EP3007610 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING WAVE-FRONT ABERRATION DATA OF A TO-BE-TESTED OPTICAL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.03.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Essilor International 147, rue de Paris 94220 Charenton-le-Pont / FR | [2018/02] |
Former [2016/16] | For all designated states Essilor International (Compagnie Générale d'Optique) 147, rue de Paris 94220 Charenton-le-Pont / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERNANDEZ CASTANEDAS, Martha C/O Essilor International 147 rue de Paris F-94220 Charenton-le-Pont / FR | 02 /
MARIN, Gildas C/O Essilor International 147 rue de Paris F-94220 Charenton-le-Pont / FR | 03 /
THIBOS, Larry 1809 Windsor Drive Bloomington, Indiana 467405 / US | 04 /
LIU, Tao 1018 Persimmon Tree circle Bloomington, Indiana 467405 / US | [2016/16] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Novitech 188 Grande rue Charles de Gaulle 94130 Nogent-sur-Marne / FR | [2016/16] | Application number, filing date | 14731185.6 | 09.06.2014 | [2016/16] | WO2014EP61933 | Priority number, date | EP20130305781 | 10.06.2013 Original published format: EP 13305781 | [2016/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014198678 | Date: | 18.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3007610 | Date: | 20.04.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3007610 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61B3/10, A61B3/00 | [2016/16] | CPC: |
A61B3/1015 (EP,US);
A61B3/0025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG VON WELLENFRONTABERRATIONSDATEN EINES ZU UNTERSUCHENDEN OPTISCHEN SYSTEMS | [2016/16] | English: | METHOD FOR DETERMINING WAVE-FRONT ABERRATION DATA OF A TO-BE-TESTED OPTICAL SYSTEM | [2016/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR DÉTERMINER DES DONNÉES D'ABERRATION DE FRONT D'ONDE D'UN SYSTÈME OPTIQUE À TESTER | [2023/29] |
Former [2016/16] | PROCÉDÉ POUR DÉTERMINER LES DONNÉES D'ABERRATION DE FRONT D'ONDE D'UN SYSTÈME OPTIQUE À TESTER | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.2015 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.2015 | Examination requested [2016/16] | 23.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.12.2023 | CZ | 06.12.2023 | EE | 06.12.2023 | ES | 06.12.2023 | HR | 06.12.2023 | IT | 06.12.2023 | LT | 06.12.2023 | LV | 06.12.2023 | NL | 06.12.2023 | PL | 06.12.2023 | RO | 06.12.2023 | RS | 06.12.2023 | SE | 06.12.2023 | SK | 06.12.2023 | SM | 06.12.2023 | BG | 06.03.2024 | NO | 06.03.2024 | GR | 07.03.2024 | IS | 06.04.2024 | PT | 08.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 06.12.2023 | |
CZ | 06.12.2023 | ||
EE | 06.12.2023 | ||
ES | 06.12.2023 | ||
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RO | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 06.12.2023 | |
ES | 06.12.2023 | ||
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
LV | 06.12.2023 | ||
NL | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
LT | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SE | 06.12.2023 | ||
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 06.12.2023 | |
BG | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 07.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2006126019 (LIANG JUNZHONG [US], et al) [X] 1,8,13-16 * paragraphs [0050] - [0055] * * figures 1, 6 * [I] 11,12; | [A]US2009009717 (BARRETT HARRISON H [US], et al) [A] 1-16* paragraphs [0022] - [0048] *; | [A]WO2010005458 (UNIV INDIANA RES & TECH CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * page 13, line 14 - page 19, line 18 * * figures 10, 11 *; | [AD] - LIANG J ET AL, "OBJECTIVE MEASUREMENT OF WAVE ABERRATIONS OF THE HUMAN EYE WITH THE USE OF A HARTMANN-SHACK WAVE-FRONT SENSOR", JOURNAL OF THE OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA A, OPTICAL SOCIETY OF AMERICA, US, (19940701), vol. 11, no. 7, ISSN 1084-7529, pages 1949 - 1957, XP002064186 [AD] 1-16 * the whole document * |