EP2907365 - RETROFIT LIGHT EMITTING DIODE TUBE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.2017 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HR | published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Philips Lighting Holding B.V. High Tech Campus 45 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2016/34] |
Former [2015/34] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAO, Haimin c/o High Tech Campus 45 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2017/33] |
Former [2015/34] | 01 /
TAO, Haimin c/o High Tech Campus 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Representative(s) | van Eeuwijk, Alexander Henricus Waltherus, et al Signify Netherlands B.V. Intellectual Property High Tech Campus 7 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2016/38] | van Eeuwijk, Alexander Henricus Waltherus, et al Philips Lighting B.V. Philips Lighting Intellectual Property High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2015/34] | van Eeuwijk, Alexander Henricus Waltherus Philips International B.V. Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 14730167.5 | 16.06.2014 | [2015/34] | WO2014EP62538 | Priority number, date | EP20130173977 | 27.06.2013 Original published format: EP 13173977 | [2015/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014206785 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2907365 | Date: | 19.08.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2907365 | Date: | 21.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H05B33/08 | [2015/34] | CPC: |
H05B45/50 (EP,RU,US);
H05B45/395 (EP);
H05B45/59 (EP,RU,US);
H05B47/24 (EP);
H05B47/25 (EP);
Y02B20/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NACHGERÜSTETES LICHTEMITTIERENDES DIODENROHR | [2015/34] | English: | RETROFIT LIGHT EMITTING DIODE TUBE | [2015/34] | French: | TUBE DE DIODE ÉLECTROLUMINESCENTE INSTALLÉ EN RATTRAPAGE | [2015/34] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2015 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/34] | 05.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 15.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/35] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 15.03.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 15.03.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.03.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.06.2014 | AL | 21.09.2016 | AT | 21.09.2016 | BE | 21.09.2016 | CY | 21.09.2016 | CZ | 21.09.2016 | DK | 21.09.2016 | EE | 21.09.2016 | FI | 21.09.2016 | HR | 21.09.2016 | LT | 21.09.2016 | LV | 21.09.2016 | MC | 21.09.2016 | MK | 21.09.2016 | PL | 21.09.2016 | RO | 21.09.2016 | RS | 21.09.2016 | SI | 21.09.2016 | SK | 21.09.2016 | SM | 21.09.2016 | BG | 21.12.2016 | NO | 21.12.2016 | GR | 22.12.2016 | IS | 21.01.2017 | PT | 23.01.2017 | IE | 16.06.2017 | LU | 16.06.2017 | MT | 16.06.2017 | [2020/30] |
Former [2019/52] | HU | 16.06.2014 | |
AL | 21.09.2016 | ||
AT | 21.09.2016 | ||
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CY | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
MK | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
IE | 16.06.2017 | ||
LU | 16.06.2017 | ||
MT | 16.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/48] | HU | 16.06.2014 | |
AL | 21.09.2016 | ||
AT | 21.09.2016 | ||
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CY | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
IE | 16.06.2017 | ||
LU | 16.06.2017 | ||
MT | 16.06.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 16.06.2014 | |
AL | 21.09.2016 | ||
AT | 21.09.2016 | ||
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
IE | 16.06.2017 | ||
LU | 16.06.2017 | ||
MT | 16.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 21.09.2016 | |
AT | 21.09.2016 | ||
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
IE | 16.06.2017 | ||
LU | 16.06.2017 | ||
MT | 16.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
IE | 16.06.2017 | ||
LU | 16.06.2017 | ||
MT | 16.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
IE | 16.06.2017 | ||
LU | 16.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
LU | 16.06.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
MC | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SI | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
DK | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 21.09.2016 | |
BE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2016 | ||
EE | 21.09.2016 | ||
FI | 21.09.2016 | ||
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
PL | 21.09.2016 | ||
RO | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
SK | 21.09.2016 | ||
SM | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 21.12.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
IS | 21.01.2017 | ||
PT | 23.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 21.09.2016 | |
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
LV | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | FI | 21.09.2016 | |
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
GR | 22.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 21.09.2016 | |
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
RS | 21.09.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 21.09.2016 | |
LT | 21.09.2016 | ||
NO | 21.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 21.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2010225251 (MARUYAMA YASUHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-15* figures 19, 25 *; | [XI]WO2012052875 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-4,6-10,13-15 * the whole document * [I] 5; | [A]WO2012110973 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 3,4,6 * | Examination | EP2477456 |