EP3014213 - DETONATOR FOR A MORTAR GRENADE AND A MORTAR GRENADE THAT CAN BE FIRED FROM A SPIGOT MORTAR HAVING SUCH A DETONATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/18] | DETONATOR FOR AN ACTIVE PART OF A MORTAR GRENADE AND MORTAR GRENADE THAT CAN BE FIRED FROM A SPIGOT MORTAR AND HAS SUCH A DETONATOR | ||
[2016/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2018 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.03.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rheinmetall Waffe Munition GmbH Heinrich-Ehrhardt-Strasse 2 29345 Unterlüß / DE | [2016/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAESCH, Alexander Osterkamp 6 29223 Celle / DE | [2016/18] | Representative(s) | Dietrich, Barbara Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Derendorfer Allee 6 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/18] | Dietrich, Barbara Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Platz 1 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 14730517.1 | 13.06.2014 | [2016/18] | WO2014EP62355 | Priority number, date | DE20131010502 | 25.06.2013 Original published format: DE102013010502 | [2016/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014206771 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/53] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3014213 | Date: | 04.05.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3014213 | Date: | 09.08.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F42C15/188, F42C15/21, F42C15/30 | [2016/18] | CPC: |
F42C15/188 (EP);
F42C15/21 (EP);
F42C15/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZÜNDER FÜR EINE MÖRSERGRANATE UND AUS EINEM ZAPFENMÖRSER VERSCHIESSBARE MÖRSERGRANATE MIT EINEM DERARTIGEN ZÜNDER | [2016/52] | English: | DETONATOR FOR A MORTAR GRENADE AND A MORTAR GRENADE THAT CAN BE FIRED FROM A SPIGOT MORTAR HAVING SUCH A DETONATOR | [2016/52] | French: | DÉTONATEUR POUR GRENADE DE MORTIER ET GRENADE DE MORTIER POUVANT ÊTRE TIRÉE PAR UN MORTIER À ERGOT ÉQUIPÉE D'UN TEL DÉTONATEUR | [2016/52] |
Former [2016/18] | WIRKTEILZÜNDER FÜR EINE MÖRSERGRANATE UND AUS EINEM ZAPFENMÖRSER VERSCHIEßBARE MÖRSERGRANATE MIT EINEM DERARTIGEN WIRKTEILZÜNDER | ||
Former [2016/18] | DETONATOR FOR AN ACTIVE PART OF A MORTAR GRENADE AND MORTAR GRENADE THAT CAN BE FIRED FROM A SPIGOT MORTAR AND HAS SUCH A DETONATOR | ||
Former [2016/18] | DÉTONATEUR DE CHARGE ACTIVE POUR GRENADE DE MORTIER ET GRENADE DE MORTIER ÉQUIPÉE D'UN TEL DÉTONATEUR DE CHARGE ACTIVE POUVANT ÊTRE TIRÉE PAR UN MORTIER DE TYPE FLY-K | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/18] | 14.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 29.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.06.2014 | AL | 09.08.2017 | CY | 09.08.2017 | CZ | 09.08.2017 | DK | 09.08.2017 | EE | 09.08.2017 | FI | 09.08.2017 | HR | 09.08.2017 | LT | 09.08.2017 | LV | 09.08.2017 | MC | 09.08.2017 | MK | 09.08.2017 | MT | 09.08.2017 | NL | 09.08.2017 | PL | 09.08.2017 | PT | 09.08.2017 | RO | 09.08.2017 | RS | 09.08.2017 | SE | 09.08.2017 | SI | 09.08.2017 | SK | 09.08.2017 | SM | 09.08.2017 | TR | 09.08.2017 | BG | 09.11.2017 | NO | 09.11.2017 | GR | 10.11.2017 | IS | 09.12.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 13.06.2014 | |
CY | 09.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
MK | 09.08.2017 | ||
MT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PT | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
TR | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 13.06.2014 | |
CZ | 09.08.2017 | ||
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
MT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PT | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
TR | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/28] | CZ | 09.08.2017 | |
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
MT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PT | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
TR | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/16] | CZ | 09.08.2017 | |
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
MT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
TR | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/15] | CZ | 09.08.2017 | |
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MC | 09.08.2017 | ||
MT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 09.08.2017 | |
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
MT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | CZ | 09.08.2017 | |
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SI | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | CZ | 09.08.2017 | |
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
EE | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RO | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
SK | 09.08.2017 | ||
SM | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 09.08.2017 | |
DK | 09.08.2017 | ||
FI | 09.08.2017 | ||
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | FI | 09.08.2017 | |
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
LV | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | FI | 09.08.2017 | |
HR | 09.08.2017 | ||
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
PL | 09.08.2017 | ||
RS | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
BG | 09.11.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
GR | 10.11.2017 | ||
IS | 09.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 09.08.2017 | |
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
SE | 09.08.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 09.08.2017 | |
LT | 09.08.2017 | ||
NL | 09.08.2017 | ||
NO | 09.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 09.08.2017 | |
NO | 09.11.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE19930045 (RHEINMETALL W & M GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-4 * column 1, line 47 - line 50 * * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 34 * * figure 1 *; | [A]BE530432 (SOMVILLE, P) [A] 1-4 * page 1, line 42 - page 2, line 47; figures 1-5 * |