EP2999813 - MOBILE CAM DEVICE FOR COMMANDING NEEDLES OF A NEEDLE BED OF A KNITTING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.02.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANTONI S.p.A. Via Carlo Fenzi, 14 25135 Brescia / IT | [2016/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LONATI, Ettore Via Sott'acqua 32 I-25082 Botticino (Brescia) / IT | 02 /
LONATI, Fausto Via Mediana 12 I-25123 Brescia / IT | 03 /
LONATI, Tiberio - deceased / IT | [2016/13] | Representative(s) | PGA S.p.A., Milano, Succursale di Lugano Via Castagnola, 21c 6900 Lugano / CH | [2020/31] |
Former [2016/13] | Galassi, Alessandro PGA S.r.l. Milano Succursale di Lugano Via Castagnola 21C 6900 Lugano / CH | Application number, filing date | 14731052.8 | 15.05.2014 | [2016/13] | WO2014IB61465 | Priority number, date | IT2013BS00071 | 20.05.2013 Original published format: IT BS20130071 | [2016/13] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014188315 | Date: | 27.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2999813 | Date: | 30.03.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2999813 | Date: | 29.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | D04B15/68, D04B15/82, D04B15/32 | [2016/13] | CPC: |
D04B15/68 (EP,US);
D04B15/78 (US);
D04B15/32 (EP,US);
D04B15/82 (EP,US);
D04B15/94 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/13] | Extension states | BA | 20.11.2015 | ME | 20.11.2015 | Title | German: | MOBILE NOCKENVORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG DER NADELN EINES NADELBETTS EINER STRICKMASCHINE | [2016/13] | English: | MOBILE CAM DEVICE FOR COMMANDING NEEDLES OF A NEEDLE BED OF A KNITTING MACHINE | [2016/13] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CAME MOBILE POUR COMMANDER LES AIGUILLES D'UN LIT D'AIGUILLES D'UNE MACHINE À TRICOTER | [2016/13] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2015 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.2015 | Examination requested [2016/13] | 08.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 30.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.05.2014 | AL | 29.07.2020 | AT | 29.07.2020 | CY | 29.07.2020 | CZ | 29.07.2020 | DK | 29.07.2020 | EE | 29.07.2020 | ES | 29.07.2020 | FI | 29.07.2020 | HR | 29.07.2020 | LT | 29.07.2020 | LV | 29.07.2020 | MC | 29.07.2020 | MK | 29.07.2020 | MT | 29.07.2020 | NL | 29.07.2020 | PL | 29.07.2020 | RO | 29.07.2020 | RS | 29.07.2020 | SE | 29.07.2020 | SI | 29.07.2020 | SK | 29.07.2020 | SM | 29.07.2020 | BG | 29.10.2020 | NO | 29.10.2020 | GR | 30.10.2020 | IS | 29.11.2020 | PT | 30.11.2020 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 15.05.2014 | |
AL | 29.07.2020 | ||
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CY | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
MK | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 15.05.2014 | |
AL | 29.07.2020 | ||
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CY | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 15.05.2014 | |
AL | 29.07.2020 | ||
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
MC | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SI | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SK | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 29.07.2020 | |
AT | 29.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
SM | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
CZ | 29.07.2020 | ||
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
EE | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RO | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
DK | 29.07.2020 | ||
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/17] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
NL | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
HR | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
LV | 29.07.2020 | ||
PL | 29.07.2020 | ||
RS | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
IS | 29.11.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 29.07.2020 | |
ES | 29.07.2020 | ||
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
GR | 30.10.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | ES | 29.07.2020 | |
FI | 29.07.2020 | ||
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
SE | 29.07.2020 | ||
BG | 29.10.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | ||
PT | 30.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 29.07.2020 | |
LT | 29.07.2020 | ||
NO | 29.10.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US5187951 (STROUD EDWARD C [GB], et al) [X] 1-6,8,10 * column 4, line 48 - column 7, line 8; figures 4, 5 * [Y] 7,9; | [A]US5802877 (YATES JAMES WALLACE [US], et al) [A] 1-10* column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 46; figures 1, 2, 5, 6 *; | [Y]TW511664U (LIN BO-SAN [TW]) [Y] 7 * figures 1-3 *; | [Y]EP2402492 (CHAO KUO-CHAO [TW]) [Y] 9 * paragraphs [0008] , [ 0015]; figures 1-5 * |