78, pages 55 - 60 | - LEHMANN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 9891 - 95 | - LEHMANN ET AL., CANCER RES., (1987), vol. 47, pages 841 - 45 | - VIJAYASARDAHI ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1990), vol. 171, pages 1375 - 80 | - NATALI ET AL., CANCER, (1987), vol. 59, pages 55 - 63 | - DATTA ET AL., J. CLIN. ONCOL., (1994), vol. 12, pages 475 - 82 | - XQ ET AL., SCAND J. RHEUMATOL., (2012), vol. 41, pages 413 - 420 | - BASU ET AL., J. IMMUNOLOGY, (20091211), vol. 184, pages 545 - 549 | - ABRAHAM; GIBBONS, CLIN. CANCER RES., (2007), vol. 13, no. 11, pages 3109 - 14 | - LEWIS, GENETIC ENGINEERING NEWS, (1992), vol. 12, page 1 | - GUATELLI ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, pages 1874 - 1878 | - WEISS, SCIENCE, (1991), vol. 254, pages 1292 - 1293 | - WONG ET AL., SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 228, pages 810 - 815 | - YAO ET AL., IMMUNITY, (2011), vol. 34, pages 729 - 740 | - YAO ET AL., IMMUNITY, (2011), vol. 34, no. 5, pages 729 - 40 |