EP2996548 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR A 3D MEASUREMENT OF THE SKIN SURFACE AND SKIN LAYERS CLOSE TO THE SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.04.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.05.2021 [2021/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NanoFocus AG Max-Planck-Ring 48 46049 Oberhausen / DE | [2020/09] |
Former [2016/40] | For all designated states mikroskin GmbH Max-Planck-Ring 48 46049 Oberhausen / DE | ||
Former [2016/12] | For all designated states Mikroskin Gmbh Lindnerstrasse 98 46149 Oberhausen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEBER, Mark Pusenhof 21 47445 Moers / DE | 02 /
VALENTIN, Jürgen Gneisenaustraße 77 47057 Duisburg / DE | 03 /
GRIGAT, Marcus Am Marienbusch 2 46485 Wesel / DE | [2016/12] | Representative(s) | Schneiders, Josef, et al Schneiders & Behrendt PartmbB Rechts- und Patentanwälte Huestrasse 23 (Kortumkarree) 44787 Bochum / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/12] | Schneiders, Josef, et al Schneiders & Behrendt Rechts- und Patentanwälte Huestrasse 23 44787 Bochum / DE | Application number, filing date | 14731152.6 | 12.05.2014 | [2016/12] | WO2014EP01274 | Priority number, date | DE20131008278 | 15.05.2013 Original published format: DE102013008278 | [2016/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014183860 | Date: | 20.11.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2996548 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61B5/107, G01B11/06, G01B11/24, G01B21/00 | [2016/12] | CPC: |
A61B5/0068 (EP,US);
A61B5/1079 (EP,US);
A61B5/441 (EP,US);
G01B11/24 (EP,US);
G02B21/0028 (EP,US);
G02B21/004 (EP,US);
G02B21/006 (EP,US);
G06T3/4038 (EP,US);
G06T5/50 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR 3 D-VERMESSUNG DER HAUTOBERFLÄCHE UND OBERFLÄCHENNAHER HAUTSCHICHTEN | [2016/12] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR A 3D MEASUREMENT OF THE SKIN SURFACE AND SKIN LAYERS CLOSE TO THE SURFACE | [2016/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA MESURE EN 3D DE LA SURFACE DE LA PEAU ET DE COUCHES DE PEAU PROCHES DE LA SURFACE | [2016/12] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/12] | 11.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/20] | 14.01.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2020 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]EP1607041 (CADENT LTD [IL]) [X] 5,6 * the whole document * [Y] 1-4 [I] 7,8; | [Y] - "A Window into the Skin. Confocal Laser Scanning Microscopy - In Vivo Histology for Cellular Level Skin Analyses in Cosmetic Research and Dermopharmacy VivaScope Pigmentation and Whitening Aging Inflammatory Cutaneous Status Aesthetic Dermatology Wound Healing and Scars Penetration Antiperspirants", (20110401), URL: http://www.vivascope.de/fileadmin/user_upload/Downloads/Cosmetic_Brochure_04_2011.pdf, (20140813), XP055134671 [Y] 1-4 * the whole document * | [A] - Christopher L Arrasmith ET AL, "MEMS-based handheld confocal microscope for in-vivo skin imaging References and links scan mirror for single-point control of beam deflection and focus", J. Invest. Dermatol. Semin. Cutan. Med. Surg. Dermatology Dermatol. Br. J. Dermatol. Dermatol. Surg. Opt. Express J. Microelectromech. Syst. Opt. Lett. OPTICS EXPRESS J. Microelectromech. Syst. J. Microlith. Microfab. Microsyst. Appl. Opt. Opt. Expre, (20100211), pages 293 - 303, URL: http://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pmc/articles/PMC3378354/pdf/oe-18-4-3805.pdf, (20140812), XP055134422 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | [A] - LOEWKE, KEVIN ET AL, "Real-time image mosaicing with a hand-held dual-axes confocal microscope", SPIE, PO BOX 10 BELLINGHAM WA 98227-0010 USA, (20080205), vol. 6851, doi:10.1117/12.764322, pages 68510F-1 - 68510F-9, XP040432815 [A] 1-8 * the whole document * |