EP3004151 - RETRO POLYPEPTIDES FOR ACTIVATION IMMUNITY TO CANCER AND VIRAL INFECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.08.2017 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Imperial Innovations Ltd 52 Princes Gate Exhibition Road London SW7 2PG / GB | [2016/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASHTON-RICKARDT, Philip Faculty of Medicine Imperial College London South Kensington Campus London SW7 2AZ / GB | [2016/15] | Representative(s) | Sterling IP Orion House Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City AL7 1HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/15] | Lee, Nicholas John, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 14730952.0 | 23.05.2014 | [2016/15] | WO2014GB51603 | Priority number, date | GB20130009421 | 24.05.2013 Original published format: GB 201309421 | [2016/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014188220 | Date: | 27.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3004151 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/47 | [2016/15] | CPC: |
C07K14/47 (EP,US);
C12N15/113 (US);
G01N33/505 (US);
A61K38/00 (US);
C07K2319/21 (EP,US);
C12N2320/30 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] | Title | German: | RETRO-POLYPEPTIDE ZUR AKTIVIERUNG DER IMMUNITÄT GEGEN KREBS UND VIRUSINFEKTIONEN | [2016/15] | English: | RETRO POLYPEPTIDES FOR ACTIVATION IMMUNITY TO CANCER AND VIRAL INFECTION | [2016/15] | French: | RÉTROPOLYPEPTIDES POUR ACTIVATION DE L'IMMUNITÉ VIS-À-VIS DU CANCER ET DES INFECTIONS VIRALES | [2016/15] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/15] | 29.08.2016 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 07.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/38] | 12.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/38] | Request for further processing for: | 07.11.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 07.11.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.11.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2016 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.10.2016 | 31.05.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP1347046 (RES ASS FOR BIOTECHNOLOGY [JP]) [X] 1,4,9,10 * For Seq ID 1 & 2;; claim 1; sequence 4412 * [I] 11-16; | [XI] - "NUCLEOTIDE SEQUENCE [LARGE SCALE MRNA] (ISOFORM 1), AND VARIANTSRP CYS-126 AND HIS-205.", UniProt, (20070821), Database accession no. Q3ZCV2; B7WPL2; Q8N7Y9;, XP002728624 [X] 1,4,9,10 * abstract * [I] 11-16 | [XI] - ""Lineage-specific biology revealed by a finished genome assembly ofRTthe mouse.";", UniProt, (20070821), Database accession no. A2AVQ5; A2AVQ4; Q7TPM4;, XP002728625 [X] 1,4,9,10 * abstract * [I] 11-16 | [X] - "UPI00018B3107", UniParc, (20081123), Database accession no. UPI00018B3107, XP002728642 [X] 2 * abstract * | [X] - "UPI00025E190B", UniParc, (20121107), Database accession no. UPI00025E190B, XP002728643 [X] 3 * abstract * | by applicant | WO2006000830 | EP0320308 | - ITAKWA ET AL., SCIENCE, (1977), vol. 198, pages 105 - 63 | - RUTHER ET AL., EMBO J., (1983), vol. 2, page 1791 | - INOUYE; INOUYE, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1985), vol. 13, pages 3101 - 3109 | - VAN HEEKE; SCHUSTER, J. BIOL. CHEM., (1989), vol. 24, pages 5503 - 5509 | - DNA cloning, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1987), vol. 3 | - CROUSE ET AL., MOL. CELL. BIOL., (1983), vol. 3, page 257 | - JANKNECHT ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 88, pages 8972 - 897 | - COFFIN ET AL., Retroviruses, COLD SPRING HARBOUR LABORATORY PRESS, (1997), pages 758 - 763 | - SMITHIES ET AL., NATURE, (1985), vol. 317, pages 230 - 234 | - THOMAS; CAPECCHI, CELL, (1987), vol. 51, pages 503 - 512 | - THOMPSON ET AL., CELL, (1989), vol. 5, pages 313 - 321 | - ZIJLSTRA ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 342, pages 435 - 438 | - "Solid Phase Peptide Synthesis", The Practice of Peptide Synthesis [42] and Applied Biosystems 430 A Users Manual, ABI INC. | - PARDOLL, D.T, "cells take aim at cancer", PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (2002), vol. 99, pages 15840 - 2 | - SCHWARTZ, RH., "Acquisition of immunologic self-tolerance", CELL, (1989), vol. 57, doi:doi:10.1016/0092-8674(89)90044-5, pages 1073 - 81, XP024244256 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0092-8674(89)90044-5 | - ATKINS, MB; KUNKEL, L; SZNOL, M; ROSENBERG, SA, "High-dose recombinant interleukin-2 therapy in patients with metastatic melanoma: long-term survival update", CANCER J SCI AM, (2000), vol. 6, no. 1, pages 11 - 4 | - KIRKWOOD, JM; MANOLA, J; IBRAHIM, J; SONDAK, V; ERNSTOFF, MS; RAO, U.A, "pooled analysis of eastern cooperative oncology group and intergroup trials of adjuvant high-dose interferon for melanoma", CLIN CANCER RES, (2004), vol. 10, pages 1670 - 7 | - ASADULLAH, K; STERRY, W; VOLK, HD, "Interleukin-10 therapy--review of a new approach", PHARMACOL REV, (2003), vol. 55, doi:doi:10.1124/pr.55.2.4, pages 241 - 69, XP002626073 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1124/pr.55.2.4 | - DIEHL, L; DEN BOER, AT; SCHOENBERGER, SP; VAN DER VOORT, EI; SCHUMACHER, TN; MELIEF, CJ; OFFRINGA, R; TOES, RE, "CD40 activation in vivo overcomes peptide-induced peripheral cytotoxic T-lymphocyte tolerance and augments anti-tumor vaccine efficacy", NAT MED, (1999), vol. 5, doi:doi:10.1038/10495, pages 774 - 9, XP002153727 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/10495 | - FRENCH, RR; CHAN, HT; TUTT, AL; GLENNIE, MJ, "CD40 antibody evokes a cytotoxic T-cell response that eradicates lymphoma and bypasses T-cell help", NAT MED, (1999), vol. 5, pages 548 - 53 | - SOTOMAYOR, EM; BORRELLO; TUBB, E; RATTIS, FM; BIEN, H; LU, Z; FEIN, S; SCHOENBERGER, S; LEVITSKY, HI, "Conversion of tumor-specific CD4+ T-cell tolerance to T-cell priming through in vivo ligation of CD40", NAT MED, (1999), vol. 5, doi:doi:10.1038/10503, pages 780 - 7, XP002320182 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/10503 | - ROSENBERG, SA; YANG, JC; SCHWARTZENTRUBER, DJ; HWU, P; MARINCOLA, FM; TOPALIAN, SL; RESTIFO, NP; DUDLEY, ME; SCHWARZ, SL; SPIESS,, "Immunologic and therapeutic evaluation of a synthetic peptide vaccine for the treatment of patients with metastatic melanoma", NAT MED, (1998), vol. 4, doi:doi:10.1038/nm0398-321, pages 321 - 7, XP002091661 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm0398-321 | - SCHWARTZENTRUBER, DJ, "e.A phase III multi- institutional randomized study of immunization with the gp100: 209-365 217(21 OM) peptide followed by high dose IL-2 compared with high dose IL-2 alone in patients with metastatic melanoma", J CLIN ONCO1, (2009), vol. 17, page 18S | - CURRAN, MA; MONTALVO, W; YAGITA, H; ALLISON, JP, "PD-1 and CTLA-4 combination blockade expands infiltrating T cells and reduces regulatory T and myeloid cells within B16 melanoma tumors", PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (2010), vol. 107, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.0915174107, pages 4275 - 80, XP055067204 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0915174107 | - CURRAN, MA; ALLISON, JP, "Tumor vaccines expressing flt3 ligand synergize with ctla-4 blockade to reject preimplanted tumors", CANCER RES, (2009), vol. 69, doi:doi:10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-08-3289, pages 7747 - 55, XP055177400 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-08-3289 | - ROSENBERG, SA; RESTIFO, NP; YANG, JC; MORGAN, RA; DUDLEY, ME, "Adoptive cell transfer: a clinical path to effective cancer immunotherapy", NAT REV CANCER, (2008), vol. 8, doi:doi:10.1038/nrc2355, pages 299 - 308, XP002571413 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrc2355 | - HUNDER, NN; WALLEN, H; CAO, J; HENDRICKS, DW; REILLY, JZ; RODMYRE, R; JUNGBLUTH, A; GNJATIC, S; THOMPSON, JA; YEE, C, "Treatment of metastatic melanoma with autologous CD4+ T cells against NY-ESO-1", N ENGL J MED, (2008), vol. 358, doi:doi:10.1056/NEJMoa0800251, pages 2698 - 703, XP055187197 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa0800251 | - YEE, C; THOMPSON, JA; BYRD, D; RIDDELL, SR; ROCHE, P; CELIS, E; GREENBERG, PD, "Adoptive T cell therapy using antigen-specific CD8+ T cell clones for the treatment of patients with metastatic melanoma: in vivo persistence, migration, and antitumor effect of transferred T cells", PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (2002), vol. 99, doi:doi:10.1073/PNAS.242600099, pages 16168 - 73, XP002505178 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/PNAS.242600099 | - JOHNSON, LA; MORGAN, RA; DUDLEY, ME; CASSARD, L; YANG, JC; HUGHES, MS; KAMMULA, US; ROYAL, RE; SHERRY, RM; WUNDERLICH, JR, "Gene therapy with human and mouse T-cell receptors mediates cancer regression and targets normal tissues expressing cognate antigen", BLOOD, (2009), vol. 114, pages 535 - 46 | - MORGAN, RA; DUDLEY, ME; WUNDERLICH, JR; HUGHES, MS; YANG, JC; SHERRY, RM; ROYAL, RE; TOPALIAN, SL; KAMMULA, US; RESTIFO, NP, "Cancer regression in patients after transfer of genetically engineered lymphocytes", SCIENCE, (2006), vol. 314, doi:doi:10.1126/science.1129003, pages 126 - 9, XP002478784 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1129003 | - HODI, FS; O'DAY, SJ; MCDERMOTT, DF; WEBER, RW; SOSMAN, JA; HAANEN, JB; GONZALEZ, R; ROBERT, C; SCHADENDORF, D; HASSEL, JC, "Improved survival with ipilimumab in patients with metastatic melanoma", N ENGL J MED, (2010), vol. 363, doi:doi:10.1056/NEJMoa1003466, pages 711 - 23, XP055015428 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1056/NEJMoa1003466 | - BYRNE, SM; AUCHER, A; ALYAHYA, SH; ELDER, M; OLSON, ST; DAVIS, DM; ASHTON-RICKARDT, PG, "Cathepsin B controls the persistence of memory CD8+ T cells", J IMMUNOL, (2012), vol. 189, pages 1133 - 43 | - BEAVER, JE; TASAN, M; GIBBONS, FD; TIAN, W; HUGHES, TR; ROTH, FP, "FuncBase: a resource for quantitative gene function annotation", BIOINFORMATICS, (2010), vol. 26, pages 1806 - 7 | - FINN, RD; TATE, J; MISTRY, J; COGGILL, PC; SAMMUT, SJ; HOTZ, HR; CERIC, G; FORSLUND, K; EDDY, SR; SONNHAMMER, EL, "The Pfam protein families database", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (2008), vol. 36, doi:doi:10.1093/nar/gkm960, pages D281 - 8, XP055106417 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkm960 | - BARREAU, C; PAILLARD, L; OSBORNE, HB, "AU-rich elements and associated factors: are there unifying principles?", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (2005), vol. 33, pages 7138 - 50 | - BOLOGNANI, F; CONTENTE-CUOMO, T; PERRONE-BIZZOZERO, NI, "Novel recognition motifs and biological functions of the RNA-binding protein HuD revealed by genome-wide identification of its targets", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (2010), vol. 38, pages 117 - 30 | - ALTAY, G; EMMERT-STREIB, F, "Structural influence of gene networks on their inference: analysis of C3NET", BIOL DIRECT, (2011), vol. 6, doi:doi:10.1186/1745-6150-6-31, page 31, XP021103993 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1745-6150-6-31 | - DE MATOS SIMOES, R; EMMERT-STREIB, F, "Bagging statistical network inference from large-scale gene expression data", PLOS ONE, (2012), vol. 7, no. 3, page E33624 | - CONCEPCION, D; SEBURN, KL; WEN, G; FRANKEL, WN; HAMILTON, BA, "Mutation rate and predicted phenotypic target sizes in ethylnitrosourea-treated mice", GENETICS, (2004), vol. 168, pages 953 - 9 | - KOMATSU, N; YAMAMOTO, M; FUJITA, H; MIWA, A; HATAKE, K; ENDO, T; OKANO, H; KATSUBE, T; FUKUMAKI, Y; SASSA, S ET AL., "Establishment and characterization of an erythropoietin-dependent subline, UT-7/Epo, derived from human leukemia cell line, UT-7", BLOOD, (1993), vol. 82, pages 456 - 64, XP001345446 | - HEFFNER, M; FEARON, DT, "Loss of T cell receptor-induced Bmi-1 in the KLRG1 (+)senescent CD8(+) T lymphocyte", PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (2007), vol. 104, pages 13414 - 9 | - LIU, N; RAJA, SM; ZAZZERONI, F; METKAR, SS; SHAH, R; ZHANG, M; WANG, Y; BROMME, D; RUSSIN, WA; LEE, JC, "NFkappaB protects from the lysosomal pathway of cell death", EMBO J, (2003), vol. 22, doi:doi:10.1093/emboj/cdg510, pages 5313 - 22, XP001205586 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/emboj/cdg510 | - BARBER, DL; WHERRY, EJ; MASOPUST, D; ZHU, B; ALLISON, JP; SHARPE, AH; FREEMAN, GJ; AHMED, R, "Restoring function in exhausted CD8 T cells during chronic viral infection", NATURE, (2006), vol. 439, doi:doi:10.1038/nature04444, pages 682 - 7, XP055198624 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature04444 | - BROOKS, DG; HA, SJ; ELSAESSER, H; SHARPE, AH; FREEMAN, GJ; OLDSTONE, MB, "IL-10 and PD-L1 operate through distinct pathways to suppress T-cell activity during persistent viral infection", PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (2008), vol. 105, pages 20428 - 33 | - TAN R; XU X OGG GS; HANSASUTA P; DONG T; ROSTRON T; LUZZI G; CONLON CP; SCREATON GR; MCMICHAEL AJ; ROWLAND-JONES S, "Rapid death of adoptively transferred T cells in acquired immunodeficiency syndrome", BLOOD, (1999), vol. 93, no. 5, pages 1506 - 1510 | - BRODIE SJ; LEWINSOHN DA; PATTERSON BK ET AL., "In vivo migration and function of transferred HIV-1- specific cytotoxic T cells", NAT MED, (1999), vol. 5, pages 34 - 41 | - GEHRING, AJ; XUE, SA; HO, ZZ; TEOH, D; RUEDL, C; CHIA, A; KOH, S; LIM, SG; MAINI, MK; STAUSS, H, "Engineering virus-specific T cells that target HBV infected hepatocytes and hepatocellular carcinoma cell lines", J HEPATOL, (2011), vol. 55, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jhep.2010.10.025, pages 103 - 10, XP028242496 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jhep.2010.10.025 | - PANTOLIANO MW; PETRELLA EC; KWASNOSKI JD; LOBANOV VS; MYSLIK J; GRAF E; CARVER T; ASEL E; SPRINGER BA; LANE P, "High-density miniaturized thermal shift assays as a general strategy for drug discovery", J BIOMOL SCREEN., (200112), vol. 6, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1177/108705710100600609, pages 429 - 40, XP055027496 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/108705710100600609 | - DEV, A ET AL., "Erythropoietin-directed erythropoiesis depends on serpin inhibition of erythroblast lysosomal cathepsins", J EXP MED., (20130211), vol. 210, no. 2, pages 225 - 232 | - ZHANG, M, "Serine protease inhibitor 6 protects cytotoxic T cells from self-inflicted injury by ensuring the integrity of cytotoxic granules", IMMUNITY, (200604), vol. 24, no. 4, doi:doi:10.1016/j.immuni.2006.02.002, pages 451 - 61, XP002396245 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.immuni.2006.02.002 | - MCCAUSLAND, M.M; CROTTY, S, "Quantitative PCR (QPCR) technique for detecting lymphocytic choriomeningitis virus (LCMV) in vivo", J VIROL METHODS., (200801), vol. 147, no. 1, pages 167 - 176 |