EP3004858 - METHOD OF PRODUCING A MULTITUDE OF MEASURING ZONES ON A CHIP AND CHIP WITH MEASURING ZONES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/15] | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PLURALITY OF MEASUREMENT REGIONS ON A CHIP, AND CHIP WITH MEASUREMENT REGIONS | ||
[2018/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.01.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boehringer Ingelheim Vetmedica GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [2016/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHIEBER, Markus Arndtstrasse 6 80469 München / DE | 02 /
SCHOEDER, Heinz Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Corp. Div. Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [2016/15] | Representative(s) | Von Rohr Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Rüttenscheider Straße 62 45130 Essen / DE | [2016/15] | Application number, filing date | 14730740.9 | 30.05.2014 | [2016/15] | WO2014EP01462 | Priority number, date | DE201310210138 | 30.05.2013 Original published format: DE102013210138 | [2016/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014191114 | Date: | 04.12.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3004858 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3004858 | Date: | 04.07.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/403, G01N27/30, B01L3/00 | [2016/15] | CPC: |
H01L29/401 (EP,US);
H01L22/32 (US);
B01L3/5088 (EP,US);
G01N27/403 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00317 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00619 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00635 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00637 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00653 (EP,US);
B01L2200/12 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0645 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0819 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ERZEUGEN EINER VIELZAHL VON MESSBEREICHEN AUF EINEM CHIP SOWIE CHIP MIT MESSBEREICHEN | [2016/15] | English: | METHOD OF PRODUCING A MULTITUDE OF MEASURING ZONES ON A CHIP AND CHIP WITH MEASURING ZONES | [2018/07] | French: | PROCÉCÉ POUR PRODUIRE UNE PLURALITÉ DE ZONES DE MESURE SUR UNE PUCE ET PUCE POURVUE DE ZONES DE MESURE | [2016/15] |
Former [2016/15] | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PLURALITY OF MEASUREMENT REGIONS ON A CHIP, AND CHIP WITH MEASUREMENT REGIONS | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.2015 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.10.2015 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 20.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.05.2014 | AL | 04.07.2018 | CY | 04.07.2018 | CZ | 04.07.2018 | EE | 04.07.2018 | FI | 04.07.2018 | HR | 04.07.2018 | LT | 04.07.2018 | LV | 04.07.2018 | MC | 04.07.2018 | MK | 04.07.2018 | MT | 04.07.2018 | RO | 04.07.2018 | RS | 04.07.2018 | SE | 04.07.2018 | SI | 04.07.2018 | SK | 04.07.2018 | SM | 04.07.2018 | TR | 04.07.2018 | BG | 04.10.2018 | NO | 04.10.2018 | GR | 05.10.2018 | IS | 04.11.2018 | PT | 04.11.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 30.05.2014 | |
AL | 04.07.2018 | ||
CY | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
MT | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
TR | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
PT | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 30.05.2014 | |
AL | 04.07.2018 | ||
CY | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
TR | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
PT | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
CY | 04.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
TR | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
PT | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
TR | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
PT | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
TR | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
MC | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SI | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
SM | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
EE | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
SK | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
RO | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 04.07.2018 | |
CZ | 04.07.2018 | ||
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
LV | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | CZ | 04.07.2018 | |
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
HR | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | CZ | 04.07.2018 | |
FI | 04.07.2018 | ||
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
RS | 04.07.2018 | ||
SE | 04.07.2018 | ||
BG | 04.10.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
GR | 05.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 04.07.2018 | |
LT | 04.07.2018 | ||
NO | 04.10.2018 | ||
IS | 04.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 04.07.2018 | Cited in | International search | [X]US6183970 (OKANO KAZUNORI [JP], et al); | [X]US2002123048 (GAU VINCENT JEN-JR [US]); | [X]US2003194709 (YANG XING [US]); | [X]US2004058423 (ALBRITTON NANCY [US], et al) |